Kelso v. JPL Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Allen Kelso
Defendant: JPL Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00022
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE: The Court DIRECTS the United States District Clerk to close the case. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 4/13/2022) (daa)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Allen Kelso (Tharpe, Richard)
April 9, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to JPL Properties, LLC ; served on 4/4/2022. (Tharpe, Richard)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allen Kelso. (Tharpe, Richard)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JPL Properties, LLC. (daa)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPL Properties, LLC filed by Allen Kelso. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12625976) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Tharpe, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelso v. JPL Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Kelso
Represented By: Richard Bruce Tharpe
Represented By: James A Besselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPL Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?