Hanks v. Paletas Pop, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Katelyn Hanks
Defendant: Paletas Pop LLC and Good Space X LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02711
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 11 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant Paletas Pop, LLC's response to the complaint is due December 19, 2018. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (chmb)
November 19, 2018 10 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant Good Space X, LLC's response to the complaint is due December 19, 2018. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (chmb)
November 9, 2018 9 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Paletas Pop LLC Attorney Stuart Mallory Reynolds, Jr added to party Paletas Pop LLC(pty:dft) (Reynolds, Stuart)
November 9, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Motion to Extend Answer Date filed by Good Space X LLC (Boyd, Cami Dawson)
October 25, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Paletas Pop LLC; served on 10/22/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 20, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Good Space X LLC ; served on 10/19/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Good Space X LLC, Paletas Pop LLC. (mcrd/ala)
October 12, 2018 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
October 12, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Katelyn Hanks. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Katelyn Hanks. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Good Space X, LLC, Paletas Pop, LLC filed by Katelyn Hanks. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9512543) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanks v. Paletas Pop, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paletas Pop LLC
Represented By: Stuart Mallory Reynolds, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Space X LLC
Represented By: Cami Dawson L Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Hanks
Represented By: Douglas Schapiro
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Represented By: Douglas S Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?