Wiand v. Mejia
Plaintiff: Melvin Wiand
Defendant: Eddy Mejia
Case Number: 3:2015cv02891
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M.G. Lynn
Presiding Judge: Paul D Stickney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ACCEPTING 82 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 73 Motion to Reopen Case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/10/2018) (ykp)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ACCEPTING 65 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Partial Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 51 ] filed by Defendants Eddy Mejia, Monica Gifford, and Marquita Humphrey is GRANTED in part, and Plaintiff Melvin Wiand's claims against these defendants are dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/30/2017) (sss)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Accepting 10 Amended Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/11/2016) (mem)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiand v. Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Wiand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddy Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?