Simms v. Jones et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that some Super Bowl XLV ticket holders were assigned temporary metal fold out chairs with obstructed views of the stadium's video board, while others were denied seating altogether because of incomplete installation of temporary bleachers, which were deemed unsafe and unusable.

Plaintiff: Steve Simms, Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Bruce Ibe, Dean Hoffman, Constance Young, Robert Fortune and Jason McLear
Defendant: Jerral Wayne Jones, Jerry Jones, Blue & Silver Inc, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Cowboys Stadium LP, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC and National Football League
Petitioner: Charlotte Jones Anderson, Brett Daniels and Stephen Jones
Consolidated Plaintiff: Ken Laffin, David Wanta and Rebecca Burgwin
Interested Party: Joseph Sipes, Maryanne Coronna, Populous Inc and Ann Bihari
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Intervenor: Scott Suprina
Case Number: 3:2011cv00248
Filed: February 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 USCA5 Bill of Costs. (axm)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to #458 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 10/3/2016. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at #Exhibit Guide). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (axm)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re #458 Notice of Appeal. AFFIRM. (axm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The courtroom in which this case will be tried, and in which any motion that is set for hearing will be heard, has electronic equipment to assist in the expeditious presentation of the case and making of the record. Descriptions of this equipment and training resources for lawyers are available on the Court's website, http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judge-lynns-courtroom. The Court requires that all persons planning to use the equipment schedule training through the Court's Information Technology Department prior to the beginning of any trial or motion hearing, by contacting Paul Hertel at 214-753-2226 or Paul Slavonik at 214-753-2232. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/19/2016) (gmg)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 AMENDED ORDER: Plaintiff Constance Young's Motion to Deny Taxation of Costs #489 , is GRANTED IN PART, the NFL's Motion for Costs #476 , is GRANTED IN PART, and the NFLs Motion to Deny or Retax Costs #502 , is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/29/2016) (mem)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 516 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, David Wanta, Jason McLear re: #509 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Avenatti, Michael) Modified filers on 1/22/2016 (jrr).
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #512 Response/Objection, #511 Response/Objection (Gold, Daniel)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #510 Response/Objection, (Gold, Daniel)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTE: The documents attached were originally available in paper format only and are now attached here for electronic viewing in the clerk's office. Content includes items referenced in docket entries as -in paper- or -too large- etc. They were scanned in chronological order but are not separated with individual hyperlinks. The viewer is advised to scroll through content in order to locate requested material. (ali)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 512 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #511 Response/Objection (Avenatti, Michael)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 511 OBJECTION filed by National Football League re: #509 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Gold, Daniel)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 510 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #509 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2015 (jrr). Modified filers on 12/18/2015 (jrr).
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ***VACATED per Amended Order #517 *** ORDER: Plaintiff Constance Young's Motion #489 to Deny Taxation of Costs is GRANTED IN PART, the NFL's Motion #476 for Costs is GRANTED, and the NFL's Motion #502 to Deny or Retax Costs is GRANTED IN PART. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/3/2015) (mcrd) Modified text on 8/1/2016 (mem).
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10242 (related to #458 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so, since the USCA5 briefing deadline has now been set. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 508 Received letter from USCA5: The court has granted the opposed motion of Appellee National Football League (NFL) to supplement the record with documents 494-507 filed in the district court record after the record was transmitted in this case. (svc)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 507 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #502 MOTION to Deny or Retax Costs re #500 Costs Taxed (Behrens, R)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta re #505 Response/Objection to Defendant NFL's Motion to Deny or Retax Costs and Objection to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs (Avenatti, Michael)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 505 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta re: #502 MOTION to Deny or Retax Costs re #500 Costs Taxed (Avenatti, Michael)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 504 Order Referring Defendant NFL's #502 Motion to Deny or Retax Costs and Objection to Plaintiffs' #496 Bill of Costs to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/8/2015) (twd)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #502 MOTION to Deny or Retax Costs re #500 Costs Taxed (Behrens, R)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MOTION to Deny or Retax Costs re #500 Costs Taxed and Objections to #496 Plaintiffs' Bill of Cost filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Behrens, R) Modified on 6/8/2015 (svc).
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 501 REPLY filed by Constance Young re: #489 MOTION Deny Taxation of Costs re #485 Costs Taxed (Avenatti, Michael)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Costs Taxed in amount of $83,339.52 against National Football League. (bdb)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10242 (related to #458 appeal): transmitted to Farbod Farnia on disk only by mail. (svc)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10242 (related to #458 appeal): transmitted to Eagan Avenatti LLP on disk only by mail. (svc)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 499 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #476 MOTION for Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(d) (Behrens, R)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #497 Response/Objection (Behrens, R)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 497 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #489 MOTION Deny Taxation of Costs re #485 Costs Taxed (Behrens, R)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 496 BILL OF COSTS by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Michael J. Avenatti, #2 Affidavit(s) of Christopher Scott Ayres) (Avenatti, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10242 (related to #458 appeal): transmitted to Haynes & Boone on disk only by mail. (svc)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10242 (related to #458 appeal): Record consisting of: ECF electronic record, 16 Volume(s) electronic transcript, original exhibits(not imaged), Sealed or ex parte electronic documents (circuit approval is required for access). To request a copy of the record, #contact the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 495 STIPULATION Regarding Certain Deadlines by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Gold, Daniel)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER denying #491 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Appeal. The Court will give Plaintiffs an extension up to and including May 15, 2015 to move for attorney's fees. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/7/2015) (aaa)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 493 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #491 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Appeal by Michael J Avenatti on behalf of Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta (Avenatti, Michael)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta re #491 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Appeal (Avenatti, Michael)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Appeal filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Order Referring Motion. re: #489 MOTION Deny Taxation of Costs re #485 Costs Taxed Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/1/2015) (ndt)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MOTION Deny Taxation of Costs re #485 Costs Taxed filed by Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 488 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Robert Fortune, Bruce Ibe, David Wanta re: #476 MOTION for Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(d) (Avenatti, Michael)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER granting #482 Unopposed Motion to Intervene. Mr. Suprina may intervene in this action for the limited purpose of obtaining reimbursement for reasonable costs incurred under 28 U.S.C. 1821(c). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/27/2015) (tln)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 486 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #482 MOTION to Intervene by Stephen L Jones on behalf of Scott Suprina (Jones, Stephen)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Costs Taxed in amount of $39,380.66 against Constance Young. (tln)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on February 20, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (96 pages) Redaction Request due 5/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (dkj)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Transcript Order Form Received at USCA5 4/6/15: re #458 Notice of Appeal, transcript requested by plaintiffs' for 2/20/15 Telephone Confernce, 3/2/15 - 3/12/15 Jury Trial. Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson.) (svc)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION to Intervene filed by Scott Suprina with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Jones, Stephen)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 481 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen L Jones on behalf of Scott Suprina. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jones, Stephen) Modified on 4/17/2015 (svc).
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER Referring to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver #476 MOTION for Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(d). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/10/2015) (skt)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 479 BILL OF COSTS as to Plaintiff Constance Young by National Football League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Excerpt of Trial Transcript, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Declaration of R. Thaddeus Behrens, #3 Exhibit(s) A to Behrens Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) B to Behrens Declaration, #5 Exhibit(s) C to Behrens Declaration, #6 Exhibit(s) D to Behrens Declaration, #7 Exhibit(s) E to Behrens Declaration) (Behrens, R)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 478 BILL OF COSTS as to Plaintiffs Bruce Ibe, David Wanta, and Robert Fortune by National Football League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Declaration of R. Thaddeus Behrens, #2 Exhibit(s) A to Behrens Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) B to Behrens Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) C to Behrens Declaration, #5 Exhibit(s) D to Behrens Declaration, #6 Exhibit(s) E to Behrens Declaration) (Behrens, R)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #476 MOTION for Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(d) (Behrens, R)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MOTION for Costs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(d) filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Behrens, R)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Transcript Order Form: re #458 Notice of Appeal, transcript requested by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Jason McLear for Pretrial Telephone Conference held 2/20/2015, Jury Trial held 3/2/2015 - 3/6/2015 and 3/9/2015 - 3/12/2015 Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson.) (bdb)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 474 Transcript Order Form: re #458 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested. (bdb)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiffs may apply to the clerk for taxation of their costs awarded in the Court's March 25, 2015 Judgment [Dkt. No. 456] on or before May 8, 2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/6/2015) (chmb)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Transcript Order Form: re #458 Notice of Appeal, transcript requested by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta for Pretrial Telephone Conference held 2/20/15, Jury Trial Vol. 1 held 3/2/15 #460 , Jury Trial Vol. 2 held 3/3/15 #461 , Jury Trial Vol. 3 held 3/4/15 #462 , Jury Trial Vol. 4 held 3/5/15 #463 , Jury Trial Vol. 5 held 3/6/15 #464 , Jury Trial Vol. 6 held 3/9/15 #465 , Jury Trial Vol. 7 held 3/10/15 #466 , Jury Trial Vol. 8 held 3/11/15 #467 and Jury Trial Vol. 9 held 3/12/15 #468 Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson.) (Avenatti, Michael)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Transcript Order Form: re #458 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta. Transcripts have been docketed Re: Motion for Order Restricting Improper Communications held 2/16/11 #28 , Motion for Order Restricting Improper Communications held 2/22/11 #39 , Motion for Order Restricting Improper Communications held 3/1/11 #40 , and Motion for Class Certification held 6/5/13 #267 (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 4/6/2015 to reflect Transcripts are already on file (svc).
