Speed v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jennifer Michelle Speed
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 1:2021cv00230
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Referring Judge: John R Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 Social Security Consent by Jennifer Michelle Speed to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (amg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Jennifer Michelle Speed re: #7 Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire. **Clerk's Note: page 3 not received from filer. (amg)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ANSWER MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S QUESTIONNAIRE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the attached Questionnaire. Plaintiff must certify under penalty of perjury that her answers to this Questionnaire are true by signing the included Certification. Plaintiff's responses to the Questionnaire and her Certification must both be returned to the United States District Clerk, Abilene Division, no later than January 29, 2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 12/29/2021) (jak)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 . Under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff permission to proceed in forma pauperis in this Court until judgment is entered herein. The Clerk shall file Plaintiff's pleadings without prepayment of costs or security. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 12/29/2021) (jak)
December 29, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Dec 29 16:47:07 CST 2021 (crt)
December 29, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Dec 29 13:02:36 CST 2021 (crt)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jennifer Michelle Speed. (amg)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (amg)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Michelle Speed. (amg)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jennifer Michelle Speed. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Letter from SSA 11/22/2021, #2 Civil Case Cover Sheet) (amg)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Parker (see Special Order 3). No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (amg)
December 23, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 4. Thu Dec 23 14:35:18 CST 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speed v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Michelle Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?