Thompson et al v. International Paper Company
Plaintiff: Thompson, James Thompson, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, Christopher Love and Fernando Chavez
Defendant: International Paper Company, United Steelworkers and United Steelworkers Local Union No. 895
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2015cv00758
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated #137 Stipulation of Dismissal. (epm)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISMISSAL PAPERS: The Parties shall have until 10/15/2018, to file all papers necessary for dismissal of this case and its removal from the active docket of this Court. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/19/2018) (sss)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Dismissal Papers filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: The parties have announced that this case has been resolved. Any trial setting and scheduling order are vacated. The parties have 30 days to file dismissal papers. If the parties do not file dismissal papers within 30 days, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/16/2018) (zkc)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPLY filed by International Paper Company, United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #131 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statute of Limitations (Gillespie, Joseph)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #131 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statute of Limitations (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Statute of Limitations filed by International Paper Company, United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Joint Brief for Partial Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order on Partial Motion For Summary Judgment) (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ***VACATED PER #134 ORDER*** SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for Trial on 9/17/2018 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. The setting is for a three-week docket. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/29/2018) (zkc) Modified on 8/16/2018 (zkc).
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Status Conference held on 4/30/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Rasha Zeyadeh; Defense - Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich and Joe Gillespie. (Court Reporter: Shawnie Archuleta) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :23. (chmb)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rasha Zeyadeh on behalf of Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Zeyadeh, Rasha)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Status Conference RESET for 4/30/2018 at 1:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/17/2018) (chmb)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AFTER CASE TRANSFER: The Court hereby sets this case for status conference on Monday, 4/23/2018 at 10:30 a.m. at the United States District Court, 1100 Commerce Street, Courtroom 1632, Dallas, Texas 75242. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/17/2018) (ran)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895. (Gillespie, Joseph)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion Postpone Scheduling Conference Until After Mediation. It is hereby ORDERED that the 3/22/2018 status conference is hereby postponed until after the 3/27/2018 mediation of this matter. The parties shall file a joint report regarding the status of the case within three business days of the mediation. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/20/2018) (ndt)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION Postpone Scheduling Conference Until After Mediation re #122 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 (Gillespie, Joseph)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AFTER CASE TRANSFER: Lead counsel for each party, or alternatively, counsel with authority to bind their respective clients and lead counsel, and all unrepresented parties, shall be present. Status Conference set for 3/22/2018 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/15/2018) (ewd)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Maxel Silverberg as mediator. The mediator is directed by the Court to complete the ADR Summary Form and file it with the clerk of court within 10 days after mediation. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/30/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/29/2018) (rekc)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #113 Motion for Reconsideration filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895, #115 Motion for Reconsideration filed by International Paper Company. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/13/2017) (ykp)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #113 MOTION for Reconsideration re #111 Memorandum Opinion and Order, (Gillespie, Joseph)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY filed by International Paper Company re: #116 Response/Objection, (Ullrich, Rachel)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE and Brief filed by Plaintiffs re: #113 MOTION for Reconsideration re #111 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #115 MOTION for Reconsideration re #111 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Kalandra) Condensed text on 11/29/2017 (dsr).
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Reconsideration re #111 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Appendix in Support filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re #113 MOTION for Reconsideration re #111 Memorandum Opinion and Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Gillespie, Joseph)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Reconsideration re #111 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gillespie, Joseph)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #107 Motion to Strike. The Court found it unnecessary to rule on this motion in its Memorandum Opinion & Order (Doc. 111 n. 5). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/6/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Before the Court are the defendants' motions for summary judgment. Because fact issues remain regarding whether International Paper breached the agreement and whether the Union breached its duty of fair representation, the Court DENIES the defendants' motions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/19/2017) (ndt)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #107 MOTION to Strike #102 Response/Objection, #103 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #104 Appendix in Support, (Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Evidence) (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #107 MOTION to Strike #102 Response/Objection, #103 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #104 Appendix in Support, (Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Evidence) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY filed by International Paper Company re: #99 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ullrich, Rachel)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Strike #102 Response/Objection, #103 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #104 Appendix in Support, (Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Evidence) filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Appendix in Support filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re #105 Reply (Attachments: #1 Exhibits D, E, F, G) (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Appendix in Support filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re #102 Response/Objection, #103 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re #102 Response/Objection, to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment (Wheeler, Kalandra)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Second Consolidated Response filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #99 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment , #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Wheeler, Kalandra) Modified text on 5/24/2017 (ran).
