Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana v. Sony Electronics Inc

Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02580
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Courts four-week docket beginning 12/9/2019 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/14/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2019. Motions due by 9/10/2019. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/12/2019. Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 11/25/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/14/2018) (svc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Sony Electronics Inc. (Bennett, Paul)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura D Schmidt on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schmidt, Laura)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/24/2018) (svc)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. It is ORDERED that Attorney Sean M. Russell is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana a/s/o Kelly Cox and that Attorney Timothy U. Stanford is allowed to substitute in as Plaintiff's counsel of record (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/22/2018) (chmb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Timothy Stanford,Timothy Stanford for Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. Motion filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Timothy Stanford added to party Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana(pty:pla) (Stanford, Timothy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY***Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Suzanne C Radcliff,Suzanne C Radcliff for Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. Motion filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Suzanne C Radcliff added to party Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana(pty:pla) (Radcliff, Suzanne) Modified on 10/10/2018 (ykp).
September 27, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Sep 27 11:23:35 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Bennett, Paul)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 95th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-18-09177 filed by Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9479453) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Defendant's Index of Documents) (Bennett, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana v. Sony Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Represented By: Sean M Russell
Represented By: Timothy Stanford
Represented By: Laura D Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc
Represented By: Alex Johnathan Bell
Represented By: Paul W Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?