Smallwood v. Willow Way LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ernest C Smallwood, Jr and Eartha Y Smallwood
Defendant: Willow Way LLC, Bank of America NA, Richard E Anderson, Barrett Dafin Frappier Turner & Engal and Anderson Vela
Case Number: 3:2017cv00242
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: A. Joe Fish
Presiding Judge: David L. Horan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ACCEPTING 94 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 78 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America NA, granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Willow Way LLC, denying 84 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eartha Y Smallwood, Ernest C Smallwood Jr. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/20/2019) (aaa)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order Accepting 60 Findings and Recommendations re: 53 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Ernest C Smallwood, Jr. The court's previous order accepting findings and recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (docket entry [ 46]) is hereby AMENDED to provide that defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s motion to dismiss (docket entry 8 ) and Willow Way LLC, Richard Anderson and Anderson Velas motion to dismiss (docket entry 19) are DENIED as to plaintiffs Ernest C. Small wood, Jr. and Eartha Y. Smallwood's statute of limitations claim. Plaintiffs Ernest C. Smallwood, Jr. and Eartha Y. Smallwood's statute of limitations claim is NOT DISMISSED and may proceed in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/2/2018) (epm)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ACCEPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/25/2017) (axm)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ACCEPTING 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/28/2017) (twd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smallwood v. Willow Way LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest C Smallwood, Jr
Represented By: Donald Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eartha Y Smallwood
Represented By: Donald Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Way LLC
Represented By: Richard Ernest Anderson
Represented By: Ray L Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Matthew David Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E Anderson
Represented By: Richard Ernest Anderson
Represented By: Ray L Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Dafin Frappier Turner & Engal
Represented By: Shelley L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Vela
Represented By: Richard Ernest Anderson
Represented By: Ray L Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?