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Appendix in Support filed by International Paper Company re #100 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Ullrich, Rachel)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by International Paper Company re #99 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ullrich, Rachel)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Appendix in Support filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re #97 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions. Denying without prejudice #57 , #60 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying without prejudice #78 Motion to Strike. Defendants will have up to 30 days from the date of this Order to re-file summary judgment motions in accordance with this Order and the Court's direction at today's hearing. The usual response and reply deadlines apply. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/3/2017) (ndt)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane J. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2017 re: #71 MOTION to Withdraw Deemed Admissions. Motion granted. Order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kalandra Nicole Wheeler; Defense - Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich and Joseph H Gillespie. (Court Reporter: Shawnie Archuleta) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:33. (chmb)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court VACATES its #87 Order Referring Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions. And the Court sets a hearing with regard to Plaintiffs' #71 Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions for May 3, 2017 at 2:30 PM in Judge Boyle's Courtroom, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242-1310, before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/24/2017) (chmb)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #90 Joint Motion to Stay Case Pending Ruling on Motions for Summary Judgment. Accordingly the Court VACATES the pretrial conference and trial date. However, this Order does not stay the Court's consideration of Plaintiffs' #71 Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/20/2017) (chmb)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice #84 Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion to Compel Mediation. Plaintiffs may refile their Motion after the Court rules on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/20/2017) (chmb)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Ruling on Motions for Summary Judgment filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE filed by International Paper Company re: #84 Amended MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #84 Amended MOTION to Compel (Gillespie, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ***VACATED PER 93 ELECTRONIC ORDER*** ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiffs Chris Harrison and Christopher Love's Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions (Doc. #71 ) is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and recommendation or determination to this court. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/13/2017) (sss) Modified on 4/24/2017 (axm).
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #78 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence (Gillespie, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ELECTRONIC ORDER: As Plaintiffs have filed an Amended Motion to Compel Mediation (Doc. 84), the Court DENIES AS MOOT Defendant's original Motion to Compel Mediation (Doc. #83 ). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/6/2017) (chmb)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Amended MOTION to Compel filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Compel Mediation filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #78 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY filed by Chris Harrison, Christopher Love re: #71 MOTION to Withdraw Deemed Admissions (Wheeler, Kalandra)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE filed by International Paper Company re: #71 MOTION to Withdraw Deemed Admissions (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY filed by International Paper Company re: #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ullrich, Rachel)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #75 Appendix in Support. (Gillespie, Joseph) Modified title on 2/28/2017 (axm).
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Appendix in Support filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re #76 Reply (Attachments: #1 Exhibits D - G) (Gillespie, Joseph)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re: #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Gillespie, Joseph)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Appendix in Support filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re #73 Response/Objection, #74 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) to Appendix) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re #73 Response/Objection, to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment (Wheeler, Kalandra)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wheeler, Kalandra)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Appendix in Support filed by Chris Harrison, Christopher Love re #71 MOTION to Withdraw Deemed Admissions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) to Appendix) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw Deemed Admissions filed by Chris Harrison, Christopher Love with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint,,, filed by International Paper Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ullrich, Rachel)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #67 Defendant International Paper Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Its Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter Document 67-1 as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/13/2017) (chmb)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Appendix in Support filed by International Paper Company re #67 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Ullrich, Rachel)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #64 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs ask the Court to extend their deadline to respond until 20 days following the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. Because the Court denied Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, the Court finds it appropriate to extend the response deadline as to both Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 57, 60) to January 30, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/10/2017) (chmb)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #63 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant International Paper Company's (IPC) Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support. The Local Rules limit parties to no more than one motion for summary judgment, but the rule also gives discretion to the Court to allow a party to file more than one. LR 56.2(b). Judge Solis previously denied a Motion filed by IPC before the case was reassigned to this Court, but the Motion was styled as a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 42). Even though this Motion could be considered a motion for summary judgment, the Court nonetheless has the discretion to allow more than one motion for summary judgment. The Court finds it appropriate to exercise that discretion and allow IPC to pursue its Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 60). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/10/2017) (chmb)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson (Wheeler, Kalandra)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Strike #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Appendix in Support filed by International Paper Company re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #61 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Ullrich, Rachel)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by International Paper Company re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ullrich, Rachel)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Appendix in Support filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #58 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Gillespie, Joseph)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Gillespie, Joseph)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 (Gillespie, Joseph)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #55 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is now 12/21/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/17/2016) (chmb)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 (Gillespie, Joseph)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895. (Gillespie, Joseph)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #52 Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery is now due by 9/8/2016. Dispositive motions are now due by 11/14/2016. Joint Status Report regarding status of settlement negotiations is now due by 9/22/2016. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1516, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2017 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1516, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Jane J Boyle. All other dates set forth in the Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. 22) remain unchanged. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/19/2016) (chmb)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Scheduling Order,, #39 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Wheeler, Kalandra) Modified on 5/18/2016 (dss).
