Mary Kay Inc v. Weber et al

Plaintiff: Mary Kay Inc
Defendant: Amy L Weber, Scott J Weber and Touch of Pink Cosmetics
Case Number: 3:2008cv00776
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: A. Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Jeff Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 104 Motion for Judgment, granting in part and denying in part Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by Mary Kay Inc. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/29/2009) (klm)
August 14, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying 110 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by Scott J Weber, Amy L Weber, Touch of Pink Cosmetics. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 08/14/09) (lmp)
February 20, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Scott J Weber, Amy L Weber, Touch of Pink Cosmetics; granting in part 50 Motion to Strike the Expert Testimony Presented by Van Liere filed by Scott J Weber, Amy L Weber, Touch of Pink Cosmetics. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/20/09) (klm)
February 13, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 61 Motion to Continue, filed by Scott J Weber, Amy L Weber, Touch of Pink Cosmetics [see Opinion for specifics]. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/13/2009) (caw)
December 29, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Order. In a joint status report filed on December 22, 2008, plaintiff asks the court to compel defendants to identify the names and contact information for certain third-party witnesses revealed during a recent mediation session and to produce emails, correspondence, and statements between defendants and those witnesses. Defendants shall comply with this order by January 16, 2009. (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeff Kaplan on 12/29/08) (lmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mary Kay Inc v. Weber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Inc
Represented By: Sara Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touch of Pink Cosmetics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?