Hibbs v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Bobby J Hibbs
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv02601
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Presiding Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ACCEPTING 87 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. For the reasons stated in the findings, conclusions, and recommendation, United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 65 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (doc. 69 ), is DENIED. His claims will be dismissed by separate judgment. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/19/2013) (ctf)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ACCEPTING 51 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge and denying 38 , 45 Plaintiff's Motions for Relief from Judgment. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/11/2012) (jrr)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ACCEPTING 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/27/2012) (ctf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hibbs v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby J Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?