Leal et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Kim Armstrong, Patrick Von Dohlen and Victor Leal
Defendant: Kent Sullivan, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States of America, Eugene Scalia, Alex M Azar, II and Texas Department of Insurance
Case Number: 2:2020cv00185
Filed: August 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kim Armstrong, Victor Leal, Patrick Von Dohlen (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney H Dustin Fillmore, III on behalf of Kim Armstrong, Victor Leal, Patrick Von Dohlen. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fillmore, H)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kent Sullivan, Texas Department of Insurance re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Bohuslav, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kent Sullivan, Texas Department of Insurance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew Tyler Bohuslav added to party Kent Sullivan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Tyler Bohuslav added to party Texas Department of Insurance(pty:dft) (Bohuslav, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendants (Fillmore, Charles) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (daa).
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kim Armstrong, Victor Leal, Patrick Von Dohlen. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kent Sullivan, Texas Department of Insurance. (awc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Steven T. Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (awc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
August 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar, II, Steven T. Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, Kent Sullivan, Texas Department of Insurance, United States of America filed by Victor Leal, Kim Armstrong, Patrick Von Dohlen. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11042547) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Cover Sheet) (Mitchell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leal et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Armstrong
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Represented By: Chris L Jensen
Represented By: Marvin W Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Von Dohlen
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Represented By: Chris L Jensen
Represented By: Marvin W Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Leal
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Represented By: Chris L Jensen
Represented By: Marvin W Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Sullivan
Represented By: William Sumner Macdaniel
Represented By: Matthew Tyler Bohuslav
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Scalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Insurance
Represented By: William Sumner Macdaniel
Represented By: Matthew Tyler Bohuslav
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?