Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC v. Coe
Plaintiff: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC
Defendant: Morris Coe, Jr
Case Number: 3:2018cv02563
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: This case is REMANDED to the Justice of the Peace, Preceinct 4, Place 1, of Dallas County, TX. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/19/2018) (rekc)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Accepting #4 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/19/2018) (rekc)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: This case should be sua sponte REMANDED to the Justice of the Peace, Precinct 4, Place 1, of Dallas County, Texas, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/27/2018) (mcrd)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Justice of the Peace Precinct 4, Place 1, case number JE1802400G filed by Morris Coe, Jr. (Filing fee $400; receipt number DS111034) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC v. Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Coe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC
Represented By: Ty J Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?