Jacked Up, LLC v. Sara Lee Corporation

Defendant: Sara Lee Corporation and The J.M. Smucker Company
Plaintiff: Jacked Up, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv03296
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Accepting 166 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge: Accordingly, the court denies Plaintiff's 157 Motion to Review Costs Taxed by Clerk and awards Defendants Sara Lee Corporation and The JM Smucker Corporation taxable costs in the amount of $20,307.66. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/5/2016) (twd)
June 4, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/4/2015) (Main Document 151 replaced and docket text edited on 6/4/2015) (ali).
December 5, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 113 Sealed Motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/5/2014) (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacked Up, LLC v. Sara Lee Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Lee Corporation
Represented By: Veronica S Lewis
Represented By: Jason C McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J.M. Smucker Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacked Up, LLC
Represented By: Kelly D Hine
Represented By: J Kristopher Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?