Abeyta, et al v. Swift Beef Company, et al
Plaintiff: Ray Gomez, Omar Arturo Finn, Jaime Aguilar, Efrain Garay, Raquel Reyes, Apolonio Rivero, Bouala Vorady, Refubio Grimaldo, Lucio Botello, Elias Rodriguez, Thomas Souvanmakhily, Carlos nmi Hernandez, Juan I Munoz, Ramiro Rodriguez, Rosa Esquivel, Maria P Oliveros, Joseph Phadie, Juan G Reyes, Leonard G Campbell, Shane Henson, Noelia Sotelo, Rogelio nmi Moreno, Estela Sauceda, Salome Jacobo, Felix Griego, Esperanza Espinoza, Juan Guevera, Jesus Alfaroz, Socorro Estrada, Miguel nmi Perez, Rosalio Mendoza, Olga Robles, Edgar Nevarez, Gilbert Guzman, Melania Gomez, Ramon Solis, Carlos Ochoa, Andrea Olague, Sikhan Bounthanome, Chad W Rhoades, Emeterio Mendoza, Jesus nmn Hernandez, Maria nmn Huerta, Juan nmi Guerra, Manuel G Talamantes, Tonya Roberts, Jesus Medina, Ana Marie Silva, Marcia Ayala, Bill B Trevino, Oscar Lozoya, Jose nmn Garcia, Hilda Avila, Maria Escobar, Maria nmn Cervantes, Rafael Arellanos, Domingo Talamantes, Elisa Jalome, Vena Marie McClendon, Cynthia Orozco, Jesus Huerta, Ubaldo Estrada, Octavio Ramos, Jesus Mendez, Jaime Grado, Gloria Cera, Miguel nmi Gomez, Candelario Arredondo, Jose R Granados, Raul Arpero, Estella Leos, Isidro Hernandez, Jesus M Corral, Genevive Gutierrez, Juan Zuniga, Acsencion Gomez, Daniel Escobedo, Eugene Ortiz, Antonio Macias, Sergio Mesa, Ernesto Baca, Raul Franco, Ricarda Grajeda, Hector Armendariz, Manuel nmi Rivera, Claudia Najera, Conrado Ortega, Johnny Fields, Jorge Villela, Robert Reyes, Juan Quilodran, Elisa Meraz, Maria Carbajal, Bouttarat Thonechanh, Jose P Murgia, Valentin Anguinaga, Douglas nmi Jones, Pomposo Diaz, II, Maria Elva Gallegos, Maira Guerra, James Edward Henry, Genaro Gallegos Zamaripa, Phouvieng Sourivong, Manuel Escapita, Connie Espinoza, Arnulfo Rodriguez, Dario Reyes, Daniel NMI Garcia, Abelardo Galaviz, Patricia Orozco, Blanca Flores, Ruben Martinez, Jesus M Carbajal, Jesus B Lujan, Pannyasy Vongsy, Javier NMI Medina, Jesus Ramon Saldivar, Cecilia Nevarez, Pedro nmi Ortega, Olga Estrada, Alicia Castaneda, Ruben Burciaga, Mark nmi Harris, Maria Contreras, Paul A Blake, Sabina Paz, Sandra Quintanilla, Rodolfo Reyes, Francisco Alaniz, Manuel nmn Martinez, J Concepcion Garcia, Laura Gonzalez, Manuel P Castro, Arturo Vasquez, Veronica Tenorio, Esthela Dominguez, Candalaria Galvan, Juan Barajas, Rosa Talamantes, Maria Ortiz, Rafael Zamarippa, Robert G Woods, Rosa Parra, Maria Frescas, Maria Ontiveros, Jaime Najera, Wesley Lasley, Fred Young, Mariana Lara, Jesus Vera, Arturo Ramos, Jose L Canales, Luis I Aguilar, Anarvol Vedoy, Perfecto Rojas, Ausencia Espino, Frances Trevino, Araceli Duran, Maria Gallegos, Sylvia NMI Rodriguez, Ruben Melger, Jose R Sanchez, Guadalupe Ruiz, Ramon Anchondo, Maria Sarimiento, Abelardo Cruz, Alfredo Prado, Roberto Ordonez, Consuelo Vargas, Maria Munoz, Deanne Murillo, Ezequiel Geurrero, Joaquin Najera, Luis Parra, Jesus Chacon, Jorge Murga, Manuela Aranda, Elisa Sauseda, Mario Ronquillo, Carmen Aguilar, Genoveva Campbell, Elvira Aldana, Steven H Guzman, Samuel E Cooper, Manuel Ontiveros, Stephanie Carrasco, Loreto Sanchez, Gonzalo Ordonez, Guadalupe Armadillo, Flora Botello, Javier Pinon, Guadalupe Loya, Pedro Romero, Jose N Alanis, Dora Onofre, Sandra Zubia Pinon, Joanne Rivera, Israel Borunda, Mary Jane Garcia, Locadio Lopez, Juan nmi Gonzalez, Carmelo Dominguez, Maria Avila, Emeterio Cabrera, Maria Sosa, Ramiro Sanchez, Arnold Galaviz, Oscar Delapena, Jose Quinonez, Forrest W Green, Horacio Loya, Richard Sintas, Jose Vargas, Jaime Acosta, Renato Sanchez, Francisco J Gutierrez, Rosabla Estrada, Carlos Avila, Francisco Calderon, George Gamboa, Daniel McEwan, Peter Keopraseuth, Antonlin Gonzalez, Arnulfo Garcia, David Stiles, Elva Trevino, Oscar Regalada, Jose Luis Oliva, Conrado Arredondo, Juan nmi Flores, Boualy Sysakayavong, Julie Martinez Padilla, Anson Washington, Rosa Arrellanes, Diego Mendoza, Sylvia Cabrera, Maria nmi Ramirez, Cozy Crain, Matilde Valdez, Arnulfo Sosa, Carmen A Zamarippa, Patricia Martinez, Zeferino Lopez, Rutilo Palomares, Beatriz Flores, David Venable, Monica Trevino, Maria Villalon, Joel Parra, Martin Flores, Brenda Gomez, Jose Ramon Terrazas, Jesenia Beltran, Paul Gonzalez, Marcos Delarosa, Genaro nmi Hernandez, Guadalupe Mendoza, Hipolito Garcia, Elvira A Medrano, Amalia Montes, Manuel A Hernandez, Michelle Vasquez, Juan G Garcia, Jose L Fierro, Jose Ponce, Efrain Franco, Phillip A Lovato, Maria Vedoy, Juan F Diaz, Maria Alva, Silvino Alarcon, Maribel Gomez, Ricardo Chavira, Amado Guzman, Cody Melton, Brit Vansickel, Arturo Munoz, J Kent Mills, Clementina Vocia, Celso Barrientos, Angie I Gonzalez, Carlos Santos, Paula Rivas, Iris J Preza, Luis C Garay, Rafael J Sanchez, Javier Pichardo, Blanca Guillen, Javier Rubio, Cesar Gomez, Gloria Hernandez, Lupe Mendoza, Sergio Cera, Rosa Maria Mendez, Juan Figuero, Elisa Sanchez, Candace Deatherage, Irene Reyes, Miguel Renteria, Isidro Landeros, Armando Quiroz, Esmeralda Garcia, Christopher Mendoza, Felipe Reyes, Armando Lira, Silverio Castro, Santiago Nemencio, David Diaz, Monick Souvanmakhily, Alfredo Vasquez, Rigo Zubia, Esaul Loya, Ismael Martinez, Isela Ortiz, Cecilio Dominguez, Hector nmi Hernandez, Brenda Vasquez, Enedina Borunda, Elizabeth Alarcon, Guadalupe Martinez, Gloria Catano, Rangchit Chanthabandt, Elizabeth Wright, Nolan Clayton Tipton, Jr, Minnie Fuentes, Clarissa Valenzuela, Simona Reyes, Santiago Olivarez, Jesus Ortega, Juvenal Saavedra, Maria nmi Hernandez, Alicia Bebadilla, Elodio Arroyos, Elvira Hernandez, Maria I Martinez, Norma NMI Vasquez, Johnnie R Knight, Maria R Franco, Ceasar Bustamante, Celso Loya, John Darrough, Marisol Concha, Russell Buller, Raul Vargas, Joshua Navarro, Amanda Guel, Cruzita Mendez, Cruz Mendoza, Baldemar Armendariz, Ana Maria Gonzalez, Ernesto Delarosa, Zulema Revelez, Abigail Vasquez, Telesforo Garcia, Clara Granados, Fernando Lara, Patricia Mendoza, Maria Villegas, Martha Balderas, Rosa MA Chacon, Juan R Martinez, Jesus M Villa, Sonia Guerra, Isidoro Chavira, Rique Jalome, Freddie E Young, Veronica Sendejo, Jorge Alvidrez, Jose Alfredo Fuentes, Jose R Ojeda, Jose Avila, Alejandro Izquierdo, Irma Reyes, Rebecca Perez, Brent J Boyd, Cruz E Vasquez, Ahmed Gonzalez, Gilberto Pinon Bailon, Leonel Gomez, Norma R Morales, Cynthia L Riedle, David Schear, Khamphanh Phothisene, Irma Y Acosta, Antonia Bravo, Gerard Daniel Sandoval, Imelda G Maldonado, Rene Padilla, Chad McEwan, Julio nmi Rodriguez, Mario Nevarez, Rosa Natividad, Ofelia Sosa, Monty L Goree, Francisco Femath, Erma nmi Evins, Juan C Gomez, Juan M Valles, Herbierta Tovar, Guillermina Hernandez, Estela Ramirez, Pablo Galvan, Carlos M Montoya, Jr, Jess Esparza, Manuel Carrillo, Luis A Jimenez, Carmen Lara, Joe Aguirre, Nou Deang Souvanmakhily, Alfredo Loya, Rodrigo Najera, Librado Juarez, Yolanda Harris, Carlos NMI Vasquez, Jennifer Lynn Gray, Leticia Ochoa, David Slater, Frances Stiles, Angel Mendiola, Oralia Reyes, Maria nmi Nava, Esther Mendez, Esmeralda Sanchez De Valdez, Ruben Catano, Jr, Francisco Alarcon, Nancy Rodriguez, Veronica Arzate, Oscar Pinon, Maria Saavedra, Ernesto Murillo, Jose M Salcido, Alonso Rodriguez, Norberto Ledezma, Jose L Gallegos, Juan M Mata, Gilberto S Machado, Gabriela Llamas, Imra I Martinez, Misael Conde Ontiveros, Armando Rodriguez, Scott D Walker, Francisco Herrera, Celina Frescas, Esmeralda Loya, Jose A Marin, Arthur Deanda, Abraham K Garcia, Oscar Sarabia, Aida Finn, Paul Vandiver, Jesus G Caballero, Auden B Villareal, Raul A Meza, Martha Aguilar, Jeff Ricketson, Enedina Diaz, Christopher Velasco, Elena Porras, Hermelinda Avalos, Obed Marquez, Alfredo Montes, Lupe Palma, Maribel Martinez, Juan A Chairez, Francisco Carrasco, Alice Granados, Frank Alcantar, Rigoberto Gallegos, Ramon Murga, Velia Leyva, Ricardo Martinez, Lilia Meraz, Ismael Gutierrez, Ruben Gonzalez, Mary Foreman, Leticia Leos, Georgia Perez, Cristobal Guzman, Leroy David Demsky, Sigfredo Enriquez, Leticia Serrato, Angela Tijerina, Jose nmn Castillo, Joel Arellanes, Jose nmi Gonzalez, Eliseo Jacques, Manuel Chavira, Jesus nmi Ramos, Johnny NMI Shaw, Blanca Valenzuela, Jesus Gurrola, Margie Salazar, Irma Grijalva, Juan Rosales Bustamante, Guadalupe Garcia, Silvia Gomez, Drew Hugg, Armando Mendoza and Jose NMI Marquez
