Hammonds v. Dallas County
Plaintiff: Jarrod Hammonds
Defendant: Dallas County
Case Number: 3:2017cv01661
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Presiding Judge: David L. Horan
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order Accepting 61 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Brief in Support of Defendants Dallas County, Texas and Lashon Butler, filed 7/18/201 8 (doc. 42 ) is GRANTED. By separate judgment, all of the plaintiff's claims against Dallas County and Lashon Butler will be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and all of his claims against the remaining defendants will be sua sponte DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/11/2019) (zkc)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ACCEPTING 34 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff must file an amended complaint containing factual allegations sufficient to allege a plausible claim for relief no later than 21 days from the date of this order and properly serve that amended complaint on Dallas County under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/1/2018) (sss)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Accepting 27 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation re: 25 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Jarrod Hammonds. Plaintiff Jarrod Hammonds's motion for default judgment [Dkt. No. 25 ] is therefore DENIED. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/23/2018) (ndt)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Accepting 27 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: 25 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Jarrod Hammonds. Plaintiff Jarrod Hammonds's 25 motion for default judgment is therefore DENIED. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/2/2018) (epm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammonds v. Dallas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod Hammonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?