Dobbs v. Smith
Petitioner: Casey Glynn Dobbs
Respondent: J Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv00161
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Public Docket Sheet included. Mon Sep 23 13:53:25 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Dismissing Case. On September 16, 2019, the Court docketed Plaintiff's letter to the Clerk requesting dismissal (Dkt. No. 14). The Court interprets this pleading as a self-executing notice of voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the filing of which divested the Court of jurisdiction. See Qureshi v. United States, 600 F.3d 523, 525 (5th Cir. 2010). The Clerk is therefore directed to close this action and terminate all pending motions. The Clerk shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the docket sheet in this matter. Copies of any orders or filings must be paid for by plaintiff in advance. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/23/2019) (daa) (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/23/2019) (daa).
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Copies of Record filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs (daa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration in Support filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs re: #12 MOTION Stay of State Court Proceedings. (nhp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Stay of State Court Proceedings filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (nhp)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs re #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (awc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (awc)
August 1, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8, 9. Thu Aug 1 13:35:35 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (nhp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)
August 1, 2019 New case number 2:19-cv-00161-M Dobbs v. Smith has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:19cv1810-L. Future filings should be made in the AMARILLO division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order transferring case to the Amarillo Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/1/2019) (rekc)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/1/2019) (rekc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. (zkc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (zkc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Casey Glynn Dobbs. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
July 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Tue Jul 30 14:07:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobbs v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Casey Glynn Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?