Bagley v. PennyMac Corp.
Plaintiff: Claresa Bagley
Defendant: PennyMac Corp.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00420
Filed: February 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Presiding Judge: Paul D Stickney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Accepting 28 Findings and Recommendations re: 24 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PennyMac Corp. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's 24 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims shall be dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/9/2017) (epm)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ACCEPTING 20 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. 17 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/9/2016) (epm)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ACCEPTING 14 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff Claresa Bagley's shall file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. Defendant PennyMac Corp.'s 5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/16/2016) (sss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley v. PennyMac Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claresa Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Corp.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Hayes
Represented By: Walter McInnis
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?