Sprint Communications Company LP v. Central Telephone Company of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company LP
Defendant: Central Telephone Company of Texas and United Telephone of Texas Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv01724
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: In these MDL proceedings, the court decides three pending motions for summary judgment (280 in 3:14-md-02587-D; 285 in 3:14-md-02587-D; 46 in 3:16-cv-02210-D) under an abbreviated summary judgment procedure that is app ropriate under the circumstances to facilitate an appeal of the court's case-dispositive decision in In re IntraMTA Switched Access Charges Litigation, 2015 WL 7252948 (N.D. Tex. Nov. 17, 2015) (Fitzwater, J.) ("IntraMTA I"). The LECs's motions for summary judgment are granted, and the parties are ordered to file final judgments within seven days. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/15/2018) (axm)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants defendants' motions to dismiss Sprint's amended complaints under Rule 12(b)(6), and it dismisses Sprint's state-law claims with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/3/2017) (axm)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The balance of defendants' 12/8/15 motion for leave to file counterclaims, for order establishing related procedures, and for status conference is granted. Plaintiffs' 12/10/15 request for extension of time to replead state claims is granted. And plaintiffs' 12/22/15 motion for final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b), or, in the alternative, for certification review under 28 U.S.C. § 1292, and for stay pending appeal is denied. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/16/2016) (ash)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants' Lead Counsel, Defendants' Liaison Counsel, with leave to replead plaintiffs' state-law claims; denying MOTION to Dismiss on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds or, in the Alternative, for Stay Pending Referral. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/17/2015) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/17/2015) (gr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company LP v. Central Telephone Company of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company LP
Represented By: William H Church, Jr
Represented By: Caitlin Jemilha Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Telephone Company of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Telephone of Texas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?