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER: Five jurors expressed a willingness to speak with the parties and/or their counsel. The Court hereby waives Local Rule 47.1 to permit counsel to speak with those five jurors. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/31/2015) (bdb)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 15-10242 for #458 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Wanta, Bruce Ibe, Jason McLear, Dean Hoffman, Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Ken Laffin. (svc)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 9 Proceedings held on March 12, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (23 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 8 Proceedings held on March 11, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (146 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 7 Proceedings held on March 10, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (253 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 6 Proceedings held on March 9, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (330 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 5 Proceedings held on March 6, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (382 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 4 Proceedings held on March 5, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (236 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 3 Proceedings held on March 4, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (234 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 2 Proceedings held on March 3, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (301 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 1 Proceedings held on March 2, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (324 pages) Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (dkj)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER: If Plaintiffs elect to move for attorney's fees, they must do so on or before 5/8/2015. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2)(B). However, because Plaintiffs have not yet moved for attorney's fees, the #453 Motion to Bifurcate Attorney's Fees Proceedings is DENIED without prejudice to refiling. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/26/2015) (ykp)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated per #456 Judgment. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at #Exhibit Guide). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (bdb)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-6686585. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Avenatti, Michael) Modified text on 3/27/2015 (jrr).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 457 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta re: #453 MOTION to Bifurcate Attorney's Fee Proceedings (Avenatti, Michael)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, that each Plaintiff shall recover the foregoing amounts, including prejudgment interest and postjudgment interest at the statutory rate, from Defendant, for which execution may issue. Plaintiffs Robert Fortune and Dean Hoffman shall take nothing on their fraudulent inducement claims against Defendant. Costs of court are taxed against Defendant. The determination of whether attorneys fees are recoverable by the Plaintiffs, and if so, how much, are hereby reserved to be decided by the Court at a later date. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/25/2015) (ykp)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION. The Court REFERS this matter for mediation before the Hon. Jeff Kaplan. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/24/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/20/2015) (ykp)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court is inclined to grant the Motion to Bifurcate Attorneys' Fee Proceedings [Docket Entry #453] because doing so would potentially save the Court substantial time and effort. Should Plaintiffs oppose the Motion to Bifurcate, they are directed to respond no later than Thursday, March 26, 2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/19/2015) (chmb)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MOTION to Bifurcate Attorney's Fee Proceedings filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gold, Daniel)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER: The deposition of Scott Suprina will occur in the conference room of Judge Lynn's chambers. It will only be accessible to the parties, the witness, and their respective counsel and support staff. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/17/2015) (twd)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER: Having concluded the trial of this matter, the Court's 3/02/2015 #419 Order, permitting any person with valid media credentials to have and use a quiet laptop in the courtroom, is no longer in effect. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/16/2015) (twd)
March 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER: The deposition subpoena of Mr. Scott Suprina and the Court's March 12, 2015 Order [Docket Entry #442] are amended as stated herein. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/14/2015) (chmb)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 449 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #438 Motion for Order to Show Cause, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 3/11/2015) filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta (Avenatti, Michael)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #438 Motion for Order to Show Cause, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 3/11/2015) filed by National Football League (Behrens, R)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 447 JURY VERDICT. (bdb)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Jury Charge. (bdb)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Jury Note No. 2. (bdb)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Jury Note No. 1. (bdb)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to redact the juror foreperson's name at the bottom of both jury notes and verdict form. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/12/2015) (bdb)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER: Before the Court is the Emergency Motion for Issuance of Subpoena (Docket Entry #438 ), filed by Plaintiffs, and agreed to by Defendant. The Motion is GRANTED. Unless otherwise agreed by the parties and the witness, the deposition shall be conducted no later than Wednesday, 3/18/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/12/2015) (bdb)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 9 of Jury Trial Completed on 3/12/2015. Jury returns verdict. Jurors polled then released. Court adjourned. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) Time in Court - 0:30. (chmb)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 8 of Jury Trial Held on 3/11/2015. Closing arguments. Court charges jury. Jurors retire for deliberations. Jury returns 2 jury notes. Adjourned until Thursday, March 12, 2015, at 8:30 a.m., so jury can continue deliberations. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) Time in Court - 5:00. (chmb)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER: The NFL is directed to respond to Docket Entry #438 , which the Court has sua sponte sealed, by close of business on Friday, 3/13/2015. The NFL shall furnish to the Court the full deposition in issue, along with a copy of any subpoena issued for such testimony. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/11/2015) (bdb)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 (Document Restricted) Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Bruce Ibe with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Avenatti, Michael) Modified to add document restriction pursuant to Judge Lynn's order on 3/11/2015 (gmg).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 7 of Jury Trial Held on 3/10/2015. Testimony continues. Parties rest. Informal charge conference with the attorneys. Adjourned until Wednesday, March 11, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) Time in Court - 9:30. (chmb)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a) filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gold, Daniel)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 6 of Jury Trial Held on 3/9/2015. Testimony continues. Adjourned until Tuesday, March 10, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) Time in Court - 6:30. (chmb) Modified on 3/11/2015 (chmb).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta re: #358 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Bruce Ibe and David Wanta for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Avenatti, Michael)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 5 of Jury Trial Held on 3/6/2015. Testimony continues. Adjourned until Monday, March 9, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) Time in Court - 8:00. (chmb)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER: The parties advised the Court that they reached an agreement with respect to the Trial Subpoena of Ann Bihari. The Court's #430 Order on the Motions to Quash and for Protective Orders is amended, and the Motion to Quash and for Protective Order as to Ann Bihari is denied as moot. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/6/2015) (jrr)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 4 of Jury Trial Held on 3/5/2015. Testimony continues. Adjourned until Friday, March 6, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) Time in Court - 4:30. (chmb)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER denying #406 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash; granting #408 MOTION to Quash, MOTION for Protective Order; granting #410 MOTION to Quash, MOTION for Protective Order; granting #412 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas for Documents to Individuals and Entities Affiliated with the Dallas Cowboys; denying #426 First Supplemental MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order and Brief in Support; granting #427 First Supplemental MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order. The Subpoenas as to Stephen Jones, JWJ Corporation, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Cowboys Stadium GP LLC, Blue & Silver, Inc, and Ann Bihari are quashed. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/5/2015) (jrr)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta re: #426 MOTION for Protective OrderSupplemental MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order and Brief in Support, #406 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash , #408 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order , #427 Supplemental MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order MOTION for Protective Order (Avenatti, Michael)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 3 of Jury Trial Held on 3/4/2015. Testimony continues. Adjourned until Thursday, March 5, 2015, at 1:00 p.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 8:00. (chmb)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 First Supplemental MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order filed by Stephen Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Party Jones, Stephen added. (Grinke, Paul). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 3/5/2015 (skt).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 First Supplemental MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order and Brief in Support filed by Jerral Wayne Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Party Jones added. (Grinke, Paul). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 3/5/2015 (skt).
