Rodriguez v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Juan A. Rodriguez
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00241
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 Appendix in Support filed by Juan A. Rodriguez re #11 Response/Objection to Motion for a Lone Pine Order (Sassaman, Shawn)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Juan A. Rodriguez re: #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement & Entry of "Lone Pine" Case Management Order (Sassaman, Shawn)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/14/2019) (djs) Modified text on 2/14/2019 (djs).
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 2:18-CV-241-D-BP. (djs)
February 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Reno has notified the clerk that she must recuse. Therefore, via the direction of Chief Judge Lynn, Magistrate Judge Hal Ray has been selected for matters that may have been referred. (djs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement & Entry of "Lone Pine" Case Management Order filed by BNSF Railway Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Status Report, #2 Exhibit(s) Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Transcript, #4 Exhibit(s) Order) (Evans, Andrew)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew R Evans on behalf of BNSF Railway Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Evans, Andrew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Without Local Counsel filed by Juan A. Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sassaman, Shawn)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Juan A. Rodriguez. (Sassaman, Shawn)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/4/2019) (djs)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (vls)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (vls)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against BNSF Railway Company filed by Juan A. Rodriguez. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9665933) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Andrew R Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company
Represented By: Andrew R Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Shawn Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?