Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine et al v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine sued the U.S. Food and Drug Administration over its approval of mifepristone, a medication used to terminate a pregnancy. Plaintiff alleged that the FDA exceeded its regulatory authority to approve the drugs by using its accelerated drug approval authority, failed to study the safety of the drugs under the labeled conditions of use, and ignored the potential impacts of hormone-blocking regiment on adolescent girls.

Plaintiff: Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, Shaun Jester, D.O., Regina Frost-Clark, M.D., Tyler Johnson, D.O. and George Delgado, M.D.
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Robert M. Califf, M.D., Janet Woodcock, M.D., Patrizia Cavazzoni, M.D., U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra and US Food and Drug Administration
Intervenor Defendant: Danco Laboratories, LLC and Danco Laboratories LLC
Amicus Curiae: The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn, Doctors for America, American Center for Law and Justice, State of Missouri, Human Coalition, State of Mississippi, State of New York, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Kentucky, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, Life Collective Inc, Family Research Council, Judicial Watch Inc, Advancing American Freedom, Concerned Women for America, Greer Donley, Patricia Zettler, R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Murphy Klasing, Susan B. Anthony Pro-Life America, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, The National Catholic Bioethics Center, Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Benefits Association, Christ Medicus Foundation, 67 Members of Congress, American Medical Association, Society of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Gynecological & Obstetrical Society, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, Society of Family Planning, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Ethics and Public Policy Center, Texas Business Leaders, Charlotte Lozier Institute, Coalition For Jewish Values Healthcare Council and State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2022cv00223
Filed: November 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 03/15/2023 before Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mechelle Daniel, Telephone number 806.744.7667. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (155 pages) Redaction Request due 4/7/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2023. (kmd)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2023 re #6 Motion for Injunction. Written Order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Erik Baptist/Erin Hawley; Defense - Julie Straus Harris/Daniel Schwei Intervenor - Jessica Ellsworth. (Court Reporter: Mechelle Daniel) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 4:15. (vls)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF AUDIO STREAM AVAILABILITY: The audio broadcast for the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 at 9:00 AM will be live-streamed in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas, located at 1100 Commerce Street, Courtroom 1351, Dallas, TX 75242. No electronic devices will be permitted in the courtroom. No recording devices will be permitted in the courtroom. It is impermissible under Judicial Conference Policy and local rules of the court (see LCR 83.18 and Miscellaneous Order No. 63) to record or rebroadcast court proceedings. Violators will be subject to sanctions. (ctf)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 3-10-23 before Judge Kacsmaryk. Court Reporter/Transcriber Todd Anderson, Telephone number 214-753-2170. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (21 pages) Redaction Request due 4/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2023. (jta)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Brooke Nestler on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, US Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Nestler, Emily)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher A. Eiswerth on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, US Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Eiswerth, Christopher)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Schwei on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, US Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schwei, Daniel)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2023 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1st Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 3/13/2023) (nht)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Objection filed by News Media Coalition (Steffensen, Peter)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Blackmer Steffensen on behalf of News Media Coalition. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.). Party News Media Coalition added. (Steffensen, Peter)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk: Telephone Conference held on 3/10/2023. Written Order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Erik Baptist/Erin Hawley; Defense - Noah Katzen/Julie Straus Harris/Kate Talmor Intervenor - Jessica Ellsworth/Catherine Stetson/Ryan Patrick Brown/Kaitlyn Golden. (Court Reporter: Todd Anderson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :31. (vls)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, US Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Straus Harris, Julie)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #113 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua D. Bendor. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g).; granting #116 Motion for Leave to File. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/28/2023) (nht)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #112 Motion Join the Brief of Amici Curiae, Susan B. Anthony Pro-Life America, et. al. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/28/2023) (awc)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Appendix in Support filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO re #120 Reply, in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Baptist, Erik)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO re: #6 MOTION for Injunction (Baptist, Erik)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #111 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gene C. Schaerr. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/21/2023) (nht)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #107 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan McGuiggan. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/21/2023) (nht)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: On February 3, 2023, the Court ordered parties to submit separate briefs on whether the Court should consolidate the injunction hearing and the trial on the merits under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2). Having considered the briefing and relevant law, the Court determines that consolidation would not be appropriate in this case. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/21/2023) (nht)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Join Amicus Brief of Amici States New York, et al. In Support of Defendants filed by State of Arizona (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Join Amicus Brief of Amici States New York, et al. In Support of Defendants) (Bendor, Joshua)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Waive LR 83.10(A) Local Counsel Requirement filed by State of Arizona (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice and Motion to Waive LR 83.10(A) Local Counsel Requirement) (Bendor, Joshua)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 AMICUS BRIEF in Support filed by Ethics and Public Policy Center re #6 MOTION for Injunction Amicus Brief (Fillmore, Charles) Modified title on 2/23/2023 (nht).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13532651) filed by State of Arizona Attorney Joshua Bendor added to party State of Arizona(pty:am) (Bendor, Joshua)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION Join the Brief of Amici Curiae, Susan B. Anthony Pro-Life America, et. al. re #6 MOTION for Injunction , #82 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Coalition For Jewish Values Healthcare Council with Brief/Memorandum in Support.. Party Coalition for Jewish Values Healthcare Council added.Attorney Murphy S Klasing added to party Coalition For Jewish Values Healthcare Council(pty:am) (Klasing, Murphy)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13523664) filed by Charlotte Lozier Institute (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gene C Schaerr added to party Charlotte Lozier Institute(pty:am) (Schaerr, Gene)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AMICUS CURIAE Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by State of Missouri re #6 MOTION for Injunction (Divine, Joshua) Modified title on 2/14/2023 (daa).
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AMICUS BRIEF filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological & Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, Society of Family Planning, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Sherwood, Matthew) Modified title and linkage on 2/15/2023 (awc).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 AMICUS BRIEF filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Winson, Robert) Modified title and linkage on 2/16/2023 (nht).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13514248) filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological & Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, Society of Family Planning, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists. Attorney Megan McGuiggan added. (McGuiggan, Megan) Docket text modified on 2/14/2023 (twd).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS: On or before February 24, 2023, Plaintiffs may file one Reply that consolidates (1) Plaintiffs' reply to the FDA's response (ECF No. 28) and (2) Plaintiffs' reply to Danco's Response (ECF No. 50). The Court therefore STRIKES Plaintiffs' reply (ECF Nos. 76, 79) without prejudice to Plaintiffs re-filing a reply in accordance with this order. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/13/2023) (nht)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AMICUS CURIAE Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by American Center for Law and Justice re #6 MOTION for Injunction Amicus Brief of the ACLJ (White, Edward) Modified title on 2/16/2023 (nht).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas S Leatherbury on behalf of Doctors for America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Leatherbury, Thomas)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Charlotte Lozier Institute re #6 MOTION for Injunction (Amicus Brief) (Squiers, Cristina) Modified title on 2/15/2023 (awc).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMICUS BRIEF filed by State of New York re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Sherwin, Galen) Modified title and linkage on 2/15/2023 (awc).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #78 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #87 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #88 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #89 Motion for Leave to File; granting #90 Motion; granting #91 Motion for Leave to File; granting #97 Motion for Leave to File. NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS - IMPORTANT REMINDER: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). Amici are hereby ORDERED to promptly file their amicus brief with the Court. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/13/2023) (nht)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Amicus Brief filed by State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming re #6 MOTION for Injunction. (Matheny, Justin) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Amicus Brief filed by Doctors for America. (Morten, Christopher) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OBJECTION filed by Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, US Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD re: #32 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Talmor-DOJ, Kate)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Exceed Page Limit filed by Charlotte Lozier Institute with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Proposed Amicus Curiae Charlotte Lozier Institute in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order). Party Charlotte Lozier Institute added.Attorney Cristina Martinez Squiers added to party Charlotte Lozier Institute(pty:am) (Squiers, Cristina)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Amicus Brief filed by Human Coalition re #6 MOTION for Injunction. (Graves, Elissa) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Amicus Brief filed by Family Research Council re #6 MOTION for Injunction, #1 Complaint. (Smith, Michael) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #41 Motion to Waive Local Counsel ; granting #42 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #44 Motion to Waive Local Counsel ; granting #45 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #47 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #48 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #51 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #53 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #55 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #56 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #58 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #59 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #60 Motion to Waive Local Counsel ; granting #61 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #62 Motion to Waive Local Counsel ; granting #63 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #64 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #65 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #66 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #67 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #69 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #70 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #71 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #73 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #74 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #75 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #77 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #80 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; granting #81 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #83 Motion for Leave to File ; granting #86 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS - IMPORTANT REMINDER: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/10/2023) (daa)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kate Talmor-DOJ on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, US Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Talmor-DOJ, Kate)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Danco Laboratories LLC re #32 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, Notice of Danco's Position on Consolidation Under Rule 65(a)(2) (Ellsworth, Jessica)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Amici Curiae filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological & Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, Society of Family Planning, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sherwood, Matthew)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Texas Business Leaders (Sullivan, John)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Texas Business Leaders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Attorney John Clay Sullivan added. (pty:am) (Sullivan, John) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13510608) filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological & Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, Society of Family Planning, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists Attorney Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck added. (Aukland-Peck, Adam) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13510418) filed by American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, Society of Maternal and Fetal Medicine, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Gynecological & Obstetrical Society, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, Society of Family Planning, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists. Party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists added. Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added. (Selden, Shannon) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Carolyn McDonnell (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13510239) filed by 67 Members of Congress (Bustos, Fernando)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Appendix in Support filed by 67 Members of Congress re #84 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bustos, Fernando)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by 67 Members of Congress re #83 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Bustos, Fernando)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by 67 Members of Congress with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Fernando M Bustos added to party 67 Members of Congress(pty:am) (Bustos, Fernando)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Amicus Brief filed by Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Benefits Association, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, Christ Medicus Foundation, Susan B. Anthony Pro-Life America, The National Catholic Bioethics Center re #6 MOTION for Injunction . (Klasing, Murphy) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Murphy Klasing, Susan B. Anthony Pro-Life America, Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance, The National Catholic Bioethics Center, Catholic Bar Association, Catholic Benefits Association, Christ Medicus Foundation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Attorney Murphy S Klasing added. (Klasing, Murphy) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Guillaume Julian (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13510079) filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Winson, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 **STRICKEN per #106 ** Appendix in Support filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO re #76 Reply, in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Baptist, Erik) Modified on 2/13/2023 (nht).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13509981) filed by American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s)). Party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists added.Attorney Molly A Meegan added to party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists(pty:am) (Meegan, Molly) (Main Document 78 replaced with flattened document on 2/13/2023) (awc). (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened document on 2/13/2023) (awc).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Emile Katz (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13510042) filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Winson, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 **STRICKEN per #106 ** REPLY filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO re: #6 MOTION for Injunction (Baptist, Erik) Modified on 2/13/2023 (nht).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Beth Braiterman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13510021) filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Winson, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Julia F. Post (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13510002) filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Winson, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Robert A. Long (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13509987) filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Winson, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Denise Esposito (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13509965) filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Winson, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lewis A. Grossman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13509907) filed by R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Greer Donley, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters, Patricia Zettler (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Winson, Robert)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Food and Drug Law Scholars as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Greer Donley, Patricia Zettler, R. Alta Charo, I. Glenn Cohen, Marsha Cohen, Nathan Cortez, Rebecca Eisenberg, Henry Greely, George Horvath, Peter Barton Hutt, Joan Krause, Holly Fernandez Lynch, Elizabeth McCuskey, Jennifer Oliva, Jordan Paradise, Christopher Robertson, Joanna Sax, Allison Whelan, Diana Winters (Attachments: #1 Brief of Food and Drug Law Scholars as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Attorney Robert John Winson added. (Winson, Robert) Docket text modified on 2/13/2023 (twd).