Dobbs v. Ballew et al
Plaintiff: Casey Glynn Dobbs and Casey G Dobbs
Defendant: Shawn Ballew and Brent Warden
Case Number: 2:2019cv00037
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (awc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (awc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Complaint by Plaintiff Casey Glynn Dobbs. (Copy of Pro Se Instruction Sheet re copies mailed to plaintiff.) (awc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (vls)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (awc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Injunction filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (Magistrate judge's chambers notified.) (awc)
March 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of first page of file-marked complaint also mailed to plaintiff.) Mon Mar 4 13:18:35 CST 2019 (crt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Shawn Ballew, Brent Warden filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (awc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobbs v. Ballew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Glynn Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey G Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?