Priest v. Grazier et al

Plaintiff: John Priest
Defendant: Michael Fenwick, City of Amarillo and Logan Grazier
Case Number: 2:2019cv00004
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by John Priest re #16 Response/Objection to Defendant City of Armarillo's Motion Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Palmer, Scott)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by John Priest re: #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Palmer, Scott)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER - Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/18/2019. (See Order for Specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 2/14/2019) (vls)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/14/2019) (djs)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 2:19-CV-004-D-BQ. (djs)
February 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Reno has notified the clerk that she must recuse. Therefore, via the direction of Chief Judge Lynn, Magistrate Judge Gordon Bryant has been selected for matters that may have been referred. (djs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Amarillo. (McWilliams, Bryan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by City of Amarillo re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (McWilliams, Bryan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Amarillo Attorney Bryan Scott McWilliams added to party City of Amarillo(pty:dft) (McWilliams, Bryan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Fenwick. (Mayfield, Tod)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Michael Fenwick. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tod Mayfield added to party Michael Fenwick(pty:dft) (Mayfield, Tod)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Logan Grazier. (Loftin, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Logan Grazier. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael H Loftin added to party Logan Grazier(pty:dft) (Loftin, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/22/2019) (djs)
January 14, 2019 USB DataStickPro received from Mr. Priest on 01.14.2019. Placed in Clerk's office vault for safekeeping. (vls)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Amarillo, Michael Fenwick, Logan Grazier. (awc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
January 7, 2019 Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater added. (awc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Priest. (Roberts, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by John Priest. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9687870) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priest v. Grazier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fenwick
Represented By: Kristi R Weaber
Represented By: Tod Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Amarillo
Represented By: Leslie Spear Schmidt
Represented By: Marcus W Norris
Represented By: Bryan Scott McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Grazier
Represented By: Stephanie Jean James
Represented By: Michael H Loftin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Priest
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Represented By: James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?