Associated Recovery LLC v. Butcher et al

Plaintiff: Associated Recovery LLC
Defendant: Butcher, PriveCo Inc, Tumult Inc, Sylvia Odonohoe, FujiFilm North American Corporation, GoldRun Inc, Alansis Corporation, Buyers International Group LLC, Steve Fortuna, Hart Cunningham, Lincoln Brown, TOBYCLEMENTS.COM LLC, Virtual Investments LLC, Timy Lee, Electronic Arts Inc, Luigi Marruso, William Wolfson, Strong Inc, JRS Holdings LLC, Quinn Veysey, Adam Strong, Vivian Rosenthal, Fantasy Spin Game LLC, Alansis.com Incorporated, Toby Clements, Richard Jordan, Worldwide Retailing LLC, Lookout Inc, Media Options Inc, Steve Parma, JANNO LLC, Creation Media LLC, NEWS LTD, Merlin Kauffman, Slice Technology Inc, Floridian LLC, CBRE Group Inc, Chris Carli, Rahul Jain, Louis Spagnuolo, ONIG LLC, MOINC-US,, Klee Miller, HRJM Business Broker, GoDaddy.com LLC, SOCIALBON Inc, John McGregor, Telepathy Inc, Dharshinee Naidu, Alberto Escarlate, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, DGB Partner Inc, All-Pro Fasteners Inc, Brian McDonald, Kate Spade, Nathaniel Cohen, SOL PERLSTEIN, Radical Investments Management LLC, Trov Inc, True Magic LLC, Whois Privacy Protection Service, Linda Butcher, Andrew Rosener, DropCatch.com LLC and Power Home Technologies LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00651
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER: The court denies without prejudice the motions to dismiss (Docs. 94, 119) filed in Civil Action No. 3:17-CV-651-L. The court also denies without prejudice the motions for sanctions (Doc. 128). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/6/2017) (ash)
March 23, 2017 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:152. Thu Mar 23 10:15:05 CDT 2017 (crt)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:17-cv-424-L, 3:17-cv-651-L consolidated with lead case 3:16-CV-1025-L. All future docketing should be in lead case 3:16-CV-1025-L. The court directs Plaintiff to notify the court in writing by March 31, 2017, whether there are any other pending cases or cases that Plaintiff anticipates filing in the coming year that involve claims pertaining to the sale of assets by the receiver in the Netsphere litigation. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/23/2017) (aaa)
March 23, 2017 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:151. Thu Mar 23 09:29:47 CDT 2017 (crt)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and #143 Request to Submit the Motion to Withdraw for Decision. Attorney Luiz Felipe Correa de Oliveira terminated. The request to stay is denied. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/23/2017) (rekc)
March 22, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Slice Technology Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Siebman, Clyde)
March 21, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Telepathy Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Siebman, Clyde)
March 21, 2017 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:148. Mailed NEF Tue Mar 21 13:10:32 CDT 2017 (crt)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #147 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lora A. Brzezynski. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/21/2017) (chmb)
March 20, 2017 Filing 147 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8286396) filed by Creation Media LLC, Fantasy Spin Game LLC, ONIG LLC, Adam Strong, Strong Inc, True Magic LLC, Tumult Inc, Virtual Investments LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Brzezynski, Lora)
March 20, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Attorney Appearances filed by Creation Media LLC, Fantasy Spin Game LLC, ONIG LLC, Adam Strong, Strong Inc, True Magic LLC, Tumult Inc, Virtual Investments LLC (Pierson, Adam)
March 16, 2017 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:145. Thu Mar 16 16:39:17 CDT 2017 (crt)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #144 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Accordingly, Defendant Lookout, Inc. may proceed without designating local counsel. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/16/2017) (chmb)
March 16, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION (Unopposed) For Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Lookout Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mann, J)
March 16, 2017 Filing 143 Request to Submit the #134 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Decision filed by Associated Recovery LLC (Oliveira, Luiz) Modified title and event type on 3/17/2017 (epm).
