Alpha Omega CHL Inc et al v. Min

Appellant: Alpha Omega CHL Inc
Appellee: Brian Min
Case Number: 3:2017cv02160
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Jane J. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION: The bankruptcy court acted within its discretion when it found that Alpha Omega CHL, Inc. (AO) failed to establish cause to reopen Brian Min's (Min) bankruptcy proceedings, this Court AFFIRMS the bankruptcy court's denial of AO's motion. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/2/2018) (axm)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Memorandum Opinion and Order Denies 22 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Brian Min. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/12/2018) (ndt)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Memorandum Opinion and Order:The Court GRANTS Alpha Omega's 15 Motion for Rehearing and therefore REINSTATES this appeal. Because Alpha Omega already attached its appellant's brief to one of its papers, see Doc. 13, App'x in Suppor t of Reply, the Court ORDERS Alpha Omega to file and serve on Min its appellant's brief by CLOSE OF BUSINESS TODAY. As per Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018(a), Min will have 30 days to file its appellee's brief, and Alpha Omega will have fourteen days to file its reply after being served with Min's appellee's brief. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/1/2018) (ykp)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court DENIES Alpha Omega's motion to extend and DISMISSES this appeal. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/3/2018) (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpha Omega CHL Inc et al v. Min
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alpha Omega CHL Inc
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Cox
Represented By: Joyce W Lindauer
Represented By: Jeffery Michael Veteto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian Min
Represented By: Branch M Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?