Jamison v. Fluor Corporation
Plaintiff: Michael Jamison
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv00441
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 98 Abstract of Judgment issued. (ykp)
January 17, 2020 Filing 97 Request for Clerk to issue Abstract of Judgment filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (Duffy, Dennis)
January 2, 2020 Filing 96 JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to #91 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Jamison. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 1/2/2020. (svc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 95 Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re #91 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Jamison. (svc)
August 7, 2019 Record on Appeal (Docket # 66 and docket sheet) for USCA5 19-10278 (related to #91 appeal): transmitted to Lippe & Associates by email. (epm) Modified on 8/8/2019 (epm).
June 27, 2019 Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 19-10278 (related to #91 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified,. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (epm)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER of USCA as to #91 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Jamison. The motion to supplement is GRANTED. (epm)
June 25, 2019 Sealed Record on Appeal (Docket entry #63 ) for USCA5 19-10278 (related to #91 appeal): transmitted to Lippe & Associates by email. (epm)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER of USCA as to #91 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Jamison. Appellant's unopposed motion to view and obtain sealed ECF # 63 and the order of 6/7/2018, is GRANTED. (epm)
April 2, 2019 Record on Appeal for USCA5 19-10278 (related to #91 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 1 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 60,63,69 (circuit approval is required for access),. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (epm)
March 14, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-10278 in USCA5 for #91 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Jamison. (svc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 92 Transcript Order Form: re #91 Notice of Appeal, transcript requested by Michael Jamison for Hearing held 12/3/2018 (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith.) Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court. (Lippe, Emil)
March 8, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #87 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #88 Judgment, to the Fifth Circuit by Michael Jamison. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-9835154. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Lippe, Emil)
March 4, 2019 Filing 90 Costs Taxed in amount of $3911.86 against Michael Jamison. (epm)
February 18, 2019 Filing 89 BILL OF COSTS by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Transcript Fee, #2 Exhibit(s) Transcript Fee, #3 Exhibit(s) Printing Fee, #4 Exhibit(s) Records Fee, #5 Exhibit(s) Records Fee) (Duffy, Dennis)
February 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 87, 88. Wed Feb 6 16:16:57 CST 2019 (crt)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINAL JUDGMENT: That Plaintiff take nothing by his claims against Defendant and that those claims are dismissed with prejudice. Court costs are taxed against Plaintiff. All relief not expressly granted is denied. This is a final judgment. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/6/2019) (zkc)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court grants Defendant's #75 Motion to Dismiss and dismisses this action with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/6/2019) (zkc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 85 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Motion Proceedings held on 12/3/2018 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (37 pages) Redaction Request due 12/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2019. (lms)
December 3, 2018 Filing 86 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2018 Re: #75 Motion to Dismiss filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Emil Lippe, Jr.; Defense - Ashlee Grant and Dennis Duffy. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:20. (chmb)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Motion Hearing is set for 12/3/2018 01:30 PM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer re: #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/14/2018) (chmb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 83 REPLY filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re: #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Duffy, Dennis)
September 20, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 82. Thu Sep 20 15:34:54 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Third-Party Subpoena and Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum and Motion for Protection of Privileged Documents. Plaintiff's Third-Party Subpoena issued to non-party Michael A. Clark & Associates is quashed at this time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/20/2018) (zkc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 81 Appendix in Support filed by Michael Jamison re #80 Response/Objection (Lippe, Emil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 80 RESPONSE filed by Michael Jamison re: #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Lippe, Emil)
September 6, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 79 with ADR Summary Form. Thu Sep 6 11:40:37 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints William Royal Furgeson as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/3/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/6/2018) (zkc)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/29/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/3/2019. Motions due by 3/29/2019. Pretrial Order due by 5/21/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2019 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Trial Date (three-week docket) 6/10/2019 - 6/14/2019 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/29/2018) (zkc)
August 28, 2018 Filing 77 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Appendix of Unpublished and Unreported Cases (Duffy, Dennis)
August 28, 2018 Filing 76 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Appendix of Exhibits (Duffy, Dennis)
August 28, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Duffy, Dennis)
August 23, 2018 Filing 74 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order -Agreed Proposed Second Amended Scheduling Order by Michael Jamison, Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (Lippe, Emil) Modified to add filer on 8/23/2018 (dsr).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #39 Motion to Dismiss in light of filing of an Amended Complaint #72 . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/15/2018) (chmb) Modified to assign document number on 8/15/2018 (zkc).