March 10, 2017 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:142. Fri Mar 10 16:56:58 CST 2017 (crt)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby directed to effect service on Defendants Vivian Rosenthal; William Wolfson; Steve Parma; SOL PERLSTEIN; TOBYCLEMENTS.COM LLC; JANNO, LLC; Steve Fortuna; SOCIALBON, Inc.; Floridian, LLC; MOINC-US; NEWS, LTD.; Worldwide Retailing, LLC; Sylvia Odonohoe; JRS Holdings, LLC; Dharshinee Naidu; Kate Spade; and GoldRun, Inc. by 3/30/2017, or show good cause in writing for the failure or inability to effect service. Failure of Plaintiff to effect service or show good cause by this date will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice against these Defendants pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/10/2017) (sss)
March 6, 2017 Filing 141 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran)
March 6, 2017 Filing 140 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:16-cv-00126. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 6, 2017 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas Dallas Division. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 15, 2017 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff, Associated Recovery, and Plaintiff's Attorneys, and Supporting Briefing filed by LOOKOUT, INC. (Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 13, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lora Ann Brzezynski on behalf of ADAM STRONG, Creation Media, LLC, Fantasy Spin Game, LLC, Media Options, Inc., ONIG, LLC,, STRONG, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6153921. (Brzezynski, Lora) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 9, 2017 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TUMULT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff, Associated Recovery, and Plaintiff's Attorneys, and Supporting Briefing by Plaintiff, Associated Recovery filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 134 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Luiz Oliveira, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.] Modified on 3/16/2017 per document 143(svc).
February 8, 2017 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff, Associated Recovery, and Plaintiff's Attorneys, and Supporting Briefing Plaintiff's Counsel's Opposition filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Luiz Oliviera, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Doll on behalf of ADAM STRONG, Creation Media, LLC, Fantasy Spin Game, LLC, Media Options, Inc., ONIG, LLC,, STRONG, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC (Doll, Patrick) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam H Pierson on behalf of Fantasy Spin Game, LLC, TUMULT, INC. (Pierson, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/6/2017. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 6, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Nelson Hall on behalf of LOOKOUT, INC (Hall, Lawrence) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
January 25, 2017 Filing 128 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff, Associated Recovery, and Plaintiff's Attorneys, and Supporting Briefing by LOOKOUT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER finding as moot #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer at least due to the granting of #50 and Order #71 granting #70 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/12/2017. (rsp3, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #124 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal) filed by Associated Recovery, LLC., TROV INC. terminated.,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/10/2017. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #119 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3, #4 Exhibit Exh. 4, #5 Exhibit Exh. 5, #6 Exhibit Exh. 6, #7 Exhibit Exh. 7, #8 Exhibit Exh. 8)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal) by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #119 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 1/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/27/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 122 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #119 MOTION to Dismiss by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/05/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant Alansis.com Motion to Dismiss by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss by Alansis.com, Incorporated. (Casper, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
November 8, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alansis.com, Incorporated to 11/25/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 118 Defendant's Unopposed 2nd Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alansis Corporation.( Casper, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
November 4, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE by Fantasy Spin Game, LLC re #108 Reply to Response to Motion, #94 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer (Notice of Joinder) (Pierson, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 116 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Beard, R) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/24/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 21, 2016 Filing 114 MOTION to Withdraw Steven M. Geiszler as Counsel for Defendants by ADAM STRONG, Creation Media, LLC, Media Options, Inc., ONIG, LLC,, STRONG, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierson, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 19, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam H Pierson on behalf of ADAM STRONG, Creation Media, LLC, Media Options, Inc., ONIG, LLC,, STRONG, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC (Pierson, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 13, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alansis.com, Incorporated to 11/9/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 13, 2016 Filing 112 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alansis.com, Incorporated.( Casper, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 13, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Casper on behalf of Alansis.com, Incorporated (Casper, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 11, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fantasy Spin Game, LLC to 11/4/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 10, 2016 Filing 110 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fantasy Spin Game, LLC.( Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE by Electronic Arts, Inc. re #108 Reply to Response to Motion, (Notice of Joinder) (Lamb, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer filed by ADAM STRONG, CBRE Group, Inc., Creation Media, LLC, ONIG, LLC,, POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC., STRONG, INC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TELEPATHY, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, Quinn Veysey. (Boehm, Joel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Replies due by 10/6/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/26/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 26, 2016 Filing 106 NOTICE by Associated Recovery, LLC re #99 Notice (Other) re. Motion to Dismiss (Opposition to) (Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #94 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer by ADAM STRONG, CBRE Group, Inc., Creation Media, LLC, ONIG, LLC,, POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, PRIVECO, INC., RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC., STRONG, INC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TELEPATHY, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, Quinn