Dahl v. SitePro Rentals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jarred Dahl
Defendant: SitePro Rentals, Inc and JLG Industries Inc
Case Number: 1:2025cv00010
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Before the Court is plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), which dismisses the case without prejudice. Dkt. No. #5 . Because the defendants have not filed an answer or a motion for summary judgment, the Court instructs the Clerk of Court to dismiss this action without prejudice under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The parties shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/12/2025) (amg)
February 11, 2025 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). **Clerk's Note: per Wiki instructions. (amg)
February 11, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Jarred Dahl (Allen, Chaile)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO DEMONSTRATE COURT'S JURISDICTION OVER THIS ACTION. Until Dahl alleges facts that would give rise to diversity jurisdiction, this Court is not shown to have subject-matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, by no later than February 11, 2025, Dahl must file an amended complaint that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332. Otherwise, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 1/27/2025) (mms)
January 24, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JLG Industries Inc, SitePro Rentals, Inc. (amg)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jarred Dahl. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Allen, Chaile) (Main Document 2 replaced after flattening on 1/24/2025) (amg).
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jarred Dahl. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15208647) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Allen, Chaile)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahl v. SitePro Rentals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarred Dahl
Represented By: Chaile M Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SitePro Rentals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLG Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?