McLane Food Service Inc v. Marten Transport Ltd
Plaintiff: McLane Food Service Inc
Defendant: Marten Transport Ltd
Case Number: 3:2018cv01856
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 49:11702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE AND STAYING CASE: The Court is of the opinion that Plaintiff's #6 Unopposed Motion to Stay should be, and hereby is, GRANTED in its entirety. This case is hereby stayed for a period of one hundred twenty (120) days or until otherwise ordered by the Court. The Plaintiff shall file a written report with the Court regarding the status of arbitration within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order, and additional reports (if necessary), every 45 days until the arbitration decided. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/9/2018) (sss)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by McLane Food Service Inc (Fletcher, D)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Marten Transport Ltd; served on 7/23/2018. (axm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Marten Transport Ltd. (rekc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McLane Food Service Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate McLane Company, Inc. for McLane Food Service Inc. (Fletcher, D)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Marten Transport Ltd filed by McLane Food Service Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9324641) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Fletcher, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLane Food Service Inc v. Marten Transport Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McLane Food Service Inc
Represented By: D Lane Fletcher
Represented By: Vic H Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?