Securities and Exchange Commission v. Arcturus Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Arcturus Corporation, Aschere Energy, LLC, Leon Ali Parvizian, Alfredo Gonzalez, AMG Energy LLC, Robert J Balunas and R Thomas & Co LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv04861
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2018 141 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 135 MOTION for Order on Amount of Disgorgement, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The Court amends the order and final judgment as to the Parvizian Defendants to accurately reflect the SECs es timate of ill-gotten gains during the applicable period under Kokesh, as well as the disgorgement amount against the Parvizian Defendants. The Court also amends the order and final judgment as to the Balunas Defendants to accurately reflect the SECs estimate of ill-gotten gains during the applicable period under Kokesh; as well as the disgorgement amount against the Balunas Defendants. The disgorgement order and final judgment will not be amended as to the Gonzalez Defendants. A separate amended order and final judgment will issue. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/10/2018) (epm)
July 19, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: A hearing on the SEC's 79 Motion for Remedies and Motion for Entry of Final Judgment is set for 8/23/2016 at 10:00 a.m. The Court orders the attorneys and their clients to be present for this hearing. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/19/2016) (rekc)
July 8, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 82 , 93 motions to reconsider the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order 76 . (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/8/2016) (ash)
March 21, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court finds Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment must be granted. The Court also finds the Defendants' 32 Motion for Summary Judgment, the SEC's 43 Motion to Strike, and the Parvizian Defendants' 49 Motion to Strike should be denied. The Court will refrain from imposing remedies on each Defendant at this time. The Court orders the SEC to submit a brief to the Court on or before 4/22/2016 addressing appropriate and available remedies it seeks to be imposed against each Defendant resulting from their violations. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/21/2016) (twd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Arcturus Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jennifer D Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcturus Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aschere Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Ali Parvizian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Balunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Thomas & Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?