United States of America v. $94,995 in US Currency

Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: $94,995 in U.S. Currency and $94,995 in US Currency
Claimant: Phuc Viet Dang
Case Number: 3:2018cv02346
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Phuc Viet Dang with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Reyes, Gabriel)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Brayman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/22/2018) (chmb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Phuc Viet Dang (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Jonathan Marshall Brayman added to party Phuc Viet Dang(pty:clm) (Brayman, Jonathan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 Verified Claim by Phuc Viet Dang. (Reyes, Gabriel)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Publication filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Advertisement Certification Report) (Martin-DOJ, Gregory)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 USMS Process Receipt and Return. (rekc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest in rem filed by United States of America. (Martin-DOJ, Gregory)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States. (Martin-DOJ, Gregory)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $94,995 in U.S. Currency filed by United States. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Martin-DOJ, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $94,995 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Gregory Martin-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory Martin-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $94,995 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $94,995 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Phuc Viet Dang
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Brayman
Represented By: Gabriel Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?