Ledbetter v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Robert Ledbetter
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02303
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for leave to appear without local counsel. Plaintiff may proceed without designation of local counsel inthis matter. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/26/2018) (ykp)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION re #5 Order, filed by Robert Ledbetter (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sassaman, Shawn)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/20/2018) (ykp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (sss)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Ledbetter. (Sassaman, Shawn)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against BNSF Railway Company filed by Robert Ledbetter. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9419869) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ledbetter
Represented By: Shawn Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?