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 2 of Jury Trial Held on 3/3/2015. Testimony continues; evidence entered. Adjourned until Wednesday, March 4, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 8:00. (chmb)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER: It is ordered that the civil jury questionnaires completed in this case prior to Voir Dire on 3/2/2015, will remain sealed until further Order of this Court and shall not be opened except upon Order of this or a superior Court. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/3/2015) (jrr)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 (Document Restricted) Jury Roll. (This document is for district court access only and will not be included in any ROA that may later be prepared.). (jrr)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Day# 1 of Jury Trial / Jury Trial Begun on 3/2/2015. Voir Dire; Attorneys make preemptive strikes; 8 jurors selected, seated, and sworn. Testimony begins; evidence entered. Adjourned until Tuesday, March 3, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Jonathan Pressment. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 7:00. (chmb)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/2/2015) (jrr)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting #415 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Constance Young. It is ordered that all claims and causes of action asserted herein by Plaintiff Constance Young against Defendant National Football League are dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/2/2015) (jrr)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ***No Longer in Effect, per #451 Order*** ORDER: The Court permits any person with valid media credentials to have and use a quiet laptop in the courtroom during the trial. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/2/2015) (jrr) Modified on 3/16/2015 (twd).
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Order Referring Motion re: #406 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash; #408 MOTION to Quash, MOTION for Protective Order; #410 MOTION to Quash, MOTION for Protective Order; #412 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas for Documents to Individuals and Entities Affiliated with the Dallas Cowboys. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/2/2015) (jrr)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE of Responses and Objections to Eleventh-Hour Subpoenas filed by Ann Bihari, Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, Stephen Jones (Grinke, Paul)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #412 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas for Documents to Individuals and Entities Affiliated with the Dallas Cowboys (Gold, Daniel)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas for Documents to Individuals and Entities Affiliated with the Dallas Cowboys filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gold, Daniel)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Appendix in Support filed by Ann Bihari, Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation re #410 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (Grinke, Paul)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Ann Bihari with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Grinke, Paul)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Appendix in Support filed by Stephen Jones re #408 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (Grinke, Paul)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order filed by Stephen Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Grinke, Paul)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Appendix in Support filed by Jerral Wayne Jones re #406 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash (Grinke, Paul)
March 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Quash filed by Jerral Wayne Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Grinke, Paul)
February 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER re #392 NOTICE of Business Record Declarations and Request to Overrule Hearsay Objections. The Court directs Plaintiffs to make specific objections to documents that are the subject of Defendant's affidavits that were generated by the employees of the NFL. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/28/2015) (jrr)
February 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting #403 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas to Out-of-State NFL Employees. The Trial Subpoenas as to Greg Aiello, Brian McCarthy, Fred Otto, Roger Goodell, and Eric Grubman are quashed. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/28/2015) (jrr)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 STIPULATION Regarding Pre-Admission of Certain Exhibits by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Gold, Daniel)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #403 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas to Out-of-State NFL Employees (Gold, Daniel)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas to Out-of-State NFL Employees filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gold, Daniel)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #396 Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena to William John McConnell. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/26/2015) (twd)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATION Regarding Witness Notice by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Gold, Daniel)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #392 Notice (Other) (Gold, Daniel)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER: Before the Court are the #388 Supplemental Trial Exhibit List and #389 Supplemental Witness List, filed by Plaintiffs, and Defendant's #393 Objections to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Witness List and Supplemental Trial Exhibit List. Defendant's Objections are SUSTAINED. The Court STRIKES Plaintiffs' #388 Supplemental Trial Exhibit List and #389 Supplemental Witness List as untimely. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/25/2015) (twd)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER: At the Court's 2/20/2015 Pretrial Conference, the Court ruled on Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine [Docket Entries #345 , #346 , #347 , #349 , #350 , #351 , #352 , #353 , #353 , #354 , #355 ]. Those Motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as stated on the record. The Court also ruled on certain questions, and took under advisement other questions, relating to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 1 and 5 [Docket Entries #343 , #348 ]. Also before the Court are the NFL's Motions in Limine [Docket Entry #356 ] and Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response [Docket Entry #394 ]. The Motions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/25/2015) (twd)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #396 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to William John McConnell (Gold, Daniel)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to William John McConnell filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gold, Daniel)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #392 Notice (Other) (Avenatti, Michael)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #356 MOTION in Limine (Avenatti, Michael)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 OBJECTION filed by National Football League re: #388 Exhibit List, #389 Supplemental Document (Gold, Daniel)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTICE of Business Record Declarations and Request to Overrule Hearsay Objections filed by National Football League (Gold, Daniel)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Proof of Service for Subpoena served on Mr Jacob Batsell on 2/20/2015. (twd)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ***STRICKEN per #399 Order*** Supplemental Document by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young as to #340 Witness List . (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 2/26/2015 (twd).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ***STRICKEN per #399 Order*** Exhibit List Supplemental by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 2/26/2015 (twd).
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2015. The Court ruled on certain Motions in Limine as stated on the record. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Andrew Stolper; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:20. (chmb)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 (Document Restricted) Confidential Exhibit 4 to Defendant NFL's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations (Sealed pursuant to order dated 2/20/2015) filed by National Football League (Behrens, R)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #384 Defendant National Football League's Motion for Leave to File Deposition Transcript Under Seal. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/20/2015) (jrr)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 OBJECTION filed by National Football League re: #339 Exhibit List (Behrens, R)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 (Document Restricted) Defendant National Football League's Motion for Leave to File Deposition Transcript Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by National Football League (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 4 - Confidential Deposition Transcript of Roger Goodell) (Behrens, R)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 OBJECTION filed by National Football League re: #360 Amended Document, #341 Designation of Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 Deposition Transcript of Todd Stephen Barnes, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 Deposition Transcript of Ann Bihari, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 Deposition Transcript of Roger Goodell, #4 Exhibit(s) 5 Deposition Transcript of Eric Grubman, #5 Exhibit(s) 6 Deposition Transcript of Jack Walter Hill, #6 Exhibit(s) 7 Deposition Transcript of William McConnell, #7 Exhibit(s) 8 Deposition Transcript of Frederick Otto Volume 1, #8 Exhibit(s) 9 Deposition Transcript of Frederick Otto Volume 2, #9 Exhibit(s) 10 Deposition Transcript of Geoffrey Alan Otto, #10 Exhibit(s) 11 Deposition Transcript of Frank Supovitz Volume 1, #11 Exhibit(s) 12 Deposition Transcript of Frank Supovitz Volume 2, #12 Exhibit(s) 13 Deposition Transcript of Scott Suprina) (Behrens, R)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Two DVD's of Exhibit A-9 re: #380 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League maintained under separate cover in clerk's office. (jrr)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 PROOF of Service for Subpoena to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action served on Stephen Lea on 2/17/2015. (jrr)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #368 Response/Objection (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #355 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Any Reference to Dismissed Parties (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #354 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, of Reference Regarding Attendance at NFL Events After Super Bowl XLV (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #353 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Pretrial Rulings From Admission Into Evidence (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #352 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude the Pleadings of the Parties From Admission Into Evidence (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #351 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence, Reference or Argument Relating to Plaintiffs' Alcohol Purchase or Consumption (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #350 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Plaintiffs' Opinions About What They Believe the Correct Measure of Damages Should Be In This Litigation (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #349 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Media Accounts of Pre-Trial Statements by Counsel (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #348 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Attempts to Shift the Blame to Third Parties Not Present for This Trial (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #347 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence as to Whether Plaintiffs Read the Back of the Ticket (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #346 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Defendant or Defendant's Counsel From Offering Apologies to Plaintiffs or Introducing Evidence of Apologies (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #345 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Retention of Counsel, Attorneys' Fees and/or Disparagement of Counsel (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #343 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Compromises and Offers to Compromise (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 OBJECTION filed by National Football League re: #340 Witness List (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Proposed Voir Dire by National Football League. (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by National Football League. (Behrens, R)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #337 Witness List (Avenatti, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #336 Exhibit List (Avenatti, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #338 Designation of Deposition (Avenatti, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young. Amendment to #341 Designation of Deposition. . (Avenatti, Michael)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #358 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Bruce Ibe and David Wanta for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Behrens, R)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Bruce Ibe and David Wanta for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Behrens, R)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Michael J. Avenatti, Jack Ayres, Thad Behrens and Daniel H. Gold. Prv Fee: $ 5,350.00. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Kaplan, Jeff)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MOTION in Limine filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Behrens, R)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Any Reference to Dismissed Parties filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, of Reference Regarding Attendance at NFL Events After Super Bowl XLV filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Pretrial Rulings From Admission Into Evidence filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude the Pleadings of the Parties From Admission Into Evidence filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence, Reference or Argument Relating to Plaintiffs' Alcohol Purchase or Consumption filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Plaintiffs' Opinions About What They Believe the Correct Measure of Damages Should Be In This Litigation filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Media Accounts of Pre-Trial Statements by Counsel filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Attempts to Shift the Blame to Third Parties Not Present for This Trial filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence as to Whether Plaintiffs Read the Back of the Ticket filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Defendant or Defendant's Counsel From Offering Apologies to Plaintiffs or Introducing Evidence of Apologies filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Retention of Counsel, Attorneys' Fees and/or Disparagement of Counsel filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #343 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Compromises and Offers to Compromise (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Compromises and Offers to Compromise filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 STIPULATION Regarding Certain Motions in Limine by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Behrens, R)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Designation of Deposition by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Witness List by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Exhibit List by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Designation of Deposition by National Football League. (Behrens, R)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Witness List by National Football League. (Behrens, R)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Exhibit List by National Football League. (Behrens, R)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #333 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Stolper. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/5/2015) (chmb)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6579364) filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Stolper, Andrew)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The pretrial conference currently scheduled in this case for 2/24/2015, at9:00 a.m., is reset to 2/20/2015, at 9:00 a.m. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/2/2015) (jrr)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Jeff Kaplan as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/9/2015.), Motions terminated: #328 MOTION for Appointment of Magistrate Judge to Supervise Mandatory Settlement Conference filed by National Football League. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/2/2015) (jrr)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #328 MOTION for Appointment of Magistrate Judge to Supervise Mandatory Settlement Conference (Behrens, R)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #328 MOTION for Appointment of Magistrate Judge to Supervise Mandatory Settlement Conference (Avenatti, Michael)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Appointment of Magistrate Judge to Supervise Mandatory Settlement Conference filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Behrens, R)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: This case is hereby SET for a jury trial on 3/2/2015, at 9:00 a.m. AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Pretrial Materials due by 2/12/2015. Pretrial Order due by 2/12/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/29/2014) (Attachments: #1 Confidential Questionnaire) (tla)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 12/4/2014. The Court held a telephone conference with the parties to discuss trial scheduling. No order to enter. Hearing concluded. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Chris Ayers; Defense - Thad Behrens. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :25. (tln)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to the Displaced Plaintiffs' and Relocated Plaintiffs' breach of contract claims. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion with respect to Constance Youngs breach of contract claim based on a delay in getting to her seats and on a claim that her view of the video board was obstructed. The Court also GRANTS Defendant's Motion with respect to Rebecca Burgwin's breach of contract claim based on her and her husband's delay in the ticket-exchange process. All other parts of the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Dismiss are DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/30/2014) (cea)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2014. Court discusses potential trial dates with counsel. Attorney Appearances: counsel of record. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:30. (chmb)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 7/16/2014. The Court discussed scheduling with the parties. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Ayres, Michael Avenatti; Defense - David Dodge, Thaddeus Behrens, Daniel Gold. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:5. (chmb)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ELECTRONIC ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A telephone conference re: the trial setting in this case is SET for 7/16/2014 05:00 PM. The Court will dial the phone number and passcode provided by the parties. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/10/2014) (chmb)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER: Having reviewed the applicable law and the record in this case, the Court concludes that the Cowboy Entities have failed to show that the Magistrate Judge's legal conclusions constitute reversible error. The Court, therefore, AFFIRMS the #315 Magistrate Judge's Order and OVERRULES the Cowboy Entities' #316 Objection. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/30/2014) (cea)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Status Conference held on 2/25/2014. The Court held a status conference with the parties and in case no. 3:13cv1005 Greco v. Jones. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim; Defense - Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, George Bramblett, David Dodge. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :20. (chmb)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's January 21, 2014 conference with counsel in the related Greco v. Jones action (13-CV-1005), all unelapsed deadlines in the Amended Scheduling Order [Dkt. 317] are suspended. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/21/2014) (chmb)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 319 REPLY filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re: #316 MOTION for Reconsideration re #315 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees (Dodge, David)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #316 MOTION for Reconsideration re #315 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees (Avenatti, Michael)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is RESET for a jury trial on this Court's three-week docket beginning Monday, 3/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Pretrial Materials due by 2/24/2014. Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/19/2013) (ykp)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 316 OBJECTION to the Magistrate Judge's #315 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Dodge, David) Modified on 11/6/2013 (skt).
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting in part #276 Motion for Attorney Fees (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/22/2013) (mcrd)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Avenatti, Michael)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2013. The Court heard from the parties on the status of settlement negotiations in this case. No later than 10/2/2013, the parties and their respective lead counsel must meet in person or by telephone conf. to discuss settlement of this case. All parties must make a good faith effort to settle this case. At the conclusion of this conference, counsel must, within three business days, notify the Court in writing of the participants' names and capacities, and the results of the settlement conference. No order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Chris Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim; Defense - Thaddeaus Behrens. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (axm)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #311 Reply (Behrens, R)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Behrens, R)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Agreed MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion to File Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant National Football League's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Request for Hearing and Oral Argument Under Seal ("Motion") [Docket Entry #308]. Plaintiffs are to file under seal the exhibits specified in their Motion. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/10/2013) (chmb)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 (Document Restricted) Plaintiffs' Motion to File Exhibits In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #306 Response/Objection, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Exhibit(s)) (Avenatti, Michael)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2013 (gmg).
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Avenatti, Michael)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ELECTRONIC ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Unopposed Emergency Motion to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction [Docket Entry #302]. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs have until September 9, 2013 to file their opposition. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/29/2013) (chmb)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #302 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time (Avenatti, Michael)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Unopposed Emergency MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael).
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Order Referring #276 Motion for Reimbursement of Costs and Attorneys' Fees to Magistrate Judge Rene Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/21/2013) (twd) Docket text modified on 8/23/2013 (twd).
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re #299 Reply on Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Dodge, David)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 REPLY filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re: #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Dodge, David)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 298 (Document Restricted) Exhibits in Support re: 294 Response/Objection re Attorneys Fees (Sealed pursuant to order dated 8/7/2013) filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young (Avenatti, Michael)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ELECTRONIC ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion To File Exhibits In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Cowboys' Entities' Brief In Support of Motion For Reimbursement Of Costs and Attorneys' Fees Under Seal [Docket Entry # 296]. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. Exhibits 8, 18, 24, 26, 27 and 28 to the Appendix in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Cowboys' Entities' Brief in Support of Motion for Reimbursement of Costs and Attorneys Fees are to be filed under seal. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/7/2013) (chmb)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 296 (Document Restricted) Plaintiffs' Motion To File Exhibits In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Cowboys' Entities' Brief In Support of Motion For Reimbursement Of Costs and Attorneys' Fees Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #294 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2 of 6, #2 Appendix Part 3 of 6, #3 Appendix Part 4 of 6, #4 Appendix Part 5 of 6, #5 Appendix Part 6 of 6) (Avenatti, Michael)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Avenatti, Michael)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiffs' #283 Motion to Extend Deadline for Fact Discovery is GRANTED. The fact discovery deadline is now 9/9/2013. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/6/2013) (mcrd)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #291 Reply, (Avenatti, Michael)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #283 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time of Deadline to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Discovery Cutoff and Request for Expedited Ruling (Avenatti, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #289 Response/Objection, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to A-6, #2 Exhibit(s) A-7 to A-16, #3 Exhibit(s) A-17 to A-34) (Behrens, R)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #283 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time of Deadline to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Discovery Cutoff and Request for Expedited Ruling (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiffs' #283 Emergency Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff and Request for Expedited Ruling, the Court determines that expedited briefing is necessary. Thus, Defendant's response is due by July 31, 2013. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due by August 2, 2013. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/26/2013) (chmb)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for a telephonic conference held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: As stated on the record, the deposition of Roger Goodell will take place on August 9, 2013 at the New York City offices of Haynes and Boone. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Ayres; Defense - Thad Behrens. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:13. (chmb)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND REFERRING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS' #283 EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DISCOVERY CUTOFF. Plaintiffs' deadline to oppose Defendant National Football League's motion for summary judgment is extended to 9/4/2013. Plaintiffs' request to extend the fact discovery cutoff is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and recommendation or determination. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/25/2013) (ctf)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER denying #281 Motion to Stay. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/24/2013) (ctf)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #283 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time of Deadline to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Discovery Cutoff and Request for Expedited Ruling (Avenatti, Michael)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time of Deadline to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Discovery Cutoff and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Emergency Motion, #2 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Jason McLear, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #281 MOTION to Stay re #270 Order on Motion to Compel (Expedited Treatment Requested) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Opposition, #2 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION to Stay re #270 Order on Motion to Compel (Expedited Treatment Requested) filed by National Football League (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #279 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 to 10, #2 Exhibit(s) 11 to 17) (Behrens, R)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 OBJECTION filed by National Football League re: #270 Order on Motion to Compel (Behrens, R)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re #277 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees (Dodge, David)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Dodge, David)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Dodge, David)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Notice of Manual Filing of CD Containing Exhibits 4-A and 4-B Under Separate Cover by National Football League re #274 Appendix in Support. (cea)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 pt.1, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 pt.2, #3 Exhibit(s) 2 pt.1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 pt.2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3-6, #6 Exhibit(s) 7 pt.1, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 pt.2, #8 Exhibit(s) 7 pt.3, #9 Exhibit(s) 7 pt.4, #10 Exhibit(s) 7 pt.5) (Behrens, R)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by National Football League re #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Behrens, R)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Partial Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by National Football League (Behrens, R). Added MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on 9/24/2013 (skt).