Case Number: 2:2001cv00216
Filed: June 5, 2001
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mary Lou Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2003. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2003 Filing 157 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - After consideration of the stipulation for dismissal, the Court dismisses with prejudice the above styled cause of action with each party being responsible for their own costs. (Signed by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on February 24, 2003) (plh, )
February 24, 2003 Filing 156 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Joseph Abeyta and all other pltfs, Swift Beef Company. (Exhibits not imaged) (plh, )
February 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: This case was announced settled on 1/10/03. The parties are ordered to submit a proposed agreed judgment in this case on or before Friday, 2/28/03. (Signed by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on February 19, 2003) (plh, )
January 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER terminating [145-1] motion to strike Raymond G. Cordelli and Lamar Johnson as Expert Witnesses, terminating [93-1] motion for summary judgment, terminating [56-1] motion for protective order. This case having announced settled, all pending motions are moot and will not be ruled upon by the Court. Any party wishing to reurge any motion must promptly so inform the Court. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 1/14/03 Page(s) 1 (plh)
January 6, 2003 Filing 153 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT to [117-1] exhibits list by plaintiff (3) (plh)
January 3, 2003 Filing 152 DEPOSITION of C. LAMAR JOHNSON taken 10/27/99 in cause no 4-98-cv-90538, Craig Hootman, et al v. Excel Corporation, USDC SD/Iowa, Ottumwa Division (received copy - 1 vol) (djs)
January 3, 2003 Filing 151 DEPOSITION of C. LAMAR JOHNSON taken 4/21/99 in cause no. 2:97-cv-420-J, Jose Angel Zapata, et al v. Excel, Inc., USDC ND/TX Amarillo Divison (received copy - 1 vol) (djs)
January 3, 2003 Filing 150 DEPOSITION of C. LAMAR JOHNSON taken 7/2/99 in cause no. 98-M-2653, Catalina Salazar, et al v. Monfort Inc, USDC/District of Colorado (received copy - 1 vol) (djs)
January 3, 2003 Filing 149 MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant in limine (7) (djs)
December 18, 2002 Filing 148 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT (Supplemental Requested Charge) to [109-1] instructions jury by plaintiff (9) (plh)
December 9, 2002 JANUARY PRETRIAL NOTICE AND ORDER resetting pretrial order due for 12/30/02 , resetting docket call for 9:30 1/13/03 , and resetting Jury trial for 9:00 1/14/03 (plh)
December 6, 2002 Filing 147 APPENDIX by plaintiff in support of [145-1] motion to strike Raymond G. Cordelli and Lamar Johnson as Expert Witnesses (180) (plh)
December 6, 2002 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by plaintiff in support of [145-1] motion to strike Raymond G. Cordelli and Lamar Johnson as Expert Witnesses (35) (plh)
December 6, 2002 Filing 145 MOTION by plaintiff to strike Raymond G. Cordelli and Lamar Johnson as Expert Witnesses (2) (plh)
November 12, 2002 Filing 144 TRIAL BRIEF ON THE ISSUE OF REPRESENTATIVE TESTIMONY TO ESTABLISH flsa VIOLATIONS FOR ALL PLTFS by plaintiffs (56) (plh)
November 6, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER VACATING TRIAL SETTING - The trial setting in this case is hereby vacated, to be reset by further order of the Court. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 11/6/02 Page(s) 1 (plh)
November 6, 2002 Filing 142 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT to [108-1] designation of depositions by Joseph Abeyta (2) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER - The parties therein have stipulated that the correct name of dft is now the Swift Beef Company (it was formerly the ConAgra Beef Company). The style of this case is therefore changed to reflect the correct current names of the parties. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 10/22/02 Page(s) 1 (plh)
October 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting [100-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling attendance at depositions. The claims of the 125 pltfs on the list attached as Exhibit A to this Order and made a part hereof are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Mag Judge's order compelling them to attend their own depositions. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 10/21/02 Page(s) 4 (plh)
October 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER adopting [71-1] report & recommendation, and granting [44-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with order compelling answers to interrogatories. Accordingly, the 697 pltfs listed on Exhibit A attached to this Order are dismissed form this lawsuit as set forth in the R&R. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 10/21/02 Page(s) 17 (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 138 Received Compressed Transcript of DEPOSITION of Mia Canzona Clancy taken 10/23/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 137 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Mark Deraad taken 11/20/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 136 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Gilbert Rodriguez taken 11/20/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 135 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of George Aikman taken 11/21/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 134 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Roland Solano taken 11/21/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 133 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Joe Gutierrez taken 11/20/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 132 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Tony Urias taken 11/22/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 131 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Tim Percival taken 11/22/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 130 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Cindy Vasquez taken 11/21/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 129 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Alex Garcia taken 11/22/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 128 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Brian Atchley taken 11/20/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 127 Received copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Paul Hernandez taken 11/21/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 126 Received copy of oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Edie Cunningham taken 11/22/00 (1 Vol) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 125 Copy of Oral and Videotaped DEPOSITION of Doyle Brasher taken 11/21/00 (1 Vol.) (plh)