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13509192) filed by Concerned Women for America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae, #2 Amicus Curiae Brief). Party Concerned Women for America added.Attorney Mario Diaz added to party Concerned Women for America(pty:am) (Diaz, Mario)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO re #32 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, re Consolidating the Preliminary Injunction Hearing with a Trial on the Merits Under Rule 65(a)(2) (Blake, Julie)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13509386) filed by Advancing American Freedom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Good Standing Virginia cert.) (Wheat, Marc)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File AAF Amicus Brief filed by Advancing American Freedom with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) AAF Amicus brief). Party Advancing American Freedom added.Attorney Marc Wheat added to party Advancing American Freedom(pty:am) (Wheat, Marc)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File An Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs filed by Judicial Watch with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Curiae Brief of Judicial Watch, Inc. in Support of Plaintifss, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix to Amicus Curiae Brief of Judicial Watch in Support of Plaintiffs, #3 Proposed Order) (Di Liberto, Meredith)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Waive Requirement for Local Counsel filed by Judicial Watch (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Judicial Watch, Inc. added.Attorney Meredith Di Liberto added to party Judicial Watch(pty:am) (Di Liberto, Meredith)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae brief filed by Family Research Council with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION Waive Local Counsel Requirement of LR 83.10 filed by Family Research Council (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13508815) filed by Family Research Council (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Family Research Council added.Attorney Michael F Smith added to party Family Research Council(pty:am) (Smith, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION Waiver of Local Rule 83.10(a) filed by Life Collective Inc. (McCarty, Darren)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of New York with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Sherwin, Galen)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Life Collective Inc. filed by Life Collective Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Amicus Brief). Party Life Collective Inc. added.Attorney Darren L McCarty added to party Life Collective Inc.(pty:am) (McCarty, Darren)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13508285) filed by State of New York (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Galen Sherwin added to party State of New York(pty:am) (Sherwin, Galen)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief on Behalf of Ethics and Public Policy Center in Support of Plaintiffs filed by Ethics and Public Policy Center with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Brief on Behalf of Ethics and Public Policy Center in Support of Plaintiffs, #2 Proposed Order) (Fillmore, Charles)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by State of Mississippi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (Matheny, Justin)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney M. Edward Whelan III (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13508325) filed by Ethics and Public Policy Center (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Ethics and Public Policy Center added.Attorney Charles W Fillmore added to party Ethics and Public Policy Center(pty:!!!) (Fillmore, Charles) (Main Document 54 replaced on 2/10/2023) (daa). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/10/2023) (daa).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by State of Mississippi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party States of Mississippi, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Iowa, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and Wyoming added.Attorney Justin Lee Matheny added to party State of Mississippi(pty:am) (Matheny, Justin)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Appendix in Support filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC re #50 Response/Objection to Plaintif's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Brown, Ryan)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae filed by Human Coalition (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (Graves, Elissa)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC re: #6 MOTION for Injunction (Brown, Ryan)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elissa Michelle Graves on behalf of Human Coalition. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Graves, Elissa)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Attachment: Amicus Brief, #3 Attachment: Appendix) (Divine, Joshua)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Divine, Joshua)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13507946) filed by State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party State of Missouri added.Attorney Joshua Divine added to party State of Missouri(pty:am) (Divine, Joshua)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Center for Law and Justice (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (White, Edward)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Waive Local Rule 83.10(a) (Unopposed) filed by American Center for Law and Justice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Edward Lawrence White, III added to party American Center for Law and Justice(pty:am) (White, Edward)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: On February 6, 2023, the Court granted Danco Laboratories, LLC's ("Danco") motion to intervene. ECF No. 33. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS Danco to promptly file its brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. 19-1 ). Plaintiffs may file any reply to Defendants' responses to the motion for preliminary injunction on or before February 24, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/9/2023) (daa)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Doctors for America (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief of Doctors for America, #2 Proposed Order) (Morten, Christopher)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by Doctors for America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morten, Christopher)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13504121) filed by Doctors for America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Doctors for America added.Attorney Christopher Morten added to party Doctors for America(pty:am) (Morten, Christopher)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Lynn Ellsworth. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (daa)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kaitlyn Golden. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (daa)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip Katz. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (daa)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marlan Golden. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (daa)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lynn Whipkey Mehler. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (daa)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catherine Emily Stetson. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (daa)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #19 Danco Laboratories, LLC's ("Danco") Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (daa)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: On or before February 10, 2023, the parties are ORDERED to submit separate briefs on whether the Court should consolidate the injunction hearing and the trial on the merits pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/3/2023) (awc)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMICUS Brief in Support filed by The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn re #1 Complaint. (daa)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #17 Motion ; granting #18 The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn's Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Temporary Injunction. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 1/17/2023) (daa)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Darald John Schaffer, Michael S Jennings. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 1/17/2023) (daa)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY EMAIL*** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Katzen, #2 Exhibit(s) Lindo, #3 Exhibit(s) Ireland, #4 Exhibit(s) Kieltyka, #5 Exhibit(s) Zite, #6 Exhibit(s) Glaser, #7 Exhibit(s) McHugh) (twd)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Catherine Stetson (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13442104) filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lynn Mehler (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13442092) filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Marlan Golden (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13442066) filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Philip Katz (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13442025) filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kaitlyn Golden (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13442009) filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jessica Ellsworth (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13441871) filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Brown, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danco Laboratories, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Brown, Ryan) (Main Document 21 replaced with flattened image on 1/17/2023) (nht).
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC re #19 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene (Brown, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Danco Laboratories, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Danco's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Appendix, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Party Danco Laboratories, LLC added.Attorney Ryan Patrick Brown added to party Danco Laboratories, LLC(pty:intvd) (Brown, Ryan)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief) (Schaffer, Darald)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Waive Local Counsel Requirement re #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13426239) filed by The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn (Schaffer, Darald)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13426239) filed by The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificates of Good Standing)Attorney Darald John Schaffer added to party The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn(pty:am) (Schaffer, Darald)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Consent Motion for Leave to File Briefs with Extended Page Limits. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 1/3/2023) (daa)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Briefs With Extended Page Limits filed by Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Katzen, Noah)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines and Set Briefing Schedule. Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 6) on or before January 13, 2023. Plaintiffs may reply to Defendants' response on or before February 10, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 12/8/2022) (daa)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Katzen, Noah)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noah T Katzen on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Katzen, Noah)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin Hawley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 12/1/2022) (daa)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Erin Morrow Hawley (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ATXNDC-13334273) filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Payment Receipt) (Baptist, Erik) Modified to add payment information on 12/1/2022 (cea).
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Appendix in Support filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO re #6 MOTION for Injunction , #7 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: #1 Appendix pt. 2, #2 Appendix pt. 3, #3 Appendix pt. 4) (Baptist, Erik)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO re #6 MOTION for Injunction (Baptist, Erik)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Baptist, Erik) Modified title on 12/8/2022 (daa).
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (nht)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nht)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Robert M. Califf, #2 Summons for Janet Woodcock, #3 Summons for Patrizia Cavazzoni, #4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #5 Summons for Xavier Becerra, #6 Summons for US Attorney Chad Meacham, #7 Summons for USAG Merrick Garland) (Baptist, Erik)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, American College of Pediatricians, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, Shaun Jester, DO, Tyler Johnson, DO. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Baptist, Erik)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Robert M. Califf, MD, Patrizia Cavazzoni, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Food and Drug Administration, Janet Woodcock, MD filed by George Delgado, MD, Regina Frost-Clark, MD, American College of Pediatricians, American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical & Dental Associations, Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, Tyler Johnson, DO, Shaun Jester, DO. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13312692) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10, #12 Exhibit(s) 11, #13 Exhibit(s) 12, #14 Exhibit(s) 13, #15 Exhibit(s) 14, #16 Exhibit(s) 15, #17 Exhibit(s) 16, #18 Exhibit(s) 17, #19 Exhibit(s) 18, #20 Exhibit(s) 19, #21 Exhibit(s) 20, #22 Exhibit(s) 21, #23 Exhibit(s) 22, #24 Exhibit(s) 23, #25 Exhibit(s) 24, #26 Exhibit(s) 25, #27 Exhibit(s) 26, #28 Exhibit(s) 27, #29 Exhibit(s) 28, #30 Exhibit(s) 29, #31 Exhibit(s) 30, #32 Exhibit(s) 31, #33 Exhibit(s) 32, #34 Exhibit(s) 33, #35 Exhibit(s) 34, #36 Exhibit(s) 35, #37 Exhibit(s) 36, #38 Exhibit(s) 37, #39 Exhibit(s) 38, #40 Exhibit(s) 39, #41 Exhibit(s) 40, #42 Exhibit(s) 41, #43 Exhibit(s) 42, #44 Exhibit(s) 43, #45 Exhibit(s) 44, #46 Exhibit(s) 45, #47 Exhibit(s) 46, #48 Exhibit(s) 47, #49 Exhibit(s) 48, #50 Exhibit(s) 49, #51 Exhibit(s) 50, #52 Exhibit(s) 51, #53 Exhibit(s) 52, #54 Cover Sheet) (Baptist, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine et al v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American College of Pediatricians
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Medical & Dental Associations
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Jester, D.O.
