Suter v. United States Government

Plaintiff: Rudolf Suter
Defendant: United States Government
Case Number: 3:2018cv02693
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court will defer ruling on Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and will grant Plaintiff thirty (30) days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. Failure to pay the filing fee will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/24/2018) (rekc) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (axm).
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #3 Complaint (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Rudolf Suter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Suter, Rudolf)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rudolf Suter (Suter, Rudolf)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against United States Government filed by Rudolf Suter. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suter v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolf Suter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?