October 21, 2002 Filing 124 NOTICE of FILING OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS by Conagra Beef Company (3) (plh)
October 15, 2002 Filing 123 TRIAL BRIEF by plaintiffs (25) (plh)
October 10, 2002 Filing 122 STIPULATED FACTUAL NARRATIAVE by plaintiff, defendant (2) (plh)
October 10, 2002 Filing 121 Designation of Depositions by Conagra Beef Company (18) (plh)
October 10, 2002 Filing 120 SECOND AMENDED FRCP 26(a)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Conagra Beef Company (14) (plh)
October 10, 2002 Filing 119 Witness list by Conagra Beef Company (9) (plh)
October 10, 2002 Filing 118 Exhibit list (Agreed Stipulation of Dft's Exhibits) by Conagra Beef Company (23) (plh)
October 10, 2002 Filing 117 Exhibit list by plaintiffs (13) (plh)
October 9, 2002 Filing 116 AMENDED FRCP 26(a)93) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Conagra Beef Company (12) (plh)
October 8, 2002 Filing 115 Exhibit list by plaintiff (13) (plh)
October 7, 2002 Filing 114 Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law on matters reserved for the Court by Conagra Beef Company (plh)
October 7, 2002 Filing 113 TRIAL BRIEF by Conagra Beef Company (27) (plh)
October 7, 2002 Filing 112 JOINT Proposed pre-trial order from defendant, plaintiff (45) (plh)
October 7, 2002 Filing 111 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT to [105-1] remark - FRCP 26(A)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by plaintiffsi (2) (plh)
October 7, 2002 Filing 110 Witness list by plaintiff (8) (plh)
October 7, 2002 Filing 109 Proposed charge to the jury and verdict of the jury by plaintiff (22) (plh)
October 4, 2002 Filing 108 Designation of Depositions by plaintiff (24) (plh)
September 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER TO FILE STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS AND AGREED STIPULATION ON EXHIBITS - Parties to this action are to confer and file on or before 10/11/02 a complete narrative of stipulated facts. Parties are also to confer and stipulate as to the authenticity and admissibility of all exhibits, and file this stipulation by the same date. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 9/27/02 Page(s) 1 (plh)
September 20, 2002 OCTOBER PRETRIAL NOTICE AND ORDER setting pretrial order due for 10/7/02 , setting docket call for 9:30 10/21/02 , setting Jury trial for 1:30 10/22/02 (plh)
September 17, 2002 Filing 106 REPLY by defendant to response to [93-1] motion for summary judgment (9) (djs)
September 16, 2002 Filing 105 FRCP 26(a)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by plaintiff (10) (plh)
September 6, 2002 Filing 104 RULE 26(a)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Conagra Beef Company (12) (plh)
September 5, 2002 Filing 103 APPENDIX by plaintiff in support of [102-1] motion response to motion for summary judgment (122) (plh)
September 5, 2002 Filing 102 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by plaintiffs to [93-1] motion for summary judgment (18) (plh)
September 3, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting [74-1] motion to take judicial notice and to dismiss plaintiffs previously dismissed in pending cause No. 2-00-cv-083-J. The Court's earlier judgment has the res judicata effect of barring any future FLSA claim or cause of action arising from time periods at issue in Valverde. The FLSA claims of pltfs Rachel Flores and Beatris Vasquez which arose on or before 7/3/01 are hereby Dismissed with Prejudice. In addition, by order of June 22, 2001 and FLSA claim that these Pltfs asserted for recovery of unpaid wages for time spent in personal showering after their work shift ended was waived and abandoned in Valverde. Therefore that claim is also dismissed in this lawsuit insofar as it may be asserted by these pltfs. This Order is not to be construed as dismissing any other claims asserted by these pltfs to the extent such claims arise out of alleged FLSA violations by deft ConAgra Beef Company which occurred on or after 7/4/01, the date these pltfs' claims were dismissed in Valverde. (Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 9/3/02 Page(s) 2 (jeh)
August 28, 2002 Filing 100 DEFENDANT'S REURGED AND AMENDED SECOND MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling attendance at depositions (130) (jeh)
August 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying [96-1] second motion to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling Attendance at Depositions ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) to counsel: 8/27/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
August 26, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting [97-1] motion to extend time Response to motion reset to 9/6/02 for [93-1] motion for summary judgment ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 8/26/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
August 22, 2002 Filing 97 AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by plaintiffs to extend time (3) (jeh) Modified on 08/22/2002
August 12, 2002 Filing 96 SECOND MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Order Compelling Attendance at Depositions (50+) (jeh)
August 9, 2002 Filing 95 APPENDIX by defendant Conagra Beef Company in support of [93-1] motion for summary judgment (50+ Bound separately) (jeh)
August 9, 2002 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM by defendant Conagra Beef Company in support of [93-1] motion for summary judgment (35) (jeh)
August 9, 2002 Filing 93 MOTION by defendant Conagra Beef Company for summary judgment (11) (jeh) Modified on 08/22/2002
August 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS dismissing plaintiffs without prejudice for failure to comply with the Magistrate Judge's order compelling them to attend their own depositions (see attached Exhibit A for parties) ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 8/9/02 Page(s) 6 (jeh)
August 5, 2002 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT filed Court Reporter: Janet Wright Date(s): 3/16/02 Volume(s): 1 Type of proceeding: Motions Hearing held before Judge Averitte (bb)
July 30, 2002 Filing 90 REPLY by defendant to response to [85-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Orders compelling attendance at depositions (6) (djs)
July 30, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting [85-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Orders compelling attendance at depositions. The claims of the plaintiffs on the lists attached as Exhibit A to this order and made a part hereof are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Magistrate Judge's order compelling them to attend their own depositions. (Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson) Copies to counsel: 7/30/02 Page(s) 6 (djs)