Veysey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boehm, Joel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Rakuten, Inc. for SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC.. (Boehm, Joel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADAM STRONG, Creation Media, LLC, ONIG, LLC,, STRONG, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC (Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 101 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) Modified on 9/19/2016 (sm, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 19, 2016 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion submitted document #100 does not contain a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 16, 2016 Filing 100 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 15, 2016 Filing 99 NOTICE by Electronic Arts, Inc. re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer (Notice of Joinder) (Lamb, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 12, 2016 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of minimum contacts filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DISMISSING FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/12/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 6, 2016 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by ALL-PRO FASTENERS, INC.. (Hassett, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 2, 2016 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Electronic Arts, Inc. to 9/15/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/2/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 1, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer by ADAM STRONG, CBRE Group, Inc., Creation Media, LLC, ONIG, LLC,, POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, PRIVECO, INC., RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC., STRONG, INC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TELEPATHY, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, Quinn Veysey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
September 1, 2016 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second) by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Under R12(b), Alternatively, To Transfer in Interest of Justice, and Supporting Briefing filed by LOOKOUT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7)(Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Associated Recovery, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 26, 2016 Filing 89 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of minimum contacts by Buyers International Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1-Mtn & Order-sale of names, #2 Ex 2-Op-Netsphere v Baron, #3 Ex 3-Op & Order-Baron v. Vogel, #4 Ex 4-Aff. of Sarsour, #5 proposed Order)(Moore, Jerome) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2016: #6 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/24/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 24, 2016 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Electronic Arts, Inc. to 9/1/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/24/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 23, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Buyers International Group, LLC to 8/26/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 23, 2016 Filing 86 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buyers International Group, LLC.( Moore, Jerome) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 23, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Buyers International Group, LLC to 8/11/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 23, 2016 Filing 85 Defendant's Unopposed first Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buyers International Group, LLC.( Moore, Jerome) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 23, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR- was filed using the wrong event and re-file second application when the first application in on file. Document # 82 and 83, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice and Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 22, 2016 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Under R12(b), Alternatively, To Transfer in Interest of Justice, and Supporting Briefing filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 22, 2016 Filing 83 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buyers International Group, LLC.( Moore, Jerome) Modified on 8/23/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 22, 2016 Filing 82 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jerome A Moore on behalf of Buyers International Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5897057. (Attachments: #1 ApprovedAdmission PHV)(Moore, Jerome) Modified on 8/23/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 22, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR - exceeds the number of days the clerk is allowed to grant. Document # 80, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 22, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jerome A Moore on behalf of Buyers International Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5896608. (Moore, Jerome) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 22, 2016 Filing 80 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed first Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buyers International Group, LLC.( Moore, Jerome) Modified on 8/22/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 22, 2016 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 19, 2016 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION to Dismiss Under R12(b), Alternatively, To Transfer in Interest of Justice, and Supporting Briefing by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 17, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Franklin Michael Smith on behalf of PRIVECO, INC.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5890772. (Smith, Franklin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 16, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE by FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICAN CORPORATION re #68 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Michael Scott Fuller and Paul D Lein for CBRE Group, Inc.. Attorney Sabrina A Larson and Jennifer Lee Taylor terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/12/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 11, 2016 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ALL-PRO FASTENERS, INC. (Hassett, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 11, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue by ALL-PRO FASTENERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - motion and order for domain sales, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - March 27, 2015 order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Vogel dismissal order, #4 Text of Proposed Order order of dismissal, #5 Text of Proposed Order alternative order of transfer)(Hassett, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 11, 2016 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Locke Lord LLP to replace Morrison & Foerster LLP by CBRE Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fuller, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint filed by TELEPATHY, INC, RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, TUMULT, INC., ONIG, LLC,, CBRE Group, Inc., Creation Media, LLC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, STRONG, INC, SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC., ADAM STRONG, Quinn Veysey, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, PRIVECO, INC. Deadline is 9/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/10/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 9, 2016 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by ADAM STRONG, CBRE Group, Inc., Creation Media, LLC, ONIG, LLC,, POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, PRIVECO, INC., RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC., STRONG, INC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TELEPATHY, INC, TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, Quinn Veysey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 8, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Electronic Arts, Inc. to 8/22/2016. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 69 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electronic Arts, Inc..( Lamb, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Associated Recovery, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificat of Service)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LOOKOUT, INC (Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 5, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TROV INC. to 8/25/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Under R12(b), Alternatively, To Transfer in Interest of Justice, and Supporting Briefing by LOOKOUT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Irene Liu, #2 Exhibit D-1 to Declaration of Irene Liu, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #9 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer)(Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 65 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Associated Recovery, LLC. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant Trov, Inc.)( Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 4, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR - first application is already on file. Document # 63, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 4, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for STEVE PARMA to 8/27/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 4, 2016 Filing 64 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Associated Recovery, LLC. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant Steve Parma)( Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 4, 2016 Filing 63 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Associated Recovery, LLC. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant Trov, Inc.)( Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) Modified on 8/4/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 4, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC. to 8/25/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 4, 2016 Filing 62 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SLICE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.(Boehm, Joel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hilda Contreras Galvan terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/3/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 3, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TUMULT, INC. to 8/23/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 3, 2016 Filing 60 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TUMULT, INC..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 3, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC to 8/23/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 3, 2016 Filing 59 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC.( Klemchuk, Darin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 3, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICAN CORPORATION to 8/23/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 2, 2016 Filing 58 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION.(Golden, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 2, 2016 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 2, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to 8/22/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
August 2, 2016 Filing 56 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.( Beard, R) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 29, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Geiszler on behalf of VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC (Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 19, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC to 8/22/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 53 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.( Lamb, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue by Linda Butcher, et al., DGB PARTNER, INC. (Richerson, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2016: #2 Dismissal Proposed Order, #3 Transfer Venue Proposed Order) (nkl, ).[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 12, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TRUE MAGIC, LLC to 8/15/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 12, 2016 Filing 51 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TRUE MAGIC, LLC.( Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 12, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 12, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ONIG, LLC, to 8/12/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 50 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC.( Galvan, Hilda) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 49 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ONIG, LLC,.( Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 46, Application for Extension of Time to ANSWER to Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 48 SUMMONS Issued as to Alansis.com, Incorporated c/o ST Service Co., Fantasy Spin Game, LLC c/o Donn Worby, GoldRun, Inc. c/o Vivian Rosenthal and c/o John A. Doerst. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Fantasy Spin Game LLC, #2 Summons(es) GoldRun Inc, #3 Summons(es) Alansis.com Incorporated)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Quinn Veysey to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Quinn Veysey.( Levine, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TROV INC. to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 46 FILED IN ERROR Application for Extension of Time to ANSWER to Complaint by Quinn Veysey.(Levine, Mark) Modified on 7/11/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Filing 45 Plaintiff's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint on behalf of Defendant Trov Inc. re Associated Recovery, LLC. ( Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 11, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICAN CORPORATION to 8/8/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 9, 2016 Filing 44 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time)(Galvan, Hilda) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 43 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION.(Golden, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry M Golden on behalf of FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICAN CORPORATION (Golden, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 8, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Electronic Arts, Inc. to 8/8/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electronic Arts, Inc..( Lamb, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CBRE Group, Inc. to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CBRE Group, Inc..( Taylor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sabrina A Larson on behalf of CBRE Group, Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5819204 paid previously (see Dkt entry #31)(Larson, Sabrina) Modified on 7/11/2016 (pkb, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for STRONG, INC to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ADAM STRONG to 8/11/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re STRONG, INC.( Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADAM STRONG.( Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ALL-PRO FASTENERS, INC. to 8/11/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Creation Media, LLC to 8/11/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 7, 2016 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ALL-PRO FASTENERS, INC..( Hassett, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Creation Media, LLC.( Geiszler, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 6, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PRIVECO, INC. to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PRIVECO, INC.. (Gunter, Debra) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 6, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TELEPATHY, INC to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TELEPATHY, INC.( Pandya, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 5, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TUMULT, INC. to 8/8/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TUMULT, INC..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 5, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR - the attorney appearing in the case has to file with his/her login. Document # 31, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 31 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Lee Taylor on behalf of CBRE Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5819204. (Taylor, Jennifer) Modified on 7/5/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Lee Taylor on behalf of CBRE Group, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5819185. (Taylor, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 30, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC to 8/7/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corey Jennifer Weinstein on behalf of RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC (Weinstein, Corey) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Douglas Davidson on behalf of RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC (Davidson, Aaron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC.( Klemchuk, Darin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darin Michael Klemchuk on behalf of RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC (Klemchuk, Darin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 29, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LOOKOUT, INC to 8/5/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 29, 2016 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LOOKOUT, INC.( Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 29, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of LOOKOUT, INC (Mann, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 27, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC. to 8/10/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 27, 2016 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC..( Boehm, Joel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 23, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to 8/7/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.( Beard, R) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Under Rule 15(a)(1)(A).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/22/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/22/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued as to Media Options, Inc.. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 17, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (COMPLETE SERVICE AND FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE) by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 17, 2016 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued as to DGB PARTNER, INC c/o Todd G. Rowan, STRONG, INC. c/o Todd M. Goebel (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Strong Inc..)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 16, 2016 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued as to ALL-PRO FASTENERS, INC., Buyers International Group, LLC, CBRE Group, Inc., Creation Media, LLC, Electronic Arts, Inc., FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICAN CORPORATION, JRS HOLDINGS, LLC, LOOKOUT, INC, POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, PRIVECO, INC., SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC., SOCIALBON, INC, TELEPATHY, INC, TOBYCLEMENTS.COM, LLC, TROV INC., TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., WORLDWIDE RETAILING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) \Buyers International Group Inc, #2 Summons(es) CBRE Group Inc, #3 Summons(es) Creation Media LLC, #4 Summons(es) Electronic Arts Inc, #5 Summons(es) Fujifilm North America Corporation, #6 Summons(es) JRS Holdings LLC, #7 Summons(es) Lookout Inc, #8 Summons(es) Power Home Technologies LLC, #9 Summons(es) PriveCo Inc, #10 Summons(es) Slice Technologies Inc, #11 Summons(es) SocialBon Inc, #12 Summons(es) Telepathy Inc, #13 Summons(es) tobyclements.com LLC, #14 Summons(es) Trov Inc, #15 Summons(es) True Magic LLC, #16 Summons(es) Tumult Inc, #17 Summons(es) Worldwide Retailing LLC)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 16, 2016 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 16, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2016: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 16, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR- was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 13, AMENDED COMPLAINT (Motion for Leave to Amend). PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
June 16, 2016 Filing 13 FILED IN ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT (Motion for Leave to Amend) against All Defendants, filed by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit)(Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) Modified on 6/16/2016 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Vacate Hearing and Substitute Counsel. granting #4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. The hearing scheduled for May 13, 2016 on Plaintiffs Former Counsels Motion to Withdraw is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/12/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
May 10, 2016 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney , Consent MOTION to Vacate Hearing by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Travis Brown - Managing Member, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Halla, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/18/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to JOHN MCGREGOR. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to ADAM STRONG, ALBERTO ESCARLATE, ALL-PRO FASTENERS, INC., BRIAN MCDONALD, Linda Butcher, et al., Buyers International Group, LLC, CBRE Group, Inc., CHRIS CARLI,, Creation Media, LLC, DGB PARTNER, INC, DROPCATCH.COM, LLC, Electronic Arts, Inc., FLORIDIAN, LLC, FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICAN CORPORATION, GoDaddy.com, LLC, HART CUNNINGHAM, HRJM Business Broker, JAANO, LLC, JRS HOLDINGS, LLC, Rahul Jain, KLEE MILLER, LINCOLN BROWN, LOOKOUT, INC, LOUIS SPAGNUOLO, LUIGI MARRUSO, MERLIN KAUFFMAN, NATHANIEL COHEN, NEWS, LTD,, Dharshinee Naidu, ONIG, LLC,, POWER HOME TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, PRIVECO, INC., RADICAL INVESTMENTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, RICHARD JORDAN, SLICE TECHNOLOGY, INC. F/K/A PROJECT SLICE, INC., SOCIALBON, INC, SOL PERLSTEIN, STEVE FORTUNA, STEVE PARMA, STRONG, INC, SYLVIA ODONOHOE, Kate Spade, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TELEPATHY, INC, TOBY CLEMENTS, TOBYCLEMENTS.COM, LLC, TROV INC., TRUE MAGIC, LLC, TUMULT, INC., VIRTUAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, VIVIAN ROSENTHAL, Quinn Veysey, WILLIAM WOLFSON, WORLDWIDE