West v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: David J West
Defendant: Martine Martinez, Mary Lou Robinson and Wylie Cruz
Case Number: 2:2018cv00167
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Fri Nov 2 14:28:44 CDT 2018 (crt)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - On October 1, 2018 the court docketed plaintiff's letter to the clerk requesting dismissal. The court interprets this pleading as a notice of voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Accordingly, the clerk of court is directed to close this action and terminate all pending motions. re: #11 Motion to Dismiss filed by David J West terminated. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/2/2018) (vls)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by David J West re: #4 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (awc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant David J West. New address: 120 E FM 544 Ste 72 #414 Murphy, TX 75094. (vls)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David J West (vls)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 COPY of letter addressed to Dept of Justice received from David J West. (awc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David J West. (awc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE filed by David J West. (awc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE filed by David J West. (awc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE filed by David J West. (awc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by David J West. (awc)
September 24, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Sep 24 10:56:50 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/24/2018) (djs)
September 10, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of first page of file-marked complaint also mailed to plaintiff.) Mon Sep 10 14:04:07 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Wylie Cruz, Martine Martinez, Mary Lou Robinson filed by David J West. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (awc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martine Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wylie Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?