The Inclusive Communities Project Inc v. City of Wylie Texas
Plaintiff: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc
Defendant: City of Wylie Texas
Case Number: 3:2018cv02570
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order: It is ORDERED that the above-styled and-numbered civil action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as of October 8, 2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/10/2018) (ykp)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by The Inclusive Communities Project Inc (Daniel, Michael) Modified duplicate text on 10/9/2018 (ykp).
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Wylie Texas. (zkc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Inclusive Communities Project Inc. (Beshara, Laura)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Wylie, Texas filed by The Inclusive Communities Project Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9477717) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Beshara, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc v. City of Wylie Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc
Represented By: Laura Beth Beshara
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wylie Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?