Williams v. Collier et al
Petitioner: LaVonte Dewayne Williams
Respondent: Bryan Collier, Teresia Coker and Ken Paxton
Case Number: 2:2020cv00183
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24,25. (Copy of NEF showing transfer of case also mailed to plaintiff.) Thu Jul 30 13:39:25 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 30, 2020 Filing 25 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (awc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 23 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern, Tyler Division; Case Number 6:20-cv-00123. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 30, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas Amarillo Division. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF TRANSFER re #1 Complaint filed by LaVonte Dewayne Williams. ORDERED that Plaintiffs lawsuit is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/30/2020. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by LaVonte Dewayne Williams. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #5 Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee, filed by LaVonte Dewayne Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Bryan Collier, Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leitch Hahn, Ann) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Exhibits filed by LaVonte Dewayne Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by LaVonte Dewayne Williams as to #16 Order to Answer and Scheduling Order; RECEIVED 5-21-20. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO ANSWER AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendants Bryan Collier and Ken Paxton, in their official capacities, shall have sixty days from the receipt hereof within which to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/12/20. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by LaVonte Dewayne Williams as to #11 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Received 4/28/2020. (ndc) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TERMINATING PARTY. Teresia Coker terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/6/2020. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bryan Collier, Ken Paxton, filed by LaVonte Dewayne Williams.(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Amended complaint due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/14/2020. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as premature #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/14/2020. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Order to Amend Complaint by LaVonte Dewayne Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by LaVonte Dewayne Williams as to #6 Order to Amend Complaint. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by LaVonte Dewayne Williams as to #5 Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS by LaVonte Dewayne Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Envelope(s))(gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have 30 days from receipt of this order to file an amended complaint on the standardized 1983 lawsuit form for prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/13/20. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. An initial partial filing fee of $2.95 shall be paid to the Clerk within 30 days from the receipt of this Order. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/13/20. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 12, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LaVonte Dewayne Williams. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaVonte Dewayne Williams. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teresia Coker, Bryan Collier, filed by LaVonte Dewayne Williams.(mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Collier
Represented By: Ann Leitch Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Teresia Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Ann Leitch Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LaVonte Dewayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?