Murphy v. Thaler, Director TDCJ-CID

Petitioner: Patrick Henry Murphy
Respondent: Nathaniel Quarterman
Case Number: 3:2009cv01368
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Jeff Kaplan
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 121 Motion to Alter Judgment filed by Patrick Henry Murphy. The court denies Murphy's Motion to Alter or Amend this Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying Relief on Murphy's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 121 ). The court directs the clerk of court to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/15/2017) (aaa)
March 31, 2017 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER accepts 113 Findings and Recommendations, re: 18 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Patrick Henry Murphy. The court overrules Murphy's 115 Objections, denies Murphy's 18 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus; and dismisses with prejudice this action. The court denies a certificate of appealability. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2017) (epm)
September 25, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part, denying in part 65 MOTION to cancel evidentiary hearing and Alternative MOTION in Limine to Limit the Scope of Evidentiary Development. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 9/25/2014) (mcrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Thaler, Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Henry Murphy
Represented By: Allan L Fishburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathaniel Quarterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?