August 14, 2018 Filing 72 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fluor Federal Solutions LLC filed by Michael Jamison. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Third Amended Complaint. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/14/2018) (zkc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 70 REPLY filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re: #67 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena and Motion for Protection of Privileged Documents (Duffy, Dennis)
July 19, 2018 Filing 69 (Document Restricted) Sealed RESPONSE filed by Michael Jamison re: #67 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena and Motion for Protection of Privileged Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (Lippe, Emil) Modified security level on 7/23/2018 per attorneys request pursuant to order dated 1/24/2018. (axm).
June 28, 2018 Filing 68 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re #67 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena and Motion for Protection of Privileged Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I) (Grant, Ashlee)
June 28, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena and Motion for Protection of Privileged Documents filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Proposed Order) (Grant, Ashlee)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Motions due by 8/24/2018. Discovery due by 8/17/2018. Pretrial Order due by 10/26/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/21/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/26/2018) (ykp)
March 15, 2018 Filing 64 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Status Conference held on 3/15/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Emil Lippe; Defense - Dennis Duffy and Timothy Durst. (Court Reporter: Not Recorded) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (mcrd)
March 14, 2018 Filing 63 (Document Restricted) Sealed Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Sealed pursuant to order dated 1/24/2018) filed by Michael Jamison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AFTER CASE TRANSFER: Lead counsel for each party, or alternatively, counsel with authority to bind their respective clients and lead counsel, and all unrepresented parties, shall be present. Status Conference set for 3/15/2018 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/12/2018) (ewd)
February 8, 2018 Filing 60 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #48 Motion for Leave to File (Sealed pursuant to order dated 1/24/2018) filed by Michael Jamison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Lippe, Emil)
January 25, 2018 Filing 59 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re #58 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Proposed Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Tab 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Tab 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Tab 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Tab 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Tab 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Tab 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Tab 7, #8 Exhibit(s) Tab 8, #9 Exhibit(s) Tab 9, #10 Exhibit(s) Tab 10, #11 Exhibit(s) Tab 11, #12 Exhibit(s) Tab 12, #13 Exhibit(s) Tab 13) (Duffy, Dennis)
January 25, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re: #48 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Duffy, Dennis)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/24/2018) (zkc)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order #51 and adopting, with modification, Defendant's Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, attached as Exhibit B to the joint motion [51-2]. The Court determines that Plaintiff has not shown good cause to prospectively permit use in other cases of materials that will be -- but have not yet been -- produced as "Confidential" in this case. Michael Jamison may still seek to obtain the same materials from Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC through appropriate discovery mechanisms in the other cases, or, if appropriate, a later request may be made in this case for the Court to modify this Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, on a showing of good cause, to permit use of particular materials in another case. The Court will separately enter the Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, attached as Exhibit B to the joint motion [51-2], as modified. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/24/2018.)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Referring #51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/24/2018) (zkc)
January 22, 2018 Filing 54 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re #53 Response/Objection, to Plaintiff's Supplement to Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Tab 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Tab 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Tab 3) (Duffy, Dennis)
January 22, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re: #52 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (Duffy, Dennis)
January 19, 2018 Filing 52 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Michael Jamison re #51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement Plaintiff's Supplement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Lippe, Emil)
January 19, 2018 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Duffy, Dennis)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #49 Motion Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/8/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 6/25/2018. Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2018. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/5/2018) (ams)
January 4, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Michael Jamison (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
January 4, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Michael Jamison with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment Exhibit "A", #2 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
November 6, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re: #46 Response/Objection, #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Duffy, Dennis)
October 26, 2017 Filing 46 RESPONSE filed by Michael Jamison re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Lippe, Emil)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #44 Agreed Motion of Plaintiff for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is now due October 26, 2017, and Defendant's reply is now due November 6, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/4/2017) (chmb)
October 4, 2017 Filing 44 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael Jamison (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil) Modified docket text on 10/5/2017 (ajb).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ***Please Disregard - Duplicate entry of document #42 *** Order Unfiling #41 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Extend the Parties' Deadline for Expert Designation due to the following deficiency: A schedule may be modified only for good cause and with the judges consent. See F.R.C.P. 16(B)(4). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/22/2017) (axm) Modified on 9/22/2017 (axm).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER STRIKING/UNFILING PLEADING and Notice of Deficiency re #41 Joint Stipulation: A schedule may be modified only for good cause and with the judges consent. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/22/2017) (rekc)
September 20, 2017 Filing 41 ***STRICKEN PER #42 ORDER*** Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Extend the Parties' Deadlines for Expert Designations by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Duffy, Dennis) Modified on 9/22/2017 (rekc).
