Clapper et al v. American Realty Investors Inc et al

Plaintiff: David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC and Atlantic XIII LLC
Defendant: American Realty Investors Inc, American Realty Trust, Inc, Transcontinental Realty Investors, Inc., Income Opportunity Realty Investors Inc, Pillar Income Asset Management Inc, Prime Income Asset Management Inc, Prime Income Asset Management LLC, EQK Holdings Inc, Basic Capital Management, Inc, Syntek West Inc, Realty Advisors, LLC, Realty Advisors, Inc., Realty Advisors Management, Inc., The May Trust, The Martin Trust, Transcontinental Realty Acquisition Corporation, Gene E Phillips, Henry A Butler, Robert A Jakuszeweki, Sharon Hunt, Ted R Munselle, Daniel J Moos, Donald Phillips, Mickey N Phillips, Ryan T Phillips, Gene S Bertcher, Louis Corna, John Doe, Jane Doe, ABC Company and XYZ Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv02970
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Jorge A Solis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2018 712 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER concluding in its discretion that the court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1367(a), and denying without prejudice 687 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint Pursuant to the Co urt's Order Dated February 28, 2018 (DE 684), or in the Alternative, Motion to Remove Plaintiffs Atlantic XIII, LLC and Atlantic Midwest, LLC as Parties in Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Atlantic Midwest LLC, Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/6/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
February 28, 2018 684 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 657 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EQK Holdings Inc, American Realty Investors Inc, American Realty Trust, Inc.; granting 658 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of filed by Gene E Phillips; and denying without prejudice 514 Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 399 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Realty Trust, Inc, 469 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 329 Motion to Stay filed by American Realty Investors Inc, 375 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gene E Phillips, 551 Motion for Summary J udgment filed by EQK Holdings Inc, 676 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 518 Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, At lantic Midwest LLC, 542 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 578 Motion to Strike, filed by EQK Holdings Inc, American Realty Investors Inc, American Realty Trust, Inc, Gene E Phillips, 516 Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 400 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gene E Phillips, 622 Motion for Leave to File filed by Atl antic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 498 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 398 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike filed by EQK Holdings Inc, America n Realty Investors Inc, American Realty Trust, Inc, Gene E Phillips, 673 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 416 Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash,, filed by A tlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 403 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Realty Investors Inc, 612 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 592 Motion for Leave to File, filed by EQK Holdings Inc, American Realty Investors Inc, American Realty Trust, Inc, Gene E Phillips, 548 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by American Realty Investors Inc, 489 Motion to Strike, file d by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 512 Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC, 539 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by American Realt y Trust, Inc, 646 Motion to Quash filed by EQK Holdings Inc, American Realty Investors Inc, American Realty Trust, Inc, Gene E Phillips, 401 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by EQK Holdings Inc re: 514 MOTION for Prote ctive Order and MOTION to Quash the Subpoena Duces Tecum for Herbert L. Shevin, 658 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike 651 Amended Complaint,, , 399 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 657 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike 651 Amended Complaint,, , 469 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendices to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Gene Phillips& #039; Motion for Summary Judgment, 329 MOTION to Stay re 289 Order on Motion for Sanctions, 309 Response/Objection, 375 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 551 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 676 MOTION for Expens es Relating to the Court's October 24, 2017 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents, 518 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash the Subpoena Duces Tecum for William Widmeyer, Sr., [54 2] MOTION for Summary Judgment , 578 MOTION to Strike 545 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Appendix/Brief/Memorandum in Support, 544 Appendix in Support, 542 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 543 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion , 516 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash the Subpoena Duces Tecum for Jody B. Shevin, 400 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 622 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in S upport of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 498 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record as to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Gene Phillips' Motion for Summary Judgment, 398 MOTION to Dismiss or, Al ternatively MOTION to Strike 373 Amended Complaint,, , 673 MOTION for Expenses and to Sanction Defendants American Realty Investors, Inc., American Realty Trust, Inc., EQK Holdings, Inc. and Gene E. Phillips for Discovery Abuse Relating to the Court's October 6, 2017 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion, 416 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Defendants' Notice of Intention to Take the Oral Deposition of Andy Mychalowych, 403 Motion to D ismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 612 MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 592 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Suppl ements to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 548 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 489 MOTION to Strike Section III and Related Exhibits of Defendants' Expert Gary B. Goolsby's Re port Dated February 15, 2017, 512 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash the Subpoena Duces Tecum for Gary Konke, 539 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 646 MOTION to Quash , 401 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/28/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 25, 2016 209 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part MOTIONS to 153 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Income Opportunity Realty Investors Inc, Transcontinental Realty Investors Inc, 157 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ryan T Phillips, Mickey N Phillips, 152 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Prime Income Asset Management LLC, Pillar Income Asset Management Inc, Prime Income Asset Management Inc, 154 Dismiss for Failure to Stat e a Claim filed by The May Trust, The Martin Trust, 156 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Donald Phillips, 155 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gene E Phillips, 151 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Realty Trust, Inc, 158 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by EQK Holdings Inc, American Realty Investors Inc, Basic Capital Management, Inc, 150 Motion to Dismiss filed by Louis Corna, Gene S Bertcher, Daniel J Moos re: 153 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 157 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 152 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 154 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 156 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 155 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 151 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 158 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 150 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/25/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 3, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Sharon Hunt, Henry A Butler, Donald Phillips, Louis Corna, Ryan T Phillips, Ted R Munselle, Gene S Bertcher, Gene E Phillips, Robert A Jakuszeweki, Mickey N Phillips, Daniel J Moos; 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Realty Trust, Inc, EQK Holdings Inc, American Realty Investors Inc, Basic Capital Management, Inc; 74 M OTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Realty Advisors, Inc., Income Opportunity Realty Investors Inc, Transcontinental Realty Investors Inc, Realty Advisors Management, Inc., The May Trust, Prime Income Asset Managemen t Inc, The Martin Trust, Prime Income Asset Management LLC, Realty Advisors, LLC, Pillar Income Asset Management Inc, Syntek West Inc; 75 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Transcontinental Realty Acquisition Corpor ation; 107 MOTION for Protective Order, Motion to Stay filed by Realty Advisors, Inc., Realty Advisors, LLC; 108 MOTION for Protective Order, Motion to Stay, filed by Donald Phillips, Realty Advisors Management, Inc., Ryan T Phillips, The May Trust, Syntek West Inc, The Martin Trust, Mickey N Phillips; 111 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Stay filed by Sharon Hunt, Henry A Butler, Ted R Munselle, Robert A Jakuszeweki; and 119 MOTION to Stay filed by Prime Income Asset Management LLC (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/3/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 21, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 35 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC; denying 60 Motion for Injunction filed by Atlantic XIII LLC, David M Clapper, Atlantic Midwest LLC. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/21/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clapper et al v. American Realty Investors Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M Clapper
Represented By: Meghan W Cassidy
Represented By: Andrew W Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Midwest LLC
Represented By: Meghan W Cassidy
Represented By: Andrew W Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic XIII LLC
Represented By: Meghan W Cassidy
Represented By: Andrew W Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Realty Investors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Realty Trust, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Realty Investors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Income Opportunity Realty Investors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pillar Income Asset Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Income Asset Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Income Asset Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQK Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basic Capital Management, Inc
Represented By: Jamie Jean McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syntek West Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Advisors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Advisors Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The May Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Martin Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Realty Acquisition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene E Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry A Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A Jakuszeweki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted R Munselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey N Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan T Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene S Bertcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Corna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?