Balboa Capital Corporation v. Samuel Transitions MHT LLC et al

Plaintiff: Balboa Capital Corporation
Defendant: Imran Transitions MHT, LLC, Tabasum Imran, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC and Samuel Feng
Counter Defendant: NHUE HO
Case Number: 3:2018cv02646
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
0 Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
1 Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Judge Karen Gren Scholer no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/29/2018) (axm)
November 27, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gilbert Eric De Leon. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/27/2018) (zkc)
November 27, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/27/2018) (zkc)
November 26, 2018 10 Agreed STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Counterclaim and Application for Temporary Injunction by Balboa Capital Corporation. (Hanson, Thomas)
November 1, 2018 9 COUNTERCLAIM against Balboa Capital Corporation, NHUE HO filed by Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC (De Leon, Gilbert)
October 29, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (De Leon, Gilbert)
October 28, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC. (De Leon, Gilbert)
October 26, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (De Leon, Gilbert)
October 25, 2018 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9542083) filed by Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order). Party Samuel Feng added. (De Leon, Gilbert)
October 5, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC. (mcrd/ala)
October 4, 2018 4 ***DISREGARD ENTERED IN WRONG CASE*** Public correspondence received from Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC with Deputy Clerk Response. (rekc) Modified on 10/5/2018 (rekc).
October 4, 2018 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Samuel Feng, Samuel Transitions MHT LLC filed by Balboa Capital Corporation. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9496955) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Hanson, Thomas) Modified defendants on 10/5/2018 (mcrd/ala).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balboa Capital Corporation v. Samuel Transitions MHT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imran Transitions MHT, LLC
Represented By: Gilbert De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabasum Imran
Represented By: Gilbert De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Transitions MHT LLC
Represented By: Gilbert De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Feng
Represented By: Gilbert De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balboa Capital Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M Hanson
Represented By: Daniel T Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: NHUE HO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?