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 (Document Restricted) Notice of Filing of SEALED Electronic Transcript of Sealed Motions Proceedings held on March 27, 2013 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber P. Sue Engledow, Telephone number 214.753.2325. (32 pages) (pse)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting in part #229 Motion to Compel Deposition of Roger Goodell. The deposition shall be conducted no later than 8/5/2013 (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/10/2013) (mcrd)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #133 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/9/2013) (skt)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER: The dispositive motion deadline is hereby EXTENDED from 7/7/2013, to 7/15/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/1/2013) (cea)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Class Certification Proceedings held on June 5, 2013 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber P. Sue Engledow, Telephone number 214.753.2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (97 pages) Redaction Request due 7/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2013. (pse)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER: The dispositive motion deadline is hereby EXTENDED from 6/17/2013 to 7/7/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/13/2013) (cea)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #263 Response/Objection (Avenatti, Michael)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #261 Notice (Other) (Behrens, R)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 6/10/2013. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Ahmed Ibrahim, Michael J Avenatti; Defense - Dan Gold, Thad Behrens, Scott Ewing. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :15. (cea) (Main Document 266 replaced on 6/13/2013) (mcrd).
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE of Citation to Authority re: #133 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young (Avenatti, Michael)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2013 re #133 Motion to Certify Class, filed by Wes Lewis, Constance Young, David Wanta, Steve Simms, Bruce Ibe, Dean Hoffman, Rebecca Burgwin, Ken Laffin, Robert Fortune. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Ahmed Ibrahim, Jack Ayres, Chris Ayres; Defense - John Tancabel, Richard Guiltinan, Thad Bearens, George Bramblett, Dan Gold. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:03. (skt)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #259 Response/Objection, (Avenatti, Michael)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #258 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Regarding New Plaintiff Jason McLear and Appendix in Support (Avenatti, Michael)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Regarding New Plaintiff Jason McLear and Appendix in Support filed by National Football League (Attachments: #1 Supplement Regarding New Plaintiff Jason McLear, #2 Appendix to Supplement Regarding New Plaintiff Jason McLear, #3 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2013 03:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn re: #169 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence Filed by NFL in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, and #133 MOTION for Class Certification. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/30/2013) (chmb) (Main Document 257 replaced on 6/5/2013) (alm).
May 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting in part #248 Emergency Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines and Discovery Cut-off (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/19/2013) (mcrd)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #254 Reply, (Avenatti, Michael)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #248 MOTION to Extend Time expert deadlines and discovery cut-off (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #252 Response/Objection to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines and Discovery Cutoff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-H, #2 Exhibit(s) I-Y) (Behrens, R)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #248 MOTION to Extend Time expert deadlines and discovery cut-off (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines and Discovery Cutoff #248 , the Court finds that an expedited briefing schedule is in order. Thus, Defendant, if opposed, is ordered to file its response no later than Monday, May 13, 2013. Any reply by Plaintiff is due no later than Wednesday, May 15, 2013. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/9/2013) (chmb)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Deadline Modification: Deadlines set per 251 Electronic Order. Responses due by 5/13/2013. Replies due by 5/15/2013. (cea)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Order Referring Motion. re: #248 MOTION to Extend Time expert deadlines and discovery cut-off Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. All future filings regarding the referred Motion should be addressed to the United States Magistrate Judge, not to the District Judge, and should be accompanied by a transmittal letter addressed to the Magistrate Judge, so that filings will reach her without delay. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/8/2013) (cea)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #248 MOTION to Extend Time expert deadlines and discovery cut-off (Avenatti, Michael)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION to Extend Time expert deadlines and discovery cut-off filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #246 Reply (Avenatti, Michael)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #229 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Roger Goodell (Avenatti, Michael)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #244 Response/Objection (Behrens, R)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #229 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Roger Goodell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #240 Second Emergency Motion to Extend the Time to Produce Documents: The deadline to produce documents is extended to 4/24/2013, but the Cowboy Entities are directed to produce responsive documents on a rolling basis between now and then. No further extensions will be permitted, and if full production does not occur by 4/24/2013, the Court will seriously consider the imposition of sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/17/2013) (twd)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Appendix in Support filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Jason McLear, Constance Young re #241 Response/Objection to Cowboy Entities' Emergency Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production (Ayres, Christopher)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 RESPONSE filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Jason McLear, Constance Young re: #240 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time to Comply with Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production (Ayres, Christopher)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time to Comply with Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Farbod Farnia, #2 Proposed Order) (Dodge, David)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement Efforts filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Behrens, R)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #237 Unopposed Emergency Motion to Extend Time to Produce Documents. The deadline to comply with the Court's Order dated 3/27/2013, is extended to 4/17/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/10/2013) (tln)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time to Comply with Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Dodge, David)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Order Referring #229 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Roger Goodell to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/9/2013) (tln)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #231 . (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2013) (tln)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #232 Agreed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Dispositive Motions. The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended from 4/15/2013, to 6/17/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/5/2013) (tln)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2013 re #191 Motion for Sanctions filed by National Football League. The Court heard oral argument on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions, filed March 8, 2013, but before the Court ruled, the Motion was withdrawn. The Court overruled the objections to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver's Orders of February 19, 2013, February 20, 2013, February 27, 2013, and February 28, 2013 (docket entry nos. 186, 188, 195, 206). Order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Jack Ayres, Ahmed Ibrahim, Michael Avenatti; Defense - Thadeus Behrens, Dan Gold, George Bramblett, Scott Ewing. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:50. (chmb)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gold, Daniel)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 (Document Restricted) Plaintiffs' Motion to File An Exhibit Under Seal In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Roger Goodell (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (Avenatti, Michael)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #229 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Roger Goodell (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s), #7 Additional Page(s), #8 Additional Page(s), #9 Additional Page(s)) (Avenatti, Michael)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Roger Goodell filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Avenatti, Michael)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting #222 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan D. Pressment. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/26/2013) (aaa)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re #226 Reply, in Further Support of Objection to Order Granting Motion to Compel #183 (Dodge, David)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 REPLY filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re: #206 MOTION for Reconsideration re #183 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Dodge, David)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #224 Reply in support of Objection to Magistrate's Order Re: NFL's Motion to Quash the Deposition of Roger Goodell (Attachments: #1 Part 2 - Appendix) (Avenatti, Michael)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #188 Response/Objection (Avenatti, Michael)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 REPLY filed by National Football League re: MOTION for Reconsideration re #177 Order on Motion to Compel, (Gold, Daniel)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Jonathan Pressment (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 65331) filed by National Football League. (ndt)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #220 Response/Objection (Behrens, R)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #188 Response/Objection (Behrens, R)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #218 Reply (Behrens, R)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #191 MOTION for Sanctions (Behrens, R)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #206 MOTION for Reconsideration re #183 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Avenatti, Michael)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 RESPONSE filed by Charlotte Jones Anderson, Brett Daniels re: #186 Response/Objection (Grinke, Paul)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ELECTRONIC ORDER RESETTING HEARING: Oral argument is RESET in this case for Wednesday, March 27, 2013, at 4:30 p.m., before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn re: 191 MOTION for Sanctions. The Court will also announce its decision on the objections to Magistrate Judge Rene Harris Toliver's Orders of 2/19/2013, and 2/20/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/22/2013) (chmb)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #213 Sur-reply in Support of Opposition to Class Certification (Behrens, R)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Sur-reply filed by National Football League re: #133 MOTION to Certify Class (Behrens, R)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #195 Response/Objection (Avenatti, Michael)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #210 Response/Objection (Avenatti, Michael)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #191 MOTION for Sanctions (Avenatti, Michael)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #208 Unopposed Motion to Stay the production of documents, pending the District Court's ruling on The Cowboys Entities' Objection #206 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/15/2013) (chmb)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Unopposed Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Dodge, David) Modified on 3/15/2013 (skt).