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court adopts all dates in the current Scheduling Order (Doc. 22), except for the trial and pre-trial conference dates, which are hereby vacated. The parties are ordered to meet, confer, and submit a new proposed trial date by 5/19/16. Their proposed trial date must be no later than 9/26/16. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/5/2016) (chmb)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SPECIAL ORDER NO. 3-304: Case reassigned to Judge Jane J Boyle for all further proceedings. Judge Jorge A Solis no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/26/2016) (ran)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Court DENIES International Paper's #42 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/19/2016) (ykp)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895. (Gillespie, Joseph)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint, filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gillespie, Joseph)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY filed by International Paper Company re: #42 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgement, as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support (Ullrich, Rachel)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer United Steelworkers answer due 2/26/2016; United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 answer due 2/26/2016. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 2/10/2016) (chmb)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gillespie, Joseph)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE filed by Fernando Chavez, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Christopher Love, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #42 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgement, as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgement, as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jrr)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND FIRST against International Paper Company, United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local Union No. 895 filed by Chris Harrison, Lee Fitch, James Thompson, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, Christopher Love, Fernando Chavez. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS International Paper's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #18 , the Court partially GRANTS and partially DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #32 , and the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Class Certification and Judicial Notice #15 . Plaintiffs have twenty-one days to refile an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order. By separate order, the Court will issue an amended scheduling order to extend discovery and reset other deadlines and hearings. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 12/16/2015) (ndt)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Designation of Expert Witnesses filed by International Paper Company (Ullrich, Rachel)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Designation of Experts by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY filed by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #32 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Wheeler, Kalandra)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Appendix in Support filed by International Paper Company re #34 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE filed by International Paper Company re: #32 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Ullrich, Rachel)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY filed by International Paper Company re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Ullrich, Rachel)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Wheeler, Kalandra)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER Granting #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Louis P. Britt III. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 6/23/2015) (chmb)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY filed by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re: #15 MOTION to Certify Class (Wheeler, Kalandra)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Louis P. Britt III (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6873972) filed by International Paper Company (Ullrich, Rachel)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #25 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response to #18 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. The deadline for filing a response to that motion is extended to August 3, 2015. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 6/15/2015) (chmb)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by International Paper Company (Prather, David)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Appendix in Support filed by International Paper Company re #23 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Ullrich, Rachel)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by International Paper Company re: #15 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ***VACATED PER #134 ORDER*** SCHEDULING ORDER: The JURY TRIAL is scheduled on this Court's two-week docket beginning 6/6/2016 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2016 at 11:30 AM before Chief Judge Jorge A Solis. Joinder of Parties due by 8/28/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2015. Discovery due by 2/1/2016. Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2016. Motions due by 3/2/2016. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2016. Pretrial Materials due by 5/25/2016. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 6/2/2015) (bdb) Modified on 8/16/2018 (zkc).
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Court hereby extends the deadline to respond to #15 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. Response now due by 6/5/2015. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 6/1/2015) (chmb)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time To File Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Judicial Notice filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Appendix in Support filed by International Paper Company re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Ullrich, Rachel)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by International Paper Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ullrich, Rachel)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson re #15 MOTION to Certify Class (Wheeler, Kalandra)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Notice) (Wheeler, Kalandra)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Requiring Attorney Conference and Proposal for Contents of Scheduling and Discovery Order: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/28/2015. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/28/2015) (chmb)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER Granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Prather. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/9/2015) (chmb)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David A. Prather (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6712716) filed by International Paper Company (Ullrich, Rachel)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Paper Company. (Ullrich, Rachel)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by International Paper Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ullrich, Rachel)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Otherwise Plead. The Court hereby extends the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint to April 15, 2015. And in the event this case is later certified as a collective action, the statute of limitations is tolled for any opt-in plaintiffs beginning April 1, 2015, until a responsive pleading is filed by Defendant. International Paper Company answer due 4/15/2015. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Otherwise Plead filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ziolkowski, Rachel)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson (Wheeler, Kalandra)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Fernando V. Chavez and Christopher Love on 03-03-2015. Amended (Wheeler, Kalandra)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Fernando V. Chavez and Christopher Love on 03-03-2015. (Wheeler, Kalandra) Modified security description on 3/12/2015 (ykp).
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to International Paper Company. (jrr)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Solis. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jrr)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, Jonathan Nelson, William Purviance, James Thompson. (Wheeler, Kalandra)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against International Paper Company filed by James Thompson, Lee Fitch, Chris Harrison, William Purviance, Jonathan Nelson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6643949) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) Plaintiff Consent Forms) (Wheeler, Kalandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Rachel Ziolkowski Ullrich
Represented By: David A Prather
Represented By: Louis P. Britt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steelworkers
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Hal K Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steelworkers Local Union No. 895
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Represented By: Hal K Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thompson
Represented By: Kalandra Nicole Wheeler
Represented By: Rasha Zeyadeh
Represented By: Rob J Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Fitch
Represented By: Kalandra Nicole Wheeler
Represented By: Rasha Zeyadeh
Represented By: Rob J Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Harrison
Represented By: Kalandra Nicole Wheeler
Represented By: Rasha Zeyadeh
Represented By: Rob J Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Nelson
Represented By: Kalandra Nicole Wheeler
Represented By: Rasha Zeyadeh
Represented By: Rob J Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Purviance
Represented By: Kalandra Nicole Wheeler
Represented By: Rasha Zeyadeh
Represented By: Rob J Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Love
Represented By: Kalandra Nicole Wheeler
Represented By: Rasha Zeyadeh
Represented By: Rob J Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Chavez
Represented By: Kalandra Nicole Wheeler
Represented By: Rasha Zeyadeh
Represented By: Rob J Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Maxel B Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?