RETAILING, LLC, Whois Privacy Protection Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Alberto Escarlate, #2 Summons(es) All-Pro Fasteners, #3 Summons(es) Brian McDonald, #4 Summons(es) Buyers International Group Inc, #5 Summons(es) CBRE Group Inc, #6 Summons(es) Chris Carli, #7 Summons(es) Creation Media LLC, #8 Summons(es) DGB Partners Inc, #9 Summons(es) Dharshinee Naidu, #10 Summons(es) DropCatch.com LLC, #11 Summons(es) Electronics Arts Inc, #12 Summons(es) Floridians LLC, #13 Summons(es) Fujifilm North America Corporation, #14 Summons(es) GoDaddy.com LLC, #15 Summons(es) Hart Cummingham, #16 Summons(es) HRJM Business Broker LLC, #17 Summons(es) Jaano LLC, #18 Summons(es) JRS Holdings LLC, #19 Summons(es) Kate Spade, #20 Summons(es) Klee Miller, #21 Summons(es) Lincoln Brown, #22 Summons(es) Linda Butcher, #23 Summons(es) Lookout Inc, #24 Summons(es) Louis Spagnuolo, #25 Summons(es) Luigi Marruso, #26 Summons(es) Merlin Kauffman, #27 Summons(es) Nathaniel Cohen, #28 Summons(es) News LTD, #29 Summons(es) Onig LLC, #30 Summons(es) Power Home Technologies LLC, #31 Summons(es) PriveCo Inc, #32 Summons(es) Quinn Veysey, #33 Summons(es) Rahul Jain, #34 Summons(es) Radical Investments Management LLC, #35 Summons(es) Richard Jordan, #36 Summons(es) Slice Technologies Inc, #37 Summons(es) SocialBon Inc, #38 Summons(es) Sol Perlstein, #39 Summons(es) State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #40 Summons(es) Steve Fortuna, #41 Summons(es) Steve Parma, #42 Summons(es) Strong Inc, #43 Summons(es) Sylvia ODonohoe, #44 Summons(es) Telepathy Inc, #45 Summons(es) Toby Clements, #46 Summons(es) tobyclements.com LLC, #47 Summons(es) Trov Inc, #48 Summons(es) True Magic LLC, #49 Summons(es) Tumult Inc, #50 Summons(es) Virtual Investments LLC, #51 Summons(es) Vivian Rosenthal, #52 Summons(es) Whois Privacy Protection Service Inc, #53 Summons(es) William Wolfson, #54 Summons(es) Worldwide Retailing LLC)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Luiz Felipe Correa de Oliveira on behalf of Associated Recovery, LLC (Correa de Oliveira, Luiz Felipe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
April 14, 2016 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Halla, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2016: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #4 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/12/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
March 25, 2016 Filing 4 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Associated Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Request to Submit for Decision, #4 Affidavit)(Halla, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 9, 2016 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Halla, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2016: #1 Revised Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 9, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/2016. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 9, 2016 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5602070.), filed by Associated Recovery, LLC.(Halla, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/6/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Recovery LLC v. Butcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Recovery LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Stempien
Represented By: Paul Grandinetti
Represented By: Luiz Felipe Correa de Oliveira
Represented By: Michael B Halla
Represented By: Anthony Marquis Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PriveCo Inc
Represented By: Debby Gunter
Represented By: Franklin M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tumult Inc
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Odonohoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FujiFilm North American Corporation
Represented By: Barry M Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoldRun Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alansis Corporation
Represented By: Brian Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buyers International Group LLC
Represented By: Jerome A Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Fortuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hart Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOBYCLEMENTS.COM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtual Investments LLC
Represented By: Hilda C Galvan
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timy Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc
Represented By: William Robert Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luigi Marruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong Inc
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRS Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Veysey
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Strong
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantasy Spin Game LLC
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alansis.com Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Retailing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lookout Inc
Represented By: Lawrence Nelson Hall
Represented By: J Mark Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Media Options Inc
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Parma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANNO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creation Media LLC
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlin Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slice Technology Inc
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Joel C Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floridian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE Group Inc
Represented By: Michael Scott Fuller
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Paul D Lein
Represented By: Sabrina A Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Carli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahul Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Spagnuolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONIG LLC
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOINC-US,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klee Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRJM Business Broker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIALBON Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telepathy Inc
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Brian H Pandya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dharshinee Naidu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Escarlate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: R. William Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGB Partner Inc
Represented By: Jason James Richerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-Pro Fasteners Inc
Represented By: Michael E Hassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Spade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOL PERLSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radical Investments Management LLC
Represented By: Aaron D Davidson
Represented By: Corey Weinstein
Represented By: Darin M Klemchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trov Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Magic LLC
Represented By: Adam Hiatt Pierson
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whois Privacy Protection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Butcher
Represented By: Jason James Richerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Rosener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DropCatch.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Home Technologies LLC
Represented By: William Robert Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?