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re #206 MOTION for Reconsideration re #183 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Dodge, David)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Objection re #183 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Dodge, David) Modified text and term motion on 3/15/2013 (drh).
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #204 Supplemental Brief (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 8, #2 Part 3 of 8, #3 Part 4 of 8, #4 Part 5 of 8, #5 Part 6 of 8, #6 Part 7 of 8, #7 Part 8 of 8) (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2013 (skt).
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Supplemental Brief by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young as to #133 MOTION to Certify Class. (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2013 (skt).
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #202 Supplemental Document re Jason McLear (Avenatti, Michael)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Supplemental Brief by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young as to #133 MOTION to Certify Class relating to Jason McLear. (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2013 (skt).
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ANSWER to #182 Amended Complaint filed by National Football League. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Gold, Daniel)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. Telephonic motion hearing held on 03/14/2013. As announced on the record, Defendant's Motion to Stay the production of documents is GRANTED, pending the District Court's ruling on Defendant's Objection #195 . Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Chris Ayres; Defense - Dan Gold. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:11. (chmb).
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order MOTION for Reconsideration re #177 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by National Football League. See doc. #195 for image. (ctf)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Telephone conference set for 3/14/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver re: #197 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #177 Order on Motion to Compel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/13/2013) (mcrd)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #197 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #177 Order on Motion to Compel, (Gold, Daniel)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #177 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gold, Daniel)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #195 Response/Objection (Gold, Daniel)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 OBJECTION filed by National Football League re: #177 Order on Motion to Compel, (Gold, Daniel)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Oral argument is hereby SET in this case for Tuesday, 3/26/2013 at 04:30 PM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn re: #191 MOTION for Sanctions . The Court will also announce its decision on the objections to Magistrate Judge Rene Harris Toliver's Orders of 2/19/2013, and 2/20/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/13/2013) (cea)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER re #191 MOTION for Sanctions: Responses due by 3/18/2013. Replies due by 3/22/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/11/2013) (skt)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #191 MOTION for Sanctions (Behrens, R)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION for Sanctions filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER denying as moot #130 Motion to Compel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/7/2013) (ctf)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #188 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2) (Avenatti, Michael)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #176 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Quash,, (Avenatti, Michael)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #186 Response/Objection (Avenatti, Michael)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OBJECTION filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #175 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Quash,, (Avenatti, Michael)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Jason McLear, David Wanta, Constance Young re #168 MOTION to Unseal Document s (Exhibits) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Avenatti, Michael)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #168 Motion to Unseal Documents (Exhibits) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Plaintiffs' Exhibits 26, 29, 33, 4652, 54, 62, 69, and 73 to the Appendix in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification are hereby unsealed. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/1/2013) (cea)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting in part #117 Motion to Compel and denying #117 Motion for Order to Show Cause (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/28/2013) (mcrd)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Football League filed by Bruce Ibe, Constance Young, Robert Fortune, Ken Laffin, Rebecca Burgwin, David Wanta, Dean Hoffman, Jason McLear. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #168 MOTION to Unseal Document s (Exhibits) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Behrens, R)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #179 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to D) (Behrens, R)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #169 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence Filed by NFL in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #143 Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their Consolidated Second Amended Complaint on or before 3/1/2013. Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental brief in support of their class action motion regarding Jason McLear on or before 3/14/2013. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' supplemental brief on or before 3/21/2013. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/28/2013) (cea)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #105 Motion to Compel. The motion is GRANTED IN PART as to the NFL and DENIED as to non-party Populous, Inc. (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/27/2013) (mcrd)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash the Deposition of Commissioner Roger Goodell (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/20/2013) (mcrd) (Main Document 176 replaced on 2/20/2013) (mcrd).
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #125 , #126 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/19/2013) (mcrd)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #173 Amended Document, by Michael J Avenatti on behalf of Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young (Avenatti, Michael)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young. Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Srike and Objections to Evidence Filed by NFL in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification. (Avenatti, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #171 Reply (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2, #2 Appendix Part 3, #3 Appendix Part 4, #4 Appendix Part 5, #5 Appendix Part 6, #6 Appendix Part 7, #7 Appendix Part 8) (Avenatti, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #133 MOTION to Certify Class (Avenatti, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #169 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence Filed by NFL in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (Avenatti, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Evidence Filed by NFL in Support of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION to Unseal Document s (Exhibits) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #164 Agreed Motion to Grant Plaintiffs Leave to Supplement the Record on the Motion for Class Certification: Plaintiffs may file a supplemental appendix in support of their #133 Motion for Class Certification, along with a supplemental brief not to exceed 15 pages (excluding the table of contents and list of authorities) on or before 3/14/2013. On or before 3/21/2013, Defendant may file a sur-reply not to exceed 15 pages (excluding the table of contents and list of authorities). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/7/2013) (twd)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #161 Motion to Extend Time. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/5/2013) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #161 Motion to Extend Time to File Surreply. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/5/2013) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Joint MOTION to Grant Plaintiffs Leave to Supplement Record on Motion for Class Certification and for NFL to File Sur-Reply filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, National Football League, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #155 Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to order dated 1/23/2013) filed by National Football League (Gold, Daniel)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Sur-reply filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re: #161 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION to Extend Time to File Surreply (Farnia, Farbod)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , MOTION to Extend Time to File Surreply() filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Farnia, Farbod)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #143 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint (Avenatti, Michael)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Exhibits in Support of #155 Response Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/28/2012) filed by National Football League (Attachments: #1 Confidential Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) (Gold, Daniel) Docket event and text modified on 1/18/2013 (twd).
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #155 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 to 1-C, #2 Exhibit(s) 1-D to 1-O, #3 Exhibit(s) 1-P to 4-B, #4 Exhibit(s) 5 to 5-U, #5 Exhibit(s) 5-V to 5-FF, #6 Exhibit(s) 5-GG to 7-A) (Gold, Daniel)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #133 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gold, Daniel)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #153 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants Jerral Jerry Wayne Jones, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Cowboys Stadium, L.P., Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, and Blue & Silver, Inc. are GRANTED leave to file a surreply to Plaintiffs Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena and for an Order to Show Cause Why the Dallas Cowboys Should Not be Held in Contempt. The surreply is due on or before 1/21/2013. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/10/2013) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena and for an Order to Show Cause Why the Dallas Cowboys Should Not Be Held in Comtempt filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Grinke, Paul)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #151 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-14) (Behrens, R)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #143 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint (Behrens, R)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #130 MOTION to Compel (Behrens, R)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #148 Reply, to Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpoena and For An Order To Show Cause Why The Dallas Cowboys Should Not Be Held In Contempt (Avenatti, Michael)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #117 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena and for an Order to Show Cause Why The Dallas Cowboys Should Not Be Held In Contempt MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Avenatti, Michael)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #146 Response/Objection (Avenatti, Michael)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #130 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Avenatti, Michael)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #132 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Exhibits In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Seal. Exhibits 24-26, 29, 31, 33, 37, 46-52, 54, 56-59, 62, 64-71, and 73 to the Appendix in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification will be sealed. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/19/2012) (ctf)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #143 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint (Avenatti, Michael)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation re #141 Response/Objection, To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena and for an Order to Show Cause Why The Dallas Cowboys Should not be Held in Contempt (Grinke, Paul)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 RESPONSE filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation re: #117 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena and for an Order to Show Cause Why The Dallas Cowboys Should Not Be Held In Contempt (Grinke, Paul)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #139 Response/Objection re Brett Daniels' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (Avenatti, Michael)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #126 MOTION for Protective OrderEmergency MOTION to Quash (Avenatti, Michael)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #137 Response/Objection re Charlotte Jones Anderson's Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (Avenatti, Michael)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #125 MOTION for Protective OrderEmergency MOTION to Quash (Avenatti, Michael)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER REFERRING #130 Motion to Compel to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and recommendation or determination. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/5/2012) (ctf)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #126 MOTION for Protective OrderEmergency MOTION to Quash, #125 MOTION for Protective OrderEmergency MOTION to Quash (Avenatti, Michael)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #133 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s)) (Avenatti, Michael)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 (Document Restricted) Plaintiffs' Motion to File Exhibits In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #130 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 to 8, #2 Exhibit(s) 9 to 26) (Behrens, R)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Compel filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER REFERRING #126 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order; and #125 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/30/2012) (ctf)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Modify the Page Limitation Relating to Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/30/2012) (ctf)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION Modify The Page Limitation Relating to Briefing on Motion for Class Certification filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, National Football League, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Emergency MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order filed by Brett Daniels with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Letter to Opposing Counsel) (Grinke, Paul) Modified on 11/30/2012 (skt).
