Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Lucky Shot LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Kyaw Thu Ya, La Pham and Lucky Shot LLC doing business as Lucky Shot
Case Number: 2:2022cv00113
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to La Pham ; served on 7/1/2022. (King, Jamie)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kyaw Thu Ya ; served on 7/1/2022. (King, Jamie)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lucky Shot LLC ; served on 7/1/2022. (King, Jamie)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Substituted Service of Process. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/28/2022) (daa)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/24/2022) (daa)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #8 MOTION for Order of Substituted Service of Process on Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (King, Jamie)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Order of Substituted Service of Process on Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This action is hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Reno for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 6/21/2022) (daa)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Renee King for Mitzi S. Mayfield on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Renee King for Mitzi S. Mayfield on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lucky Shot LLC, La Pham, Kyaw Thu Ya. (nhp) (Main Document 4 replaced with corrected pdf on 6/1/2022) (nhp).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (King, Jamie)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12852066) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Lucky Shot LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: Mitzi S Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyaw Thu Ya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Shot LLC doing business as Lucky Shot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?