J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Come Taco LLC et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Defendant: Come Taco LLC, Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez and Magic Taco Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02421
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1131ca
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: The conference shall take place no later than 11/5/2018. Status Report due by 11/20/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/19/2018) (svc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Come Taco LLC, Magic Taco Inc, Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez. (Helms, John) (Main Document 9 replaced with flattened image on 10/19/2018) (ajb). Modified on 10/19/2018 (ajb).
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Come Taco LLC, Magic Taco Inc, Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John M Helms, Jr added to party Come Taco LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John M Helms, Jr added to party Magic Taco Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John M Helms, Jr added to party Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez(pty:dft) (Helms, John)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez; served on 9/29/2018. (Diaz, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Magic Taco Inc; served on 9/29/2018. (Diaz, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Come Taco LLC; served on 9/29/2018. (Diaz, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Come Taco LLC, Magic Taco Inc, Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez. (zkc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Diaz, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9444078) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Diaz, David) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add filing fee & receipt number (zkc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Come Taco LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Come Taco LLC
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Taco Inc
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: David M Diaz
Represented By: Andrew R Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?