Akins v. Valley Proteins, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David W Akins
Defendant: Valley Proteins Inc, LabCorp, HireRight LLC, Reina Marquez and Kelly Goodner
Case Number: 2:2021cv00193
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY filed by HireRight LLC re: #16 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Fuqua, Kelli)
October 29, 2021 Filing 23 OBJECTION filed by Kelly Goodner, LabCorp re: #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Gilmour, John)
October 29, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Joinder in Valley Proteins, Inc. and Reina Marquez Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by HireRight LLC (Fuqua, Kelli)
October 29, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Reina Marquez, Valley Proteins Inc re: #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Jansonius, John)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by David W Akins re: #16 Unopposed Motion for Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel, #19 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel [CORRECTED] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Akins, David) Modified entry relationship on 10/29/2021 (daa).
October 26, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel [CORRECTED] filed by Kelly Goodner, LabCorp (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gilmour, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Kelly Goodner, LabCorp (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gilmour, John)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Kelly Goodner, LabCorp re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT (Gilmour, John)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by HireRight LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Kelli C Fuqua added to party HireRight LLC (pty:dft) (Fuqua, Kelli) Modified title on 10/25/2021 (daa).
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY filed by Reina Marquez, Valley Proteins Inc re: #4 Motion to Dismiss (Jansonius, John) Modified document linkage on 10/22/2021 (daa).
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David W Akins re #11 Certificate of Service s/David W Akins (Akins, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by David W Akins re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT (Akins, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by David W Akins re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Akins, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David W Akins re #10 Amended Complaint,, #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Akins, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by David W Akins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Akins, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David W Akins with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Akins, David)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12265698) filed by LabCorp (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit(s) R. Steiner Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Robert Ira Steiner added to party LabCorp(pty:dft) (Steiner, Robert)
September 28, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Sep 28 09:42:46 CDT 2021 (crt)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelly Goodner, LabCorp. (Gilmour, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Kelly Goodner, LabCorp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney John DS Gilmour added to party Kelly Goodner, LabCorp (pty:dft) (Gilmour, John) Modified text on 10/25/2021 (daa).
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Valley Proteins Inc, Reina Marquez re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Jansonius, John) Added filer on 9/27/2021 (daa).
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Valley Proteins Inc, Reina Marquez with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jansonius, John) Added filer on 9/27/2021 (daa).
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reina Marquez, Valley Proteins, Inc.. (Jansonius, John)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Valley Proteins, Inc., Reina Marquez. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12227600) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Consent of HireRight, #2 Consent of Labcorp and Goodner, #3 Exhibit(s) Index and State Court Filings, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Jansonius, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akins v. Valley Proteins, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Proteins Inc
Represented By: John V Jansonius
Represented By: Graciela Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LabCorp
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Represented By: Robert Ira Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HireRight LLC
Represented By: Kelli C Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reina Marquez
Represented By: John V Jansonius
Represented By: Graciela Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Goodner
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Represented By: Robert Ira Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?