Williams v. Brumley et al
Plaintiff: Kurt Duane Williams
Defendant: Matthew Hand, Joel W Richardson, Ed Drain, Brian Thomas, Julie Smith and Scott Brumley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00173
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
2 Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Case Paperwork filed by Kurt Duane Williams. (nhp)
September 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Thu Sep 19 14:45:45 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER PERMITTING FILING IN FORMA PAUPERIS -- The Court has reviewed Williams's application and affidavit (ECF No. 10), and it hereby GRANTS Williams permission to proceed IFP in this Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915. Williams's initial "Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis" (ECF No. 2) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. re: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 9/19/2019) (awc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kurt Duane Williams. (nhp)
September 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Sep 5 15:55:43 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO COMPLETE FORM: It is hereby ORDERED that Williams shall complete the attached form and file it with the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiff shall file the completed form with the Clerk within ten (10) days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 9/5/2019) (nhp)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Reno has notified the clerk that she must recuse. Therefore, via the direction of Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk, Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr has been selected for matters that may have been referred. The Clerk has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 2:19-cv-00173-Z-BQ. (djs)
August 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Fri Aug 23 14:15:47 CDT 2019 (crt) Modified - copy of NEF showing transfer of case also mailed to plaintiff on 8/23/2019 (awc).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (awc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (awc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01898. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Texas. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/13/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/23/2019. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by KURT DUANE WILLIAMS.. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KURT DUANE WILLIAMS (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT BRUMLEY, ED DRAIN, MATTHEW HAND, JOEL W. RICHARDSON, JULIE SMITH filed by KURT DUANE WILLIAMS. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/24/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Brumley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel W Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Drain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Duane Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?