Nash v. Chapa et al
Plaintiff: Joseph L Nash
Defendant: Robert E Reed, Aaron C Murcheski, Alberto Lara, James Dugar, Bahreldin Adamyagolois, Daisha B Simmons, Leticia Chapa and John Bristol
Case Number: 2:2018cv00149
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Amarillo Office
County: Hartley
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment Complaint filed by Joseph L Nash. (awc)
September 10, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Sep 10 16:56:50 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND re: #5 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/10/2018) (awc)
September 10, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Sep 10 16:37:16 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING FEE ORDER -- It is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. 2. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $0.14 and the agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward the amount of such initial partial filing fee forthwith. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) Motions terminated: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Joseph L Nash. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/10/2018) (awc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Joseph L Nash. (awc)
August 14, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of first page of file-marked complaint also mailed to plaintiff.) Tue Aug 14 14:49:46 CDT 2018 (crt)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Joseph L Nash. (awc)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Bahreldin Adamyagolois, John Bristol, Leticia Chapa, James Dugar, Alberto Lara, Aaron C Murcheski, Robert E Reed, Daisha B Simmons filed by Joseph L Nash. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (awc)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nash v. Chapa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron C Murcheski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bahreldin Adamyagolois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisha B Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Chapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bristol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?