Rojo v. Burger One LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cupertino Jurado Rojo
Defendant: Burger One LLC and Chris Srivarodom
Case Number: 3:2011cv02968
Filed: October 31, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 144 The Court grants in part and denies in part Rojo's 143 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and awards Rojo $25,015.50 for his attorneys' fees and $515.00 for his costs and related nontaxable expenses under Section 216(b). The Court will enter a separate judgment against both defendants. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/4/2025) (agc)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 137 Motion for Default Judgment. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/6/2024) (kcr)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court orders that Defendant Chris Srivarodom's Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint [Dkt. No. 59 ] be stricken from the docket and directs the Clerk of Court, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a), to enter default against Defendant Chris Srivarodom. The Court further directs Plaintiff to move, by no later than Wednesday, May 24, 2023, for default judgment against Defendant Chris Srivarodom. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant Chris Srivarodom by mail and email to the addresses listed on the docket in this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/3/2023) (ndt)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part, denying in part 53 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer. The Court GRANTS Defendant Srivarodom's Motion for leave to file amended answer and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant Burger One, LLC's Motion. Srivarodom shall file an amended answer by 7/24/14. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 7/16/2014) (mcrd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojo v. Burger One LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cupertino Jurado Rojo
Represented By: Jack Siegel
Represented By: Jamie Harrison Zidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger One LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Srivarodom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?