September 14, 2017 Filing 40 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M) (Duffy, Dennis)
September 14, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Duffy, Dennis)
August 31, 2017 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fluor Federal Solutions LLC, Fluor Federal Solutions LLC filed by Michael Jamison. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (English, Jay)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendant's #24 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's #22 First Amended Complaint. The Court further GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a second amended Complaint no later than 8/31/2017. If Plaintiff fails to amend his Complaint by 8/31/2017, then his claims against Defendant will be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/28/2017) (ran)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Anne Ashby as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/22/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/26/2017) (aaa)
April 25, 2017 Filing 35 Joint RESPONSE filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC, Michael Jamison re: #34 Order to Show Cause (Duffy, Dennis) Modified filers on 4/25/2017 (aaa).
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint report naming a mediator within 35 days of entry of the scheduling order. They did not. For that reason, the Court ORDERS the parties to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than 4/2817 as to why they have failed to file the joint report naming a mediator. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/21/2017) (ash)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 5/21/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 8/24/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2017. Motions due by 2/20/2018. Discovery due by 1/22/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/22/2017. Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 5/7/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/16/2017) (epm)
March 6, 2017 Filing 32 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (Duffy, Dennis)
February 23, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Jay C English on behalf of Michael Jamison. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (English, Jay)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/13/2017) (aaa)
February 10, 2017 Filing 29 REPLY filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Duffy, Dennis)
January 20, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Michael Jamison re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (English, Jay)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Motion. The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion for Order Granting Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply. The deadline for Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 24) is January 20, 2017. Defendant's reply now due February 10, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/22/2016) (chmb)
December 21, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Jamison (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (English, Jay)
December 16, 2016 Filing 25 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Duffy, Dennis)
December 16, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Fluor Federal Solutions LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Dennis Paul Duffy added to party Fluor Federal Solutions LLC(pty:dft) (Duffy, Dennis)
September 28, 2016 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (ykp)
September 28, 2016 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fluor Federal Solutions LLC filed by Michael Jamison. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp) Modified on 9/28/2016 (ykp).
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Proposed First Amended Complaint and DISMISSES with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Fluor Corporation. Fluor Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 11) is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) remove Fluor Corporation as a party to this case; (2) enter Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. 20, Ex. 1) as of the date of this Order; and (3) issue summons as to Defendant Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/28/2016) (chmb)
September 27, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Jamison (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (English, Jay)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Michael Jamison must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff must seek Defendant Fluor Corporation's written consent or leave of court to file an amended complaint. The Court's Order (Doc. 16 ) extending Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant Fluor Corporation's Motion to Dismiss was just that: It granted Plaintiff additional time to file a response. It did not, however, grant leave to file an amended complaint (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/16/2016) (sss)
September 14, 2016 Filing 18 ***UNFILED per #19 Order*** Summons Issued as to Fluor Enterprises Inc, Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (epm) Modified on 9/16/2016 (sss).
September 13, 2016 Filing 17 ***UNFILED per #19 Order*** AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs filed by Michael Jamison. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (English, Jay) Modified on 9/16/2016 (sss).
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 11) due September 13, 2016. Defendant's reply due October 4, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/30/2016) (chmb)
August 30, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Original Complaint And Brief In SupportMotion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Jamison (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (English, Jay)
August 19, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dennis Paul Duffy for Timothy S. Durst and Charitie L. Hartsig on behalf of Fluor Corporation. (Duffy, Dennis)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #9 Motion for Leave to File. The Court hereby DENIES Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/17/2016) (chmb)
August 16, 2016 Filing 12 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Corporation re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Original Complaint And Brief In SupportMotion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Duffy, Dennis)
August 16, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Original Complaint And Brief In Support, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by Fluor Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Duffy, Dennis)
August 16, 2016 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by Fluor Corporation re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File To Proceed Without Local Counsel (Duffy, Dennis)
August 16, 2016 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Fluor Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Duffy, Dennis)
July 7, 2016 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Michael Jamison. (English, Jay)
June 17, 2016 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (English, Jay)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Service of summons and complaint has not been made on Defendant. If such service is not accomplished by June 20, 2016, Plaintiffs claims against Defendant will be subject to dismissal without prejudice and without further notice, absent good cause shown. re: #5 Summons Issued (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/6/2016) (mem)
February 17, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fluor Corporation. (ykp)
February 17, 2016 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
February 17, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Michael Jamison (English, Jay)
February 17, 2016 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Jamison. (English, Jay)
February 17, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Fluor Corporation filed by Michael Jamison. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7384987) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Right to Sue Letter) (English, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jamison
Represented By: Jay C English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?