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Emergency MOTION to Quash and for Protective Order filed by Charlotte Jones Anderson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Letter to Opposing Counsel) (Grinke, Paul) Modified on 11/30/2012 (skt).
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Supplemental Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #108 Motion for Protective Order to Quash the Deposition of Roger Goodell. (Behrens, R) Modified on 11/30/2012 (skt).
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #108 MOTION for Protective Order to Quash the Deposition of Commissioner Roger Goodell MOTION to Quash (Behrens, R)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #105 MOTION to Compel (Avenatti, Michael)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying #118 Motion for Extension of Time Concerning the Class Certification Deadline. In the event that Judge Toliver grants any part of the pending discovery motions, she may in her discretion establish a schedule for supplementation of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Response. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/21/2012) (ctf)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #118 MOTION to Extend Time Concerning the Class-Certification Deadline (Avenatti, Michael)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER REFERRING #117 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena and for an Order to Show Cause Why The Dallas Cowboys Should Not Be Held In Contempt. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/20/2012) (cea)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION to Extend Time Concerning the Class-Certification Deadline filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena and for an Order to Show Cause Why The Dallas Cowboys Should Not Be Held In Contempt filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit(s) of Michael J. Avenatti, #3 Exhibit(s) A-O, #4 Exhibit(s) P, #5 Exhibit(s) Q-R, #6 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael). Added MOTION for Order to Show Cause on 12/14/2012 (skt).
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #108 MOTION for Protective Order to Quash the Deposition of Commissioner Roger Goodell MOTION to Quash (Attachments: #1 APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION) (Avenatti, Michael)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Appendix in Support filed by Populous, Inc. re #114 Response/Objection (Gold, Daniel)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE filed by Populous, Inc. re: #105 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gold, Daniel)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #112 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - part one, #3 Exhibit(s) 2 - part two, #4 Exhibit(s) 3 to 6, #5 Exhibit(s) 7 to 10) (Gold, Daniel)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE filed by National Football League re: #105 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gold, Daniel)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REFERRING #105 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/9/2012) (axm)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REFERRING #108 Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash filed by National Football League. The Motion is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Renee Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and recommendation or determination. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/30/2012) (aaa)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Appendix in Support filed by National Football League re #108 MOTION for Protective Order to Quash the Deposition of Commissioner Roger Goodell MOTION to Quash (Behrens, R)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Protective Order to Quash the Deposition of Commissioner Roger Goodell, MOTION to Quash () filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Behrens, R)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #106 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #105 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Ayres, Christopher)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re #105 MOTION to Compel (Ayres, Christopher)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION to Compel filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ayres, Christopher)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 10/15/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2013. Factual Discovery due by 6/29/2013 and Expert Discovery due by 6/15/2013. Joint Report due by 4/16/2013. Pretrial Materials due by 10/1/2013. Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/17/2012) (ctf)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 10/9/2012. The Court heard argument during a teleconference concerning a discovery dispute. No order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Ayres; Defense - Michael Avenatti. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (tln)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/28/2012) (cea)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Pursuant to the District Court's referral, the undersigned considered Defendant National Football League's oral motion for a protective order to govern the disclosure of confidential materials. Defendant's motion for protective order is GRANTED AS MODIFIED on the record at the hearing. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/28/2012) (cea) Modified on 10/18/2012 (mcrd).
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Discovery Hearing held on 9/28/2012. Order to issue. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Ayres; Defense - Thad Behrens. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :40. (chmb)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Corrected Cover Page - Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on August 29, 2012 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber P. Sue Engledow, Telephone number 214.753.2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (57 pages) Redaction Request due 10/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2012. (pse)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Populous on 09/12/2012. (Avenatti, Michael)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Scott Suprina on 09/13/2012. (Avenatti, Michael)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Jack Hill on 9/12/2012. (Avenatti, Michael)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PROOF of Service for Subpoena served on Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Blue & Silver, Inc, JWJ Corporation, Cowboys Stadium, LP, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC on 9/13/2012. (skt)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROOF of Service for Subpoena served on City of Arlington on 9/12/2012. (skt)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/2012. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, Chris Ayres; Defense - Thad Behrens, Dan Gold. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :25. (cea)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2012 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. The parties should be prepared to discuss scheduling issues related to this case. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/22/2012) (chmb) Modified on 8/22/2012 (chmb).
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE - Rule 26(f) Joint Report filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young (Avenatti, Michael)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AMENDED ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint filed by National Football League (Behrens, R)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part #72 Motion to Dismiss; granting #76 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs may proceed with their contract claims and their fraudulent inducement claims, as they pertain to alleged obstructed view seating, against the NFL only. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/19/2012) (ykp)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 7/5/2012. Order to Enter Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Jack Ayres, Chris Ayres, Michael Avenatti; Defense - George Bramblett, Dan Gold, Thad Behrens, David Dodge, Levi McCathern, Paul Grinke. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :15. (ykp)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying #84 Motion for Sanctions (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/5/2012) (svc)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 7/5/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn re: Plaintiffs' #84 Motion for Sanctions and Motion for Hearing. No response or other documents are to be filed unless the Court permits filing after the telephone conference. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/28/2012) (tln)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Jay J. Madrid. Attorneys in Attendance: Michael Avenatti; Jack Ayres; Chris Ayres; George Bramblett; Thaddeus Behrens; Daniel Gold; Levi McCathern; David Dodge. Prv Fee: $ 5,000.00. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Madrid, Jay)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Sanctions (), MOTION for Hearing Status Conference filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Michael J. Avenatti, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Plaintiffs' deadline for filing and serving a Motion for Class Certification as to all claims at issue in this action shall be ninety days after this Court issues its ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/18/2012) (ctf)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Joint STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones re: #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Dodge, David)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY filed by National Football League re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss All Tort Claims In Consolidated First Amended Complaint (Gold, Daniel)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Michael J. Avenatti) (Avenatti, Michael)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Ken Laffin, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, David Wanta, Constance Young re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss All Tort Claims In Consolidated First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Michael J. Avenatti) (Avenatti, Michael)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in #75 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement filed by National Football League. (Gold, Daniel)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Dodge, David)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Football League. (Gold, Daniel)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Partial (Contract Claim Only) ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint filed by National Football League. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Gold, Daniel)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League Joint Appendix in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Gold, Daniel)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss All Tort Claims In Consolidated First Amended Complaint filed by National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gold, Daniel)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #70 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Cowboys Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint on or before January 18, 2012. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/30/2011) (Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated First Amended Complaint filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones (Dodge, David)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Wes Lewis, Bruce Ibe, Steve Simms, Constance Young, Robert Fortune, Ken Laffin, Rebecca Burgwin, David Wanta, Dean Hoffman. (Avenatti, Michael)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Modify Answer and Briefing Deadlines with Respect to Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Amended Complaint: National Football League answer due 1/18/2012 as to #50 Plaintiffs' prior Consolidated Complaint. As previously ordered by the Court, Plaintiffs will file their Amended Consolidated Complaint by 12/21/2011. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/16/2011) (twd)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Modify Briefing Deadlines with Respect to Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Wes Lewis, National Football League, Steve Simms, Constance Young (Behrens, R)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #63 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part #53 Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/30/2011) (twd)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint (Gold, Daniel)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League re: #63 MOTION to Strike (Gold, Daniel)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Motion/Request to Strike filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, Constance Young re: #54 Appendix in Support, (Avenatti, Michael)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Appendix in Support filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, Constance Young re #61 Response/Objection to Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint (Avenatti, Michael)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, Constance Young re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint (Avenatti, Michael)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #59 Agreed Motion to Modify Page Limitation Relating to the Response and Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss may not exceed 30 pages, and Defendants' reply to Plaintiffs' response may not exceed 15 pages. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/21/2011) (Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Agreed MOTION to Modify Page Limitation re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, Wes Lewis, National Football League, Steve Simms, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ahmed Ibrahim. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/17/2011) (tln)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Ahmed Ibrahim (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3942745) filed by Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ibrahim, Ahmed)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #55 Agreed Motion to Modify Filing Dates Relating to the Response and Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before June 21, 2011, and Defendants may reply to Plaintiffs' response on or before July 11, 2011. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/14/2011) (Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AGREED MOTION TO MODIFY FILING DATES RELATING TO THE RESPONSE AND REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, Wes Lewis, National Football League, Steve Simms, Constance Young (Avenatti, Michael)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint (Gold, Daniel)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gold, Daniel)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Agreed Motion to Extend Plaintiffs' Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification. The deadline to file class certification motions is extended until 90 days after Defendants answer, if any such answers are required. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/9/2011) (tln)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Robert Fortune, Dean Hoffman, Bruce Ibe, JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, Wes Lewis, National Football League, Steve Simms, Constance Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2011 (jrb).
