Nguyen et al v. Versacom, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Nguyen, Paulus Niekdam and Loc Tran
Defendant: Versacom, LLC, Muhammad Al-amin and Afreen Al-amin
Case Number: 3:2013cv04689
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 187 Motion for Leave to File pretrial disclosures; statistically terminating 193 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 194 Motion for Sanctions; denying 198 Motion to continue discov ery deadline and to modify scheduling order; granting 201 Motion for leave to exchange and file late pretrial materials; denying as duplicative 202 Motion for leave to exchange and file late pretrial materials; and denying 218 motion for leave to file motion to strike opt-in plaintiffs and streamline class action. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/23/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 170 MOTION to decertify class filed by Afreen Al-amin, Muhammad Al-amin, Versacom LLC, and denying as moot 210 MOTION for leave to file motion for leave to supplement defendants' motion to decertify class with additional documents and argument in support of decertification filed by Versacom LLC. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/9/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part, denying in part 155 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 12/9/2015) (mcrd)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 58 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Tommy Nguyen, Paulus Niekdam, Loc Tran. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/22/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 16 MOTION to certify class filed by Tommy Nguyen, Loc Tran, Paulus Niekdam, and sustaining in part defendants' objections to the proposed notice form; denying as moot 18 MOTION to extend time to designate expert witnesses filed by Tommy Nguyen, Loc Tran, Paulus Niekdam; and denying as moot 24 MOTION to Strike 22 Reply filed by Versacom, LLC, Muhammad Al-amin, and Afreen Al-amin. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/27/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen et al v. Versacom, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Nguyen
Represented By: Antonio U Allen
Represented By: Caroline C Harrison
Represented By: Lu Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulus Niekdam
Represented By: Antonio U Allen
Represented By: Caroline C Harrison
Represented By: Lu Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loc Tran
Represented By: Antonio U Allen
Represented By: Caroline C Harrison
Represented By: Lu Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versacom, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Al-amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afreen Al-amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?