State of Utah et al v. Walsh et al
Plaintiff: State of Utah, State of Texas, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Louisiana, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Idaho, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, Western Energy Alliance, James R. Copland, Alex L. Fairly and State of Oklahoma
Defendant: Martin Walsh, Secretary of Labor, U. S. Department of Labor and Martin J Walsh
Not Classified By Court: State of Iowa
Case Number: 2:2023cv00016
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY filed by U. S. Department of Labor, Martin J Walsh re: #15 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Snyder, Cassandra)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lindsey Keiser. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 3/13/2023) (nht)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13581239) filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Lindsey Keiser added to party Commonwealth of Kentucky(pty:pla) (Keiser, Lindsey)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #59 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin M. Gallagher. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 3/6/2023) (nht)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #58 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew N. Ferguson. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 3/6/2023) (nht)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neville S. Hedley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 3/6/2023) (nht)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney R Titus on behalf of State of North Dakota. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Titus, Courtney)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of State of Arkansas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jacobs, Dylan)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13557840) filed by Commonwealth of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Kevin Michael Gallagher added to party Commonwealth of Virginia(pty:pla) (Gallagher, Kevin)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13557669) filed by Commonwealth of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Andrew N Ferguson added to party Commonwealth of Virginia(pty:pla) (Ferguson, Andrew)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Williams. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/28/2023) (nht)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Courtney R. Titus. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/28/2023) (nht)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, James R. Copland, Alex L. Fairly, Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance re: #15 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Hearing Transcript, #2 Proposed Order) (Olson, Leif)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that Defendants file any response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on or before March 28, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/28/2023) (awc)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin J Hofmeister on behalf of State of Alaska. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hofmeister, Benjamin)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13552132) filed by James R. Copland, Alex L. Fairly (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Supplement to Pro Hac Application Question 5, #2 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Neville Hedley added to party James R. Copland(pty:pla), Attorney Neville Hedley added to party Alex L. Fairly(pty:pla) (Hedley, Neville)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Edward Hart on behalf of State of Florida. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hart, Joseph)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Paul West on behalf of State of Oklahoma. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (West, Zachary)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Scott St. John on behalf of State of Louisiana. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (St. John, Joseph)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of JOINDER re: #39 MOTION for Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Alex L. Fairly, State of Oklahoma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Fairly Declaration) (St John, Anna)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by State of New Hampshire, State of Alabama, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Mississippi, State of Utah, State of Missouri, Western Energy Alliance, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Wyoming, State of Tennessee, Liberty Energy Inc., State of Nebraska, State of Iowa, State of South Carolina, State of Florida, James R. Copland, State of Georgia, State of North Dakota, State of Idaho, State of Ohio, Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Louisiana, State of Arkansas, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Alaska, State of Montana, Commonwealth of Virginia, Alex L. Fairly, State of Oklahoma. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (St John, Anna)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13549561) filed by State of North Dakota (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Attachment 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Admission)Attorney Courtney R Titus added to party State of North Dakota(pty:pla) (Titus, Courtney) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened document on 2/28/2023) (awc). Modified text as to payment information on 2/28/2023 (awc).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa A Holyoak on behalf of State of Utah. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Holyoak, Melissa)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr on behalf of State of Alabama. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (LaCour, Edmund)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Lee Matheny on behalf of State of Mississippi. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Matheny, Justin)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #39 MOTION for Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by U. S. Department of Labor, Martin J Walsh (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vigen-DOJ, Leslie)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Michael Flowers on behalf of State of Ohio. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Flowers, Benjamin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13543735) filed by State of West Virginia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Good Standing Certificate)Attorney Michael Ray Williams added to party State of West Virginia(pty:pla) (Williams, Michael)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, James R. Copland, Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) (Olson, Leif)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiffs to promptly file the attached motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 31-1). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/24/2023) (nht)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #5 , #9 , #10 , #12 , #13 , #18 , #21 , #22 , #23 , #27 , #32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/23/2023) (nht)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Martin J Walsh ; served on 2/9/2023. (Olson, Leif)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U. S. Department of Labor ; served on 2/9/2023. (Olson, Leif)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Erratum re: #31 MOTION exceed page limitation for motion for PI filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, James R. Copland, Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Olson, Leif)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13533950) filed by State of Wyoming (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Ryan Schelhaas added to party State of Wyoming(pty:pla) (Schelhaas, Ryan)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION exceed page limitation for motion for PI filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, James R. Copland, Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Motion for PI, #2 Appendix to Motion for PI, #3 Proposed PI, #4 Proposed Order) (Olson, Leif)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hamilton on behalf of State of Nebraska. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hamilton, Eric)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Divine on behalf of State of Missouri. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Divine, Joshua)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State of Missouri. Amendment to #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13483495). . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanahan, Maria)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by State of Indiana Attorney Thomas Molnar Fisher added to party State of Indiana(pty:pla) (Fisher, Thomas)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Berry on behalf of Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, Western Energy Alliance. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Berry, Jonathan)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Kelson on behalf of Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, Western Energy Alliance. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kelson, Jared)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna St John on behalf of James R. Copland. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (St John, Anna)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13528242) filed by State of Kansas (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing from Clerk of Kansas Supreme Court, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission PHV)Attorney Jesse Burris added to party State of Kansas(pty:pla) (Burris, Jesse)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13528197) filed by State of Alaska (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Benjamin J Hofmeister added to party State of Alaska(pty:pla) (Hofmeister, Benjamin)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13527929) filed by State of South Carolina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Hydrick, Thomas)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State of Tennessee. Amendment to #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13495035). . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit(s) List of Admissions, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Krimm, Gabriel)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Scott Flow on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, James R. Copland, Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Flow, Franklin)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13515411) filed by State of Idaho (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney David M.S. Dewhirst added to party State of Idaho(pty:pla) (Dewhirst, David)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark W Dell'Orfano on behalf of State of New Hampshire. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dell'Orfano, Mark)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cassandra Marie Snyder on behalf of U. S. Department of Labor, Martin J Walsh. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Snyder, Cassandra)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by U. S. Department of Labor, Martin J Walsh with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vigen-DOJ, Leslie)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie Cooper Vigen-DOJ on behalf of U. S. Department of Labor, Martin J Walsh. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vigen-DOJ, Leslie)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13498834) filed by State of West Virginia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Good Standing Certificate)Attorney Lindsay Sara See added to party State of West Virginia(pty:pla) (See, Lindsay)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13496968) filed by State of Georgia Attorney Stephen John Petrany added to party State of Georgia(pty:pla) (Petrany, Stephen)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court will again defer ruling on the Application until Missouri complies with the Court's prior order. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/6/2023) (nht)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13495404) filed by State of Montana (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Corrigan, Christian)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13495035) filed by State of Tennessee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit(s) List of Admissions, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Gabriel Krimm added to party State of Tennessee(pty:pla) (Krimm, Gabriel) (Attachment 3 replaced with flattened document on 2/7/2023) (awc).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State of Missouri. Amendment to #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13483495). . (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Lanahan, Maria)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Francis Reitz on behalf of State of Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Reitz, Aaron)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Missouri is ORDERED to obtain local counsel consistent with Local Rule 83.1O(a) or file for leave to proceed without local counsel supported by good cause. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/1/2023) (nht)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13483495) filed by State of Missouri (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Maria Lanahan added to party State of Missouri(pty:pla) (Lanahan, Maria)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to U. S. Department of Labor, Martin J Walsh, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (awc)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Virginia, James R. Copland, Liberty Energy Inc., Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Olson, Leif)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by State of Georgia, State of New Hampshire, State of Alabama, State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of Utah, State of Missouri, Western Energy Alliance, State of Ohio, State of Idaho, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Liberty Oilfield Services LLC, State of Wyoming, State of Tennessee, State of Louisiana, Liberty Energy Inc., State of Arkansas, State of Indiana, State of Nebraska, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Alaska, State of South Carolina, State of Montana, State of Florida, James R. Copland, Commonwealth of Virginia. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13473468) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement Attachment A, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Attachment B) (Olson, Leif)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Utah et al v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Melissa A Holyoak
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Aaron Francis Reitz
Represented By: Leif A Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Andrew N Ferguson
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: Benjamin J Hofmeister
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Joseph Edward Hart
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: David M.S. Dewhirst
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Kansas
Represented By: Jesse Burris
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Lindsey Keiser
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Justin Lee Matheny
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Joshua Divine
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Maria Lanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Eric Hamilton
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Mark W Dell'Orfano
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Courtney R Titus
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Thomas T. Hydrick
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Gabriel Krimm
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Michael Ray Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Ryan Schelhaas
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Energy Inc.
Represented By: Jared Kelson
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Represented By: Jared Kelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Jared Kelson
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Jonathan Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Copland
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Neville Hedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex L. Fairly
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Franklin Scott Flow
Represented By: Neville Hedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Walsh, Secretary of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen-DOJ
Represented By: Cassandra Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J Walsh
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen-DOJ
Represented By: Cassandra Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?