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Frost-Clark, M.D.
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Johnson, D.O.
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Delgado, M.D.
Represented By: Christian D Stewart
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Erik Christopher Baptist
Represented By: Erica Steinmiller-Perdomo
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Matthew S Bowman
Represented By: Erin Morrow Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Califf, M.D.
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Woodcock, M.D.
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrizia Cavazzoni, M.D.
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Represented By: Kate Talmor-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Danco Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Danco Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Represented By: Lynn Whipkey Mehler
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Represented By: Kaitlyn Golden
Represented By: Marlan Golden
Represented By: Philip Katz
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Chattanooga National Memorial for the Unborn
Represented By: Darald John Schaffer
Represented By: Michael S Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Doctors for America
Represented By: Christopher Morten
Represented By: Thomas S Leatherbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Center for Law and Justice
Represented By: Edward Lawrence White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Missouri
Represented By: Joshua Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Human Coalition
Represented By: Elissa Michelle Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New York
Represented By: Galen Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alabama
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alaska
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Florida
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Georgia
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Idaho
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Indiana
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Iowa
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kansas
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kentucky
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Montana
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Ohio
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Texas
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Utah
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Life Collective Inc
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Family Research Council
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Judicial Watch Inc
Represented By: Meredith Di Liberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Advancing American Freedom
Represented By: Marc Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Concerned Women for America
Represented By: Mario Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greer Donley
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Patricia Zettler
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: R. Alta Charo
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: I. Glenn Cohen
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marsha Cohen
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nathan Cortez
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rebecca Eisenberg
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Henry Greely
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: George Horvath
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Barton Hutt
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joan Krause
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Holly Fernandez Lynch
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elizabeth McCuskey
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jennifer Oliva
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jordan Paradise
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Christopher Robertson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joanna Sax
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Allison Whelan
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Diana Winters
Represented By: Emile Katz
Represented By: Julia F Post
Represented By: Robert John Winson
Represented By: Alysia Brianna Cordova
Represented By: Beth E Braiterman
Represented By: Denise Esposito
Represented By: Guillaume Julian
Represented By: Lewis A Grossman
Represented By: Richard Biggs
Represented By: Robert A Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Murphy Klasing
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Susan B. Anthony Pro-Life America
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Health Care Leadership Alliance
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Catholic Bioethics Center
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Bar Association
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Benefits Association
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Christ Medicus Foundation
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 67 Members of Congress
Represented By: Fernando M Bustos
Represented By: Carolyn McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of Maternal and Fetal Medicine
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Family Physicians
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Gynecological & Obstetrical Society
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society for Reproductive Medicine
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of Family Planning
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of Gynecologic Oncology
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists
Represented By: Adam Bresler Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ethics and Public Policy Center
Represented By: M Edward Whelan
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas Business Leaders
Represented By: John Clay Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charlotte Lozier Institute
Represented By: Cristina Martinez Squiers
Represented By: Gene C Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition For Jewish Values Healthcare Council
Represented By: Murphy S Klasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arizona
Represented By: Joshua Bendor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?