July 26, 2002 Filing 88 RESPONSE by plaintiffs to [85-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Orders compelling attendance at depositions (3) (jeh)
July 23, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE - Deft's motion to dismiss 130 pltf's for failure to comply with the Magistrate Judge's order compelling them to attend their own depositions filed 7/16/02, requires an immediate response from plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 7/23/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
July 18, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S THIRD MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO ATTEND NOTICED DEPOSITIONS granting [79-1] amended motion (amended) to compel, (Motion termed: [76-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions ) ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 7/18/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
July 16, 2002 Filing 85 MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company to dismiss for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge's Orders compelling attendance at depositions (50+) (Bound Separately) (jeh)
July 16, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED [THIRD] MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO ATTEND NOTICED DEPOSITIONS Response to motion due immediately to defendant's [79-1] amended motion (amended) to compel ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 7/16/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
July 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES granting [81-1] joint motion to extend time in scheduling order. All pending deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order dated 8/20/01 are hereby extended for three (3) weeks (except for the trial date). (Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 7/16/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
July 12, 2002 Filing 82 NOTICE of NAME CHANGE by Conagra Beef Company (4) (plh)
July 12, 2002 Filing 81 JOINT MOTION to extend time in scheduling order by plaintiff, defendant (3) (jeh)
July 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OF REFERENCE: [79-1] Third Amended motion to compel referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 7/12/02 Page(s): 1 (jeh)
July 11, 2002 Filing 79 AMENDED (THIRD) MOTION (amended) to compel by defendant Conagra Beef Company referring to [76-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions and supporting brief (50+) (jeh)
July 9, 2002 Filing 78 DEMAND for jury trial by defendant Conagra Beef Company (jeh)
July 9, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER OF CONAGRA BEEF COMPANY - granting [75-1] motion to amend [5-1] answer ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 7/9/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
July 2, 2002 Filing 76 MOTION with brief in support by Conagra Beef Company to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions (73) (plh)
June 28, 2002 Filing 75 AGREED MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company for Leave to file Amended Answer to amend [5-1] answer (11) (jeh)
June 28, 2002 Filing 74 SECOND MOTION by defendant Conagra Beef Company to take judicial notice and to dismiss plaintiffs previously dismissed in pending cause No. 2-00-cv-083-J (3) (jeh)
June 28, 2002 Filing 73 CORRECTION OF FACTS by defendant Conagra Beef Company in defendant's [48-1] motion to dismiss plaintiffs previously dismissed in pending cause no. 2:00-cv-83-J (5) (jeh)
June 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting [48-1] motion to dismiss plaintiffs previously dismissed in pending cause no. 2:00-cv-83-J. Deft's mot is granted to the extent that the following persons are precluded from recovering on any cause of action asserted in this case for any damages that occurred before 7/3/01: Carmen Aguilar, Norma Gutierrez, Deanne Murillo, Olivia Najera, Rebecca Perez, Diane Pizano, Maria Sarmiento and Dori Vigil. The motion is otherwise Denied. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 6/27/02 Page(s) 2 (jeh)
June 21, 2002 Filing 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES of Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte Re: [44-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with order compelling answers to interrogatories ; Objections to R and R due within 14 days (2) (djs)
June 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting defendants's [54-1] motion for protective order from pltfs' second set of request for production of documents (Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte) Copies to counsel: 6/21/02 Page(s) 1 (djs)
June 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting defendant's second [61-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions. Any relief not granted herein is denied (Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte) Copies to counsel: 6/21/02 Page(s) 1 (djs)
June 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying defendant's request for costs and attorney's fees urged as a part of its [43-1] motion to compel. Such motion to compel was granted on 6/7/02, and the request for costs and attorney's fees was held under advisement. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte) Copies to counsel: 6/21/02 Page(s) 1 (djs)
June 10, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SETTING HEARING Motion hearing set for 4:00 6/18/02 for [54-1] motion for protective order from pltfs' second set of request for production of documents ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 6/10/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
June 10, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER SETTING HEARING Motion hearing set for 6/18/02 for 4:00 p.m. on [44-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with order compelling answers to interrogatories ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 6/10/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh) Modified on 06/10/2002
June 10, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER SETTING HEARING - Re: defendant's request for attorneys fees and costs; Hearing set for 6/18/02 @ 4:00 p.m. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 6/10/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh) Modified on 06/10/2002
June 10, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO RESPOND Response to motion reset to 6/24/02 for defendant's [61-1] second motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 6/10/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
June 10, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting [43-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 6/10/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
June 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER OF REFERENCE: [61-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 6/4/02 Page(s): 1 (jeh)
June 3, 2002 Filing 61 SECOND MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions (50+) (jeh)
May 30, 2002 Filing 60 RESPONSE by defendant Conagra Beef Company to plaintiffs' [56-1] motion for protective order to stay further proceedings (16) (jeh)
May 28, 2002 Filing 59 REPLY by defendant Conagra Beef Company to response to [43-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions (7) (jeh) Modified on 06/10/2002
May 28, 2002 Filing 58 REPLY IN SUPPORT by defendant Conagra Beef Company to response to [44-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with order compelling answers to interrogatories (20) (jeh)
