Washington v. Flenory et al
Plaintiff: Kaaream Washington
Defendant: Kendall T Richerson, Leslie Lindsey, Cipriano Garcia, Samuel Eilers, Aaron Herrera and Yolanda Flenory
Case Number: 2:2019cv00154
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Sep 20 15:30:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING FEE ORDER: It is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. 2. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $0.00 and the agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward the amount of such initial partial filing fee forthwith. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) Motions terminated: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaaream Washington. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/20/2019) (nhp)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Trust Account by Kaaream Washington TDCJ # 01644868. (nhp)
July 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page of complaint also mailed to Plaintiff) Tue Jul 30 09:41:29 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaaream Washington. (nhp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kaaream Washington. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nhp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (nhp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Flenory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall T Richerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipriano Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Eilers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Flenory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaaream Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?