H-W Technology LC v. Apple Inc Featured Case
Plaintiff: H-W Technology LC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc
Counter_defendant: H-W Technology LC
Case Number: 3:2012cv02580
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: A. Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2012 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by H-W Technology LC. Related document: 6 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (axm)
April 2, 2012 Filing 6 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If additional patent or trademark numbers are included, the clerk will prepare the appropriate Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. COUNTERCLAIM against H-W Technology LC filed by Apple Inc. (axm)
August 8, 2011 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc. (axm)
April 19, 2011 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Apple Inc filed by H-W Technology LC. If additional patent or trademark numbers are included, the clerk will prepare the appropriate Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (axm)
March 30, 2011 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Apple Inc filed by H-W Technology LC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H-W Technology LC v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-W Technology LC
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Represented By: Arthur I Navarro
Represented By: Chad Sayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Jason M Bussey
Represented By: Jeffrey E Danley
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gillen
Represented By: Arun K Goel
Represented By: Kelly D Hine
Represented By: Patrick E King
Represented By: Noah M Leibowitz
Represented By: Jeffrey E Ostrow
Represented By: Thomas B Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Jason M Bussey
Represented By: Jeffrey E Danley
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gillen
Represented By: Arun K Goel
Represented By: Kelly D Hine
Represented By: Patrick E King
Represented By: Noah M Leibowitz
Represented By: Jeffrey E Ostrow
Represented By: Thomas B Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: H-W Technology LC
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Represented By: Arthur I Navarro
Represented By: Chad Sayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?