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants filed by Wes Lewis, Bruce Ibe, Steve Simms, Dean Hoffman, Constance Young, Robert Fortune. Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Avenatti, Michael)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa A Wegner. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/20/2011) (axm)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason M Frank. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/20/2011) (axm)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Jason M. Frank (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3833816) filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Frank, Jason)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Lisa A. Wegner (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3833701) filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wegner, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:11cv0345 consolidated with lead case 3:11cv0248. The Simms Plaintiffs' #14 Motion for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel is GRANTED, and the Laffin Plaintiffs' #41 Cross-Motion for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel is DENIED. Eagan Avenatti L.L.P.and The Law Offices of R. Jack Ayres, Jr., P.C. shall serve as interim co-lead class counsel. They are to file a Consolidated Class Action Complaint on or before 5/6/2011. Joseph Sipes, Bruce Ibe and Maryanne Coronna added to case pursuant to consolidation. Attorneys Jason M Frank,Michael J Avenatti, Christopher S Ayres, R Jack Ayres, Jr, Lisa A Wegner added to case pursuant to consolidation. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2011) (twd)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Appendix in Support filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re #43 Reply in Support of Motion for Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Opposition to Cross Motion for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Michael J. Avenatti) (Ayres, Christopher)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re: #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Ayres, Christopher)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Cross-MOTION for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Ken Laffin, David Wanta (See #41 for document.) (twd)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Appendix in Support filed by Rebecca Burgwin, Ken Laffin, David Wanta re #41 Response and Cross-MOTION for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Goldfarb, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/30/2011 (twd).
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE and Cross-MOTION for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel filed by Ken Laffin, David Wanta, Rebecca Burgwin re: #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goldfarb, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/30/2011 (twd).
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on March 1, 2011 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber P. Sue Engledow, Telephone number 214.753.2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (8 pages) Redaction Request due 4/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2011. (pse)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of Motions Proceedings held on February 22, 2011 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber P. Sue Engledow, Telephone number 214.753.2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (99 pages) Redaction Request due 4/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2011. (pse) Modified on 3/22/2011 (jrb).
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Football League ; served on 2/15/2011. (Avenatti, Michael)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Opposition filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re #14 MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE ON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL.(Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 3/10/2011 (jrb).
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint in this case is extended until ten (10) days after the entry of this Court's Order on the pending Motion to Remand. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/7/2011) (mfw)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Mike Dolabi, JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, Wes Lewis, National Football League, Steve Simms (Behrens, R)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 3/3/2011. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti; Defense - George Bramlett, Thad Behrens, Levi McCathern. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (twd)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Case Management Order. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/2/2011) (mfw)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Letter re Hearing filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms (Avenatti, Michael)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2011. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, R. Jack Ayres, Jr.; Defense - George Bramblett, Levi McCathern. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (skt)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing (Letter Attaching Information Packet) filed by National Football League (Behrens, R)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2011 re #7 Motion for case management order. At a hearing on 2/28/2011, from 10:00 a.m. until 12:35 p.m., the Court heard argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for case management order (docket entry #7). Specifically finding that there was no evidence of any improper or coercive activity by the Defendants, the Court, exercising its general authority to supervise purported class actions, provided for a limited extension of the time for Defendants' settlement proposals to be accepted and consummated, and for limited additional information to be provided to putative class members, all as provided in more detail on the record of the hearing. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Avenatti, R. Jack Ayres, Jr.; Defense - George Bramblett, Thad Behrens, Daniel Gold, Levi McCathern, Paul Grinke, Arnold Shokouhi. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 02:35. (tln)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on February 16, 2011 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber P. Sue Engledow, Telephone number 214.753.2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (30 pages) Redaction Request due 3/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2011. (pse)
February 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Appendix in Support filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re #20 Affidavit, #23 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Supplemental Authorities (Avenatti, Michael)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Appendix in Support filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League re #25 Response/Objection, (Behrens, R)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League re: #7 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Case Management Order Restraining Improper Communication MOTION for Hearing (Behrens, R)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Levi G McCathern, II on behalf of Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League. (McCathern, Levi)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Errata Re: Supplemental Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Case Management Order Restricting Defendants From Engaging in Improper Communications With Unnamed Class Members Set for Hearing on February 28, 2011 re: #20 Affidavit filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Avenatti, Michael)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J Avenatti. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/22/2011) (svc)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re #20 Affidavit (Avenatti, Michael)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence inSupport of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Expedited Hearing and Briefing Schedule by Mike Dolabi, Steve Simms. (Avenatti, Michael) Modified on 2/23/2011 (jrb).
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing of Information Packet filed by National Football League (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Information Packet) (Behrens, R)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel H Gold on behalf of National Football League. (Gold, Daniel)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Thaddeus Behrens on behalf of National Football League. (Behrens, R)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George W Bramblett, Jr on behalf of National Football League. (Bramblett, George)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Appendix in Support filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Ayres, Christopher)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Ayres, Christopher)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to #7 Motion for Case Management Order. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/17/2011) (tln)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Blue & Silver Inc; served on 2/15/2011; Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC; served on 2/15/2011; Cowboys Stadium LP; served on 2/15/2011; Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd.; served on 2/15/2011; JWJ Corporation; served on 2/15/2011. (mfw)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Michael J. Avenatti (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3726226) filed by Mike Dolabi, Steve Simms (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Avenatti, Michael)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2011. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher S Ayres, Michael J Avenatti; Defense - George Bramblett, Levi McCathern. (Court Reporter: Sue Engledow) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :46. (dnc)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re #7 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Case Management Order Restraining Improper Communication MOTION for Hearing (Ayres, Christopher)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms re #7 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Case Management Order Restraining Improper Communication MOTION for Hearing (Ayres, Christopher)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Case Management Order Restraining Improper Communication (), MOTION for Hearing filed by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ayres, Christopher) Modified on 2/17/2011 (jrb).
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League. (twd)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mike Dolabi, Wes Lewis, Steve Simms. (Ayres, Christopher)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Mike Dolabi, Steve Simms, Wes Lewis. (Ayres, Christopher)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement filed by Mike Dolabi, Steve Simms. (Ayres, Christopher)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Magistrate Judge Toliver preliminarily assigned. File to Judge Lynn. (twd)
February 8, 2011 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mike Dolabi, Steve Simms. (Ayres, Christoper)
February 8, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Blue & Silver Inc, Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC, Cowboys Stadium LP, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Jerral W Jones filed by Mike Dolabi, Steve Simms. Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-3710091) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Ayres, Christoper)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simms v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerral Wayne Jones
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Farbod Farnia
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Jesse David Hoffman
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Jones
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Farbod Farnia
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Jesse David Hoffman
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue & Silver Inc
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Farbod Farnia
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd.
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Farbod Farnia
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWJ Corporation
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Farbod Farnia
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowboys Stadium LP
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Farbod Farnia
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Farbod Farnia
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: George W Bramblett, Jr
Represented By: Daniel H Gold
Represented By: Jonathan David Pressment
Represented By: R Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Simms
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Dolabi
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wes Lewis
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Ibe
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Hoffman
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Young
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fortune
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McLear
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ken Laffin
Represented By: Charles W Branham, III
Represented By: Hamilton Philip Lindley
Represented By: Jeffrey M Goldfarb
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Wanta
Represented By: Charles W Branham, III
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Hamilton Philip Lindley
Represented By: Jeffrey M Goldfarb
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rebecca Burgwin
Represented By: Charles W Branham, III
Represented By: Andrew Stolper
Represented By: Hamilton Philip Lindley
Represented By: Jeffrey M Goldfarb
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charlotte Jones Anderson
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brett Daniels
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Jones
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: Jesse David Hoffman
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Joseph Sipes
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Maryanne Coronna
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Lisa A Wegner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Populous Inc
Represented By: Daniel H Gold
Represented By: George W Bramblett, Jr
Represented By: R Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ann Bihari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Jeff Kaplan
Represented By: Jay J Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Scott Suprina
Represented By: Stephen L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?