The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee v. Meachum
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee and The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association
Defendant: H. Wayne Meachum
Case Number: 3:2018cv02630
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by H. Wayne Meachum. See document #9 for image. (ykp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by H Wayne Meachum. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to H Wayne Meachum; served on 11/7/2018. (ykp)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Substituted Service on H. Wayne Meachum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/6/2018) (mcrd)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Substituted Service on H. Wayne Meachum filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Danaher, Philip) Modified on 11/7/2018 (mcrd).
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to H. Wayne Meachum. (ykp)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee. (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9490769) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee v. Meachum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Represented By: Philip William Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Wayne Meachum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?