Cairns v. Patel et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Cairns
Defendant: Addison Interests, Ltd., Sunil Patel and Addison Interests Ltd
Case Number: 3:2018cv02715
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 15 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Addison Interests Ltd to file an answer is 12/21/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/29/2018) (chmb)
November 28, 2018 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Addison Interests Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Robert)
November 9, 2018 13 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Addison Interests, Ltd. to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 11/30/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/9/2018) (chmb)
November 9, 2018 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Addison Interests Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Robert)
November 5, 2018 11 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Addison Interests Ltd to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 11/13/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/5/2018) (chmb)
November 2, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATMENT by Defendant Addison Interests Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Miller, Robert) Modified on 11/2/2018 to match document to docket entry title(dss). (Main Document and attachment images swapped to match entries on 11/5/2018) (ajb).
November 2, 2018 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Addison Interests Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert A Miller added to party Addison Interests Ltd(pty:dft) (Miller, Robert)
October 18, 2018 8 NOTICE of Striking DE 7 filed by Anthony Cairns (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 18, 2018 7 ***DISREGARD AS PER #8 NOTICE *** CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anthony Cairns. (Schapiro, Douglas) Modified on 10/18/2018 (zkc).
October 18, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Addison Interests Ltd; served on 10/16/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 15, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Addison Interests Ltd, Sunil Patel. (ndt)
October 12, 2018 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
October 12, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anthony Cairns. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by Anthony Cairns. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Addison Interests, Ltd., Sunil Patel filed by Anthony Cairns. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9513983) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cairns v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Interests, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunil Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Interests Ltd
Represented By: Robert A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cairns
Represented By: Douglas Schapiro
Represented By: Douglas S Schapiro
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?