May 20, 2002 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Character of the Entity by plaintiffs (2) (jeh)
May 14, 2002 Filing 56 MOTION with memorandum in support by plaintiffs for protective order (jeh)
May 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF REFERENCE: [54-1] motion for protective order from pltfs' second set of request for production of documents referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 5/13/02 Page(s): 1 (jeh)
May 10, 2002 Filing 54 MOTION by Conagra Beef Company for protective order from pltfs' second set of request for production of documents (64) (plh)
May 9, 2002 Filing 53 NOTICE of SERVICE OF DFT'S RESPONSE TO PLTFS' SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Conagra Beef Company (2) (plh)
May 9, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CANCELLING HEARING - A tele conference was held on 5/9/02 concerning the status of this motion. At such tele conference, counsel for the parties advised there are no unresolved issues in this matter that need to be addressed by the Court. Based upon the foregoing, the hearing presently scheduled for 5/10/02 is CANCELLED. The order entered 4/26/02 addressing the motion remains in effect. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 5/9/02 Page(s) 1 (plh)
May 9, 2002 Filing 51 Minute order: Hearing on D's Motion for Protective Order and Pending Matters Held before Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte via Telephone Hearing. All Matters resolved. Hearing scheduled for 5/10/02 vacated. Court Reporter: Elect. Tape 02-1T (bb)
May 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF REFERENCE: [44-1] motion to dismiss for failure to comply with order compelling answers to interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte, for a hearing, if necessary, and for determination and/or a report and recommendation [43-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte, for a hearing, if necessary, and for determiantion and/or a report and recommendation. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 5/8/02 Page(s): 1 (plh) Modified on 06/10/2002
May 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - A telephone conference regarding the above referenced case will be held Thursday, 5/9/02 at 9:30 am. The telephone conference will originate from the Mag Judge's Chambers. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 5/8/02 Page(s) 1 (plh)
May 8, 2002 Filing 48 MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant to take judicial notice and to dismiss plaintiffs previously dismissed in pending cause no. 2:00-cv-83-J (5) (djs)
May 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER SETTING HEARING - A hearing on dft Conagra Beef Company's Second Motion for Protective Orders filed 4/1/02 shall be held Friday, 5/10/02 at 10:00 am in the Mag Judge's courtroom. The parties shall immediately submit a list of any unresolved matters. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 5/7/02 Page(s) 1 (plh)
April 26, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting Defendant's Secont Motion for Protective Order - granting [38-1] motion for protective order ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 4/26/02 Page(s) 2 (jeh)
April 18, 2002 Filing 45 NOTICE of Service of Discovery by plaintiffs Joseph Abeyta, et al (pltfs' second set of request for production of documents) (2) (jeh)
April 16, 2002 Filing 44 MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company to dismiss for failure to comply with order compelling answers to interrogatories (27) (jeh)
April 16, 2002 Filing 43 MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company to compel plaintiffs to attend noticed depositions (51) (jeh) Modified on 06/10/2002
April 12, 2002 Filing 42 Designation of Expert Witnesses by Conagra Beef Company (3) (plh)
April 8, 2002 Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Responses by plaintiff (Re: 2 sets of pltfs' Answers to Interrogatories listed by pltf on attached Exhibit "A") (3) (jeh)
April 2, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF REFERENCE: [38-1] motion for protective order referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte, for a hearing, if necessary, and for determination. ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 4/2/02 Page(s): 1 (plh)
April 1, 2002 Filing 39 Transcript order form: Transcript requested of hearing held March 15, 2002 before Judge Averitte, Elect. Tape 02-33 (bb)
April 1, 2002 Filing 38 SECOND MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company for protective order (52) (jeh)
March 21, 2002 Filing 37 NOTICE of SERVICE OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES by plaintiffs (3) (jeh)
March 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Defendant's [25-1] motion for protective order, granting [23-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to answer interrogatories ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 3/15/02 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
March 15, 2002 Filing 35 Minute order: Motion Hearing Held before Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte Court Reporter: Elect. Tape 02-33 (bb)
March 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING HEARING Motion hearing set for 2:00 3/15/02 for [23-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to answer interrogatories and for [25-1] motion for protective order ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 3/13/02 (faxed) Page(s) 1 (jeh)
March 12, 2002 Filing 33 RESPONSE by defendant Conagra Beef Company to [32-1] motion for protective order, [32-2] motion to extend time to file answers to interrogatories (38) (jeh)
February 22, 2002 Filing 32 MOTION with memorandum in support by plaintiff Joseph Abeyta for protective order , and in the alternative to extend time to file answers to interrogatories (jeh)
February 13, 2002 Filing 31 JOINT SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT by defendant Conagra Beef Company and plaintiffs Joseph Abeyta, et al (2) (jeh)
February 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO RESPOND Response to motion reset to 2/22/02 for [25-1] motion for protective order reset to 2/22/02 for [23-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to answer interrogatories ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ) Copies to counsel: 2/13/02 Page(s) 2 (jeh)
February 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF REFERENCE: [25-1] motion for protective order referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 2/13/02 Page(s): 1 (jeh)
February 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF REFERENCE: [23-1] motion to compel plaintiffs to answer interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge Clinton E. Averitte ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 2/12/02 Page(s): 1 (jeh)
February 11, 2002 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT by defendant Conagra Beef Company Re: [25-1] motion for protective order (4) (jeh)
February 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER unfiling [24-1] Response to plaintiffs' third [sic] Request for Production of Documents by defendant Conagra Beef Company due to the following deficiency: Local Rule 5.2(discovery) Copies to counsel: 2/7/02 (signed by Judge Mary Lou Robinson ) Page(s) 1 (jeh)
