Creuzot v. Green
Plaintiff: John C Creuzot
Defendant: Alvin Green
Counter_claimant: Alvin Green
Counter_defendant: John C Creuzot
Case Number: 3:2017cv00404
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M.G. Lynn
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1131
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order Accepting 69 Findings and Recommendations, granting 65 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by John C Creuzot. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/21/2019) (ndt)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ACCEPTING THE 60 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/1/2019) (ykp)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Accepting 22 Findings and Recommendations re: 6 Amended Complaint filed by John C Creuzot. Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction, is GRANTED. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/9/2017) (ndt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creuzot v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Creuzot
Represented By: Jennifer Salim Richards
Represented By: James M Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Alvin Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John C Creuzot
Represented By: Jennifer Salim Richards
Represented By: James M Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?