February 6, 2002 Filing 25 MOTION with memorandum in support by defendant Conagra Beef Company for protective order (46) (jeh)
February 4, 2002 Filing 24 U N F I L E D (per Order 2/7/02) Response to Plaintiffs' Third [sic] Request for Production of Documents by defendant Conagra Beef Company (18) (NOD) (jeh) Modified on 02/07/2002
January 29, 2002 Filing 23 MOTION with brief in support by Conagra Beef Company to compel plaintiffs to answer interrogatories (44) (plh)
January 9, 2002 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Responses by plaintiffs (3) (jeh)
January 7, 2002 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Third Request for Production by plaintiffs Joseph Abeyta, et al (2) (jeh)
December 19, 2001 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Responses by plaintiffs (14) (jeh)
December 19, 2001 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Responses by plaintiffs (8) (jeh) Modified on 12/20/2001
December 4, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying [17-1] motion to abate or stay litigation pending the outcome of Valverde, et al vs. Conagra Beef Company ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 12/4/01 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
November 30, 2001 Filing 17 AGREED MOTION by plaintiffs to abate or stay litigation pending the outcome of Valverde, et al vs. Conagra Beef Company (5) (jeh)
October 4, 2001 Filing 16 NOTICE of SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by plaintiff (2) (plh)
August 21, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Parties shall be ready for trial by 9/16/02. Counsel shall file a joint report setting forth the status of settlement negotiaitons by 2/15/02. Setting Joining of Parties on 1/11/02; Amending of Pleadings on 7/5/02; Discovery cutoff 7/12/02; Deadline for filing of dispositive motions, except motions in limine, 7/31/02; Motions for summary judgment 7/19/02; Pretrial materials, designation of expert witnesses, due on 3/15/02 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due 4/12/02 by parties opposing affirmative relief; Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures due 8/16/02; (Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 8/21/01 Page(s): 3 (jeh)
August 14, 2001 Filing 14 MOTION by defendant Conagra Beef Company for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (4) (jeh)
August 10, 2001 Filing 13 RESPONSE "Joint suggestions for modifying original Rule 16 scheduling order following Rule 26(f) conference" by plaintiffs, defendant to [11-1] order (3) (djs)
August 8, 2001 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of FRCP 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by plaintiffs (2) (jeh)
August 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The parties are to confer and file specific suggestions, if any, on how to modify the current Rule 16 scheduling order so as to schedule necessary discovery and/or allow additional time for specific discovery procedures in this case. Those specific suggestions are due on or before 15 days from the date of this order. (Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 8/6/01 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
July 31, 2001 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT ON RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by plaintiff, defendant (3) (jeh)
July 24, 2001 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff, amending [1-1] complaint (48) (jeh)
July 24, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting [7-1] motion to amend [1-1] complaint ( Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 7/24/01 Page(s) 1 (jeh)
July 11, 2001 Filing 7 MOTION with memorandum in support by plaintiff to amend [1-1] complaint (52) (jeh)
July 11, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Parties shall be ready for trial by 3/11/02. Counsel shall file a joint report setting forth the status of settlement negotiations by 10/12/01. Setting Joining of Parties on 8/24/01 ; Amending of Pleadings on 1/4/01 ; Discovery cutoff 1/7/02 ; Deadline for filing of dispositive motions, except motions in limine, 1/21/02; Motions for summary judgment 1/7/02; Pretrial materials, designation of expert witnesses, due on 9/10/01 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due 10/1/01 by parties opposing affirmative relief; Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures 2/11/02. (Signed by Judge Mary L. Robinson ) Copies to counsel: 7/11/01 Page(s): 3 (jeh)
July 9, 2001 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by defendant Conagra Beef Company (Attorney Charles R Watson, Billy R Wolfe), (8) (djs)
June 29, 2001 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Conagra Beef Company 6/15/01. Answer due on 7/5/01 for Conagra Beef Company (2) (jeh)
June 5, 2001 Filing 3 SUMMONS(ES) issued for defendant Conagra Beef Company (1) (djs)
June 5, 2001 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by plaintiffs (56) (djs)
June 5, 2001 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed; Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 34613 (47) (djs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abeyta, et al v. Swift Beef Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Gomez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Arturo Finn
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Aguilar
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrain Garay
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Reyes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apolonio Rivero
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bouala Vorady
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Refubio Grimaldo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucio Botello
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Rodriguez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Souvanmakhily
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos nmi Hernandez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan I Munoz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Rodriguez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Esquivel
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria P Oliveros
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Phadie
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan G Reyes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard G Campbell
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Henson
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelia Sotelo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio nmi Moreno
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estela Sauceda
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salome Jacobo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Griego
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Espinoza
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Guevera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Alfaroz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Estrada
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel nmi Perez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalio Mendoza
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Robles
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Nevarez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Guzman
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melania Gomez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Solis
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ochoa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Olague
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sikhan Bounthanome
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad W Rhoades
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emeterio Mendoza
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus nmn Hernandez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria nmn Huerta
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan nmi Guerra
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel G Talamantes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Roberts
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Medina
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Marie Silva
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Ayala
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill B Trevino
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Lozoya
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose nmn Garcia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Avila
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Escobar
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria nmn Cervantes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Arellanos
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Talamantes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Jalome
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vena Marie McClendon
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Orozco
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Huerta
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubaldo Estrada
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Ramos
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Mendez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Grado
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Cera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel nmi Gomez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candelario Arredondo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R Granados
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Arpero
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Leos
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidro Hernandez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus M Corral
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevive Gutierrez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Zuniga
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acsencion Gomez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Escobedo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Ortiz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Macias
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Mesa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Baca
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Franco
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricarda Grajeda
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Armendariz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel nmi Rivera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Najera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrado Ortega
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Fields
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Villela
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reyes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Quilodran
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Meraz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Carbajal
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bouttarat Thonechanh
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose P Murgia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentin Anguinaga
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas nmi Jones
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pomposo Diaz, II
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elva Gallegos
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maira Guerra
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Henry
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genaro Gallegos Zamaripa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phouvieng Sourivong
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Escapita
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Espinoza
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnulfo Rodriguez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dario Reyes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel NMI Garcia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Galaviz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Orozco
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Flores
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Martinez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus M Carbajal
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus B Lujan
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pannyasy Vongsy
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier NMI Medina
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Ramon Saldivar
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Nevarez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro nmi Ortega
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Estrada
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Castaneda
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Burciaga
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark nmi Harris
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Contreras
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Blake
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabina Paz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Quintanilla
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Reyes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Alaniz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel nmn Martinez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Concepcion Garcia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gonzalez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel P Castro
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Vasquez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Tenorio
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esthela Dominguez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candalaria Galvan
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Barajas
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Talamantes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ortiz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Zamarippa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G Woods
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Parra
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Frescas
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ontiveros
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Najera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Lasley
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Young
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Lara
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Vera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Ramos
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L Canales
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis I Aguilar
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anarvol Vedoy
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfecto Rojas
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ausencia Espino
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Trevino
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Araceli Duran
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gallegos
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia NMI Rodriguez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Melger
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R Sanchez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Ruiz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Anchondo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sarimiento
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Cruz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Prado
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Ordonez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuelo Vargas
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Munoz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Murillo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezequiel Geurrero
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Najera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Parra
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Chacon
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Murga
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuela Aranda
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Sauseda
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Ronquillo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Aguilar
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genoveva Campbell
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvira Aldana
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H Guzman
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel E Cooper
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Ontiveros
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Carrasco
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loreto Sanchez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Ordonez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Armadillo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Botello
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Pinon
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Loya
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Romero
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose N Alanis
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Onofre
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Zubia Pinon
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Rivera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Borunda
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Garcia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locadio Lopez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan nmi Gonzalez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelo Dominguez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Avila
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emeterio Cabrera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sosa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Sanchez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Galaviz
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Delapena
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Quinonez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest W Green
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horacio Loya
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sintas
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Vargas
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Acosta
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renato Sanchez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco J Gutierrez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosabla Estrada
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Avila
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Calderon
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gamboa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McEwan
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Keopraseuth
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonlin Gonzalez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnulfo Garcia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stiles
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elva Trevino
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Regalada
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Oliva
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrado Arredondo
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan nmi Flores
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boualy Sysakayavong
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Martinez Padilla
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anson Washington
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Arrellanes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Mendoza
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Cabrera
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria nmi Ramirez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cozy Crain
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matilde Valdez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnulfo Sosa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen A Zamarippa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Martinez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeferino Lopez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rutilo Palomares
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Flores
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Venable
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Trevino
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Villalon
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Parra
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Flores
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gomez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramon Terrazas
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesenia Beltran
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gonzalez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Delarosa
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genaro nmi Hernandez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Mendoza
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hipolito Garcia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvira A Medrano
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalia Montes
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel A Hernandez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Vasquez
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan G Garcia
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L Fierro
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ponce
Represented By: Philip R